JOYCE v. COLTER ENERGY SERVICES USA INC.
Plaintiff: BRYAN JOYCE
Defendant: COLTER ENERGY SERVICES USA INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01367
Filed: September 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from COLTER ENERGY SERVICES USA INC. on 12/6/2022 (jma)
November 22, 2022 Filing 28 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against COLTER ENERGY SERVICES USA INC., filed by BRYAN JOYCE. (Josephson, Michael)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Counsel is directed to file the Amended Complaint forthwith. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 11/22/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lyk)
November 21, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #26 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (jma)
November 18, 2022 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by BRYAN JOYCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Josephson, Michael)
November 14, 2022 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (White, Alyssa)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Alyssa J. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 11/10/2022. (lyk)
November 9, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for attorney Alyssa J. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7387372) by BRYAN JOYCE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of AW, #2 Proposed Order) (White, Alyssa)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Taylor Shelton Montgomery terminated. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 11/9/2022. (lyk)
November 8, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Taylor S. Montgomery by BRYAN JOYCE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Josephson, Michael)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Gillian G. O'Hara to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/27/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lyk)
October 17, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Gillian G. O'Hara to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7347780) by COLTER ENERGY SERVICES USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A) (O'Hara, Gillian)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Diana C. Fields to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/17/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lyk)
October 15, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Shelton Montgomery on behalf of BRYAN JOYCE. (Montgomery, Taylor)
October 14, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Diana C. Fields to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7345277) by COLTER ENERGY SERVICES USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A) (Fields, Diana)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management set for December 12, 2022 at 1:00 PM before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before October 31, 2022; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by November 14, 2022. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/14/2022. (lyk)
October 13, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David S. Cercone for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/12/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
October 12, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of BRYAN JOYCE. (Dunlap, Andrew)
October 12, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Josephson on behalf of BRYAN JOYCE. (Josephson, Michael)
October 3, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by COLTER ENERGY SERVICES USA INC.. (McDonnell, Michael)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than October 21, 2022. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a District Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Any party who has filed a Consent to Trial by a Magistrate Judge or District Judge form does not need to refile it Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form) (jmb)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than October 21, 2022. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a District Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Any party who has filed a Consent to Trial by a Magistrate Judge or District Judge form does not need to refile it Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form) (jmb)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/30/2022. (jmb)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/30/2022. (jmb)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/30/2022. (jmb)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 9/29/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lyk)
September 29, 2022 Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan added. (jma)
September 28, 2022 Judge David S. Cercone presiding. (ctb)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, the Clerk of Court shall reassign this matter to another Judge on this Court. Judge Nora Barry Fischer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 9/27/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
September 27, 2022 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COLTER ENERGY SERVICES USA INC.. (sdp)
September 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County, case number C-63-CV-2022-5808 with jury demand Copies attached: state court record (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7313527), filed by COLTER ENERGY SERVICES USA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOYCE v. COLTER ENERGY SERVICES USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN JOYCE
Represented By: Joshua P. Geist
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Alyssa White
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Taylor Shelton Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLTER ENERGY SERVICES USA INC.
Represented By: Michael McDonnell, III
Represented By: Diana Fields
Represented By: Gillian O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?