OWENS v. USA
Plaintiff: REBECCA R. OWENS
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2022cv01555
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) . The government shall file its response by 2/21/23. The Defendant may file a reply by 3/14/23. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 12/22/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grogan, Heidi)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER as to REBECCA OWENS LIVSEY indicating that defendant must notify the Court in writing of her choice of one of the three options as to how she wishes to proceed regarding her petition brought under 28 U.S.C. 2255 within 30 days of the date of this Notice and Order. If no written notification of withdrawal is received within 30 days, the Court will proceed to decide the petition as filed (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/8/22. (cjo)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), (filed at 2:20-CR-95), filed by REBECCA R. OWENS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (elt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWENS v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA R. OWENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Heidi M. Grogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?