EMMETT v. DELTA AIR LINES, INC.
Plaintiff: RYAN EMMETT
Defendant: DELTA AIR LINES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01568
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by DELTA AIR LINES, INC. re #35 Brief in Support of Motion, #44 Reply Brief, #34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Wolff, Peter) Modified text on 8/31/2023. (cel)
August 24, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by RYAN EMMETT re #41 Brief in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Oliver v. Noom, Inc., #2 Exhibit B - Brown v. Google LLC) (Lynch, Gary)
August 14, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by DELTA AIR LINES, INC. to #35 Brief in Support of Motion, #34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #44 Reply Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wolff, Peter) Modified text on 8/17/2023. (kss)
July 26, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES by DELTA AIR LINES, INC. to #35 Brief in Support of Motion, #34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #44 Reply Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Wolff, Peter) Modified text on 7/27/2023. (cel)
July 20, 2023 Filing 47 SUPPLEMENT by DELTA AIR LINES, INC. to #35 Brief in Support of Motion, #34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #44 Reply Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wolff, Peter) Modified text on 7/20/2023. (cel)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen Francis Raiola terminated. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/31/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
May 30, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw Stephen F. Raiola Appearance by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wolff, Peter)
May 25, 2023 Filing 44 REPLY BRIEF re #41 Brief in Opposition to #34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #34 filed by DELTA AIR LINES, INC. (Raiola, Stephen) Modified text on 5/25/2023. (cel)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limit for Defendant's reply in support of its motion to dismiss shall be extended to 20 pages. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/16/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
May 16, 2023 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Raiola, Stephen)
May 8, 2023 Filing 41 BRIEF in Opposition re #34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by RYAN EMMETT. (Etzel, Jamisen)
April 28, 2023 Filing 40 REPLY BRIEF re #36 Motion for Judicial Notice, filed by DELTA AIR LINES, INC. (Raiola, Stephen) Modified text on 4/28/2023. (cel)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due by 5/8/2023. Reply due by 5/25/2023. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/26/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
April 26, 2023 Filing 38 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by RYAN EMMETT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lynch, Gary)
April 21, 2023 Filing 37 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of #36 Motion for Judicial Notice in Support of #34 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by RYAN EMMETT. (Lynch, Gary) Modified text on 4/25/2023. (cel)
April 7, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Order) (Raiola, Stephen)
April 7, 2023 Filing 35 BRIEF in Support re #34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Raiola, Stephen)
April 7, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION TO DISMISS #29 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the alternative, MOTION to Dismiss #29 Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction by DELTA AIR LINES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Raiola, Stephen) Modified text on 4/7/2023. (cel)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limit for Defendant's motion to dismiss and Plaintiff's opposition to same shall each be extended to 29 pages. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 3/31/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
March 30, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamisen A. Etzel on behalf of RYAN EMMETT. (Etzel, Jamisen)
March 30, 2023 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Raiola, Stephen)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER dismissing Motions at #25 and #27 in light of the filing of an amended complaint at #29 . Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 3/9/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
March 7, 2023 Filing 29 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against DELTA AIR LINES, INC. DELTA AIR LINES, INC. answer due 4/7/2023, filed by RYAN EMMETT. (Lynch, Gary)
January 30, 2023 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement by RYAN EMMETT. (Lynch, Gary)
January 30, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #25 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ERROR: MULTIPLE Relief Motion Filed as One Relief. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that Motions of this nature are to be filed using the Motion Event and clicking on all the reliefs sought in said motion. Clerk of Court added/docketed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
January 23, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Plaintiff did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 1/30/2023. (cel)
January 20, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order) (Raiola, Stephen)
January 20, 2023 Filing 26 BRIEF in Support re #25 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Raiola, Stephen)
January 20, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Raiola, Stephen). Added MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on 1/30/2023 (cel)
January 13, 2023 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Raiola, Stephen)
January 13, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #8 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 1/20/2023. (cel)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Jeffrey Huberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/12/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
January 12, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for attorney Jeffrey Huberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7486449) by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Huberman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Huberman, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limit for Defendants motion to dismiss and Plaintiffs opposition to the same shall each be extended to 25 pages each. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/10/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
January 10, 2023 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Raiola, Stephen)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Eric C. Bosset to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/22/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Ziwei Song to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/22/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
November 22, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Eric C. Bosset to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7407506) by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric C. Bosset in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Bosset, Eric)
November 22, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Ziwei Song to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7407278) by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ziwei Song in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Song, Ziwei)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Granting #9 Joint MOTION to Modify Schedule for Responding to Complaint and Briefing any Motion to Dismiss filed by DELTA AIR LINES, INC. DELTA AIR LINES, INC. shall answer or otherwise respond to re #1 Complaint by 1/20/2023. Plaintiff shall respond to any Rule 12 motion and accompanying filings filed by Defendant or, alternatively, file an amended complaint per Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B), by 3/7/23. Defendant shall file any reply by 4/7/23. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/22/22. (cjo)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Matthew Q. Verdin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/22/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Emily Johnson Henn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/22/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
November 21, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Matthew Q. Verdin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7405887) by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew Q. Verdin in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Verdin, Matthew)
November 21, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Wolff on behalf of DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Wolff, Peter)
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Emily Johnson Henn to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7405885) by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Emily Johnson Henn in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Henn, Emily)
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Modify Schedule for Responding to Complaint and Briefing any Motion to Dismiss by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Raiola, Stephen)
November 21, 2022 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Raiola, Stephen)
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Francis Raiola on behalf of DELTA AIR LINES, INC.. (Raiola, Stephen)
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by RYAN EMMETT. DELTA AIR LINES, INC. served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Lynch, Gary)
November 8, 2022 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (cjo)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/8/22. (cjo)
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DELTA AIR LINES, INC. (av)
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DELTA AIR LINES, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7378476), filed by RYAN EMMETT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (av)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMMETT v. DELTA AIR LINES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN EMMETT
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Jamisen A. Etzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELTA AIR LINES, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Verdin
Represented By: Eric C. Bosset
Represented By: Emily Henn
Represented By: Stephen Francis Raiola
Represented By: Ziwei Song
Represented By: Peter S. Wolff
Represented By: Jeffrey Huberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?