SCHNUR v. JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION
Plaintiff: JORDAN SCHNUR
Defendant: JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2022cv01621
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION re #30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Eads, Joel)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION re #30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Eads, Joel)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by JORDAN SCHNUR re #36 Brief in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Oliver v. Noom, Inc., #2 Exhibit B - Brown v. Google LLC) (Lynch, Gary)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Eads, Joel)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY re #30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Guyon, Rebekah) Modified text on 5/18/2023. (ept)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPLY in Support of Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice to #22 Notice,, filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Guyon, Rebekah)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant shall have 20 pages for its Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/11/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Jetblue Airways Corporation's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Guyon, Rebekah)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 BRIEF in Opposition re #30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by JORDAN SCHNUR. (Lynch, Gary)
April 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Response re: #30 due by 4/28/2023. Reply due by 5/12/2023. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/22/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #34 Motion for Briefing Schedule. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (kss)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule as to #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Guyon, Rebekah) Modified text on 4/21/2023. (kss)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint to #32 Notice, filed by JORDAN SCHNUR. (Lynch, Gary)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE - Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint - by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION re #30 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-18, #3 Proposed Order) (Eads, Joel)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 BRIEF in Support re #30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First Amended Complaint filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Eads, Joel) Modified text on 4/3/2023. (keh)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Class Action Complaint Under Fedral Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) re #23 Amended Complaint by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Eads, Joel) Added MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on 4/3/2023 (keh)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant shall have until March 31, 2023 to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. It is further Ordered that Defendant shall have 25 pages for its brief in support of its motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint, and Plaintiff shall have 25 pages for its brief in response to Defendant's motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint.. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 3/24/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #23 Amended Complaint filed by JORDAN SCHNUR and Enlarge the Page Limits for the Parties' Briefs by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Guyon, Rebekah)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant shall have until March 28, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 3/1/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #23 Amended Complaint filed by JORDAN SCHNUR by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Guyon, Rebekah)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER dismissing #20 Motion to Dismiss in light of the filing of an amended complaint at #23 . Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 2/21/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Disclosure Statement by JORDAN SCHNUR. (Lynch, Gary)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION answer due 3/7/2023, filed by JORDAN SCHNUR. (Lynch, Gary)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE /Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION re #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Eads, Joel)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 BRIEF in Support re #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Eads, Joel)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re #1 Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re #1 Complaint by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Eads, Joel)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Jacob D. Bundick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/31/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Proposed Order re #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacob D. Bundick, Esq. by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Bundick, Jacob)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Jacob D. Bundick to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7515589) by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Bundick, Jacob)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant may file a 25-page brief in support of its motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/30/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Eads, Joel)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until January 31, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/11/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by JORDAN SCHNUR by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Guyon, Rebekah)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Eads, Joel)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Max Eads on behalf of JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Eads, Joel)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Rebekah S. Guyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/4/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 1/11/2023. (keh)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Rebekah S. Guyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7467936) by JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rebekah S. Guyon, #2 Proposed Order) (Guyon, Rebekah)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION answer due by 1/17/2023. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 12/5/22. (cjo)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JORDAN SCHNUR. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lynch, Gary)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JORDAN SCHNUR. JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION served on 11/17/2022, answer due 12/8/2022. (Lynch, Gary)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (cjo)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 11/17/22. (cjo)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION (keh)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7395933), filed by JORDAN SCHNUR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (keh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHNUR v. JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN SCHNUR
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JETBLUE AIRWAYS CORPORATION
Represented By: Joel Max Eads
Represented By: Rebekah S Guyon
Represented By: Jacob Bundick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?