USORPH v. KOGER et al
Plaintiff: ISAAC USORPH and ISAAC USOROH
Defendant: TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, JR. and TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, SR.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01823
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Filing 21 USCA Case Number 23-1029 for #19 Notice of Appeal, filed by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, SR. USCA Case Manager Pamela (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (pdb3)
January 5, 2023 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Request for Transcript Order Form served on US District Court Western PA Pittsburgh Division on January 5, 2023, filed by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, SR. (KOGER, TODD)
January 5, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #15 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Court Re-docketed correctly as #19 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #14 Order. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
January 5, 2023 Record Complete for Appeal Purposes re #19 Notice of Appeal. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified copy of the docket entries. (jv)
January 4, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #14 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, SR. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (jv).
January 4, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD 22-13385 (filed per #14 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis), filed by ISAAC USOROH. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits A-D) (jv).
January 4, 2023 Filing 17 Errata re #15 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, SR. Reason for Correction: As per direction for Court Joe Clerk's Office 4:50 p.m. Jan 4th telephone instruction because of error with CM ECF System Not Allowing Document Filed as Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (KOGER, TODD)
January 4, 2023 Filing 16 Errata re #15 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, SR. Reason for Correction: Better Copy of Order Attached to Notice of Appeal to Third Circuit as an Exhibit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (KOGER, TODD)
January 4, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, SR. (KOGER, TODD) Modified on 1/5/2023 to remove from pulic view since court file correctly as #19 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #14 Order (jv).
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This matter shall be remanded to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County forthwith. #10 Motion to Dismiss is terminated as moot. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/04/23. (eca)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 12/27/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lyk)
December 27, 2022 Filing 12 Proposed Order re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, SR. (KOGER, TODD)
December 27, 2022 Filing 11 Errata re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, SR. Reason for Correction: Correction of pro se typing mistakes and misplaced commas, semicolons, and the like.. (KOGER, TODD)
December 27, 2022 Judge William S. Stickman added. (av)
December 27, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (jv)
December 26, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, SR. (KOGER, TODD)
December 22, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Confirmation Notice of Removal Filed with Court by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, SR Affiant: Todd Elliott Koger, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (KOGER, TODD) Modified on 12/27/2022 (kss).
December 21, 2022 Filing 8 Errata re #7 Affidavit Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal on Pennsylvania Court of Common Pleas by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, SR. Reason for Correction: Exhibit "B" (2nd Service of Notice of Removal on Court) was missing from original filing. (KOGER, TODD)
December 21, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT Certificate of Service Notice of Removal Filed with PA Court of Common Pleas by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, SR Affiant: Todd Elliott Koger, Sr.. (KOGER, TODD)
December 20, 2022 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER. (KOGER, TODD)
December 20, 2022 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER. (KOGER, TODD) Modified on 12/20/2022 to identify "none" by permission from Mr. Koger. (jv).
December 20, 2022 Filing 4 Errata re Quality Control message - Generic Correction, Notice of Removal by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER. Reason for Correction: Quality Control message by Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KOGER, TODD) Modified on 12/20/2022 to change Reason for Correcton to "Quality Control Message from the court" by permission from Mr. Koger (jv).
December 19, 2022 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER. (KOGER, TODD)
December 19, 2022 Filing 2 Errata re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Notice of Removal Case by TODD ELLIOTT KOGER. Reason for Correction: Caption Correction Ordered by Court. (KOGER, TODD)
December 19, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TODD ELLIOT KOGER, SR. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal Lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Exhibit - Complaint filed in State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)
December 19, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 12/27/2022. (jv)
December 19, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ERROR: Parties on Notice of Removal and Complaint do not match. CORRECTION: Filer directed to file an errata correcting Notice of removal re parties. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USORPH v. KOGER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISAAC USORPH
Represented By: Gusty A.E. Sunseri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISAAC USOROH
Represented By: Gusty A.E. Sunseri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD ELLIOTT KOGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD ELLIOTT KOGER, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?