THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY v. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, COOPER MACHINERY SERVICES LLC and WOLONG ELECTRIC AMERICA LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00845
Filed: May 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick Cullen on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Cullen, James)
July 17, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph V. Lesinski on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Lesinski, Joseph)
June 29, 2023 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement identifying Arcline Investment Management, LP as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COOPER MACHINERY SERVICES LLC. (Alo, Edward)
June 27, 2023 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement identifying Cincinnati Financial Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Boehret, Justin)
June 27, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A AND identifying citizenship pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 7/5/2023. (bjw)
June 26, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by COOPER MACHINERY SERVICES LLC. (Alo, Edward)
June 26, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, WOLONG ELECTRIC AMERICA LLC by COOPER MACHINERY SERVICES LLC. (Alo, Edward)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Justin J. Boehret to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 6/21/2023. (pak)
June 21, 2023 Filing 11 Defendant Wolong Electric America LLC's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against COOPER MACHINERY SERVICES LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY by WOLONG ELECTRIC AMERICA LLC. (Lazo, Nadia)
June 20, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Justin Boehret to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7745416) by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Boehret, Justin)
June 13, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Richard Alo on behalf of COOPER MACHINERY SERVICES LLC. (Alo, Edward)
June 12, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Mengna Gao for Wolong Electric America LLC on 4/19/23, filed by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Acklen, Jonathan)
June 12, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Adrienne Osorio for GE Co. on 4/21/23, filed by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Acklen, Jonathan)
June 12, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Grace Garza for Cooper Machinery Services LLC on 4/20/23, filed by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Acklen, Jonathan)
June 12, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan B. Acklen on behalf of THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Acklen, Jonathan)
May 26, 2023 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying Wolong America Holding, LLC, Wolong Electric Group Co Ltd as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WOLONG ELECTRIC AMERICA LLC. (Lazo, Nadia)
May 24, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A AND identifying citizenship pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 5/31/2023. (cel)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Plaintiff shall promptly file executed proofs of service or waivers of service as to Defendants General Electric and Cooper Machinery. The Court will defer on scheduling the initial case management conference until all Defendants are served, or unless any party files a motion to schedule the conference. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 05/23/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjb)
May 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-23-004968 with 132,000 plus Copies attached: Original Complaint, Docket Report from Allegheny County (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7697165), filed by WOLONG ELECTRIC AMERICA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Complaint, #2 Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY v. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Justin J. Boehret
Represented By: Jonathan B. Acklen
Represented By: Justin Boehret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: Joseph V. Lesinski
Represented By: James Patrick Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER MACHINERY SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Edward Richard Alo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOLONG ELECTRIC AMERICA LLC
Represented By: Nadia V. Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?