TIMKO et al v. NSPA LOUNGE LLC et al
Plaintiff: TERRI TIMKO, ANTHONY ROBINSON and STEPHANIE DARNELL
Defendant: YADWINDER SINGH, BALJINDER KAUR, HIMANSHU BHATIA, DIPTI BHATIA, NSPA LOUNGE LLC doing business as DAYS INN, NSPA SUITES LLC, MILAN, LLC doing business as MOTEL M, JERRY KING, ROBIN, DIPPY, HIMAN, DIPTI MAISURIA and WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2023cv01307
Filed: July 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, filed by ANTHONY ROBINSON, TERRI TIMKO. (Ward, Joshua)
October 11, 2023 Filing 17 Memorandum of Law in Support re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, INC. (rtm)
October 11, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum of Law in Support. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court re-docketed Memorandum of Law in Support #17 . This message is for informational purposes only. (rtm)
October 10, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANTHONY ROBINSON, TERRI TIMKO, STEPHANIE DARNELL. MILAN, LLC served on 8/23/2023, answer due 10/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Ward, Joshua)
October 10, 2023 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, INC.. (Rappaport, Nancy)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file their brief in response to the #13 motion on or before 11/7/2023; Defendant's reply brief due by 11/28/2023. The brief in response shall not exceed 30 pages in length; the reply brief shall not exceed 10 pages in length. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/10/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
October 9, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM WITH MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Conferral) (Rappaport, Nancy) Memorandum re-docketed at #17 Modified text on 10/11/2023. (rtm)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their answers or otherwise respond to the #1 complaint on or before 10/9/2023. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 9/1/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
August 31, 2023 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by TERRI TIMKO, ANTHONY ROBINSON, STEPHANIE DARNELL by WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rappaport, Nancy)
August 16, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANTHONY ROBINSON, TERRI TIMKO, STEPHANIE DARNELL. NSPA SUITES LLC served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. (Ward, Joshua)
August 16, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANTHONY ROBINSON, TERRI TIMKO, STEPHANIE DARNELL. NSPA LOUNGE LLC served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. (Ward, Joshua)
August 16, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANTHONY ROBINSON, TERRI TIMKO, STEPHANIE DARNELL. YADWINDER SINGH served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. (Ward, Joshua)
August 16, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANTHONY ROBINSON, TERRI TIMKO, STEPHANIE DARNELL. BALJINDER KAUR served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023. (Ward, Joshua)
July 24, 2023 Filing 6 Errata re 5 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Reason for Correction: Attaching paper order. (pak)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Filipe F. Franca to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 7/24/2023. Errata attaching paper order filed at ECF #6 .
July 21, 2023 Filing 4 Errata re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by STEPHANIE DARNELL, ANTHONY ROBINSON, TERRI TIMKO. Reason for Correction: Captions did not match and no proposed order attached.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A) (Franca, Filipe)
July 21, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Filipe F. Franca to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7796831) by TERRI TIMKO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Franca, Filipe) See Errata at #4 . Documents hidden from public view. Modified text on 7/24/2023. (cww)
July 21, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERRORS: Caption of document does not match caption of case. Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is directed to file an Errata with corrected caption and a proposed order as an attachment to the main document, linking it to the document in question. (kss)
July 20, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DIPTI BHATIA, HIMANSHU BHATIA, BALJINDER KAUR, MILAN, LLC, NSPA LOUNGE LLC, NSPA SUITES LLC, YADWINDER SINGH, WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons HIMANSHU BHATIA, #2 Summons BALJINDER KAUR, #3 Summons MILAN, LLC, #4 Summons NSPA LOUNGE LLC, #5 Summons NSPA SUITES LLC, #6 Summons YADWINDER SINGH, #7 Summons WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC.) (kss)
July 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DIPTI BHATIA, HIMANSHU BHATIA, BALJINDER KAUR, MILAN, LLC, NSPA LOUNGE LLC, NSPA SUITES LLC, YADWINDER SINGH, WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7793491), filed by ANTHONY ROBINSON, TERRI TIMKO, STEPHANIE DARNELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TIMKO et al v. NSPA LOUNGE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YADWINDER SINGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALJINDER KAUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIMANSHU BHATIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIPTI BHATIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSPA LOUNGE LLC doing business as DAYS INN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSPA SUITES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILAN, LLC doing business as MOTEL M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIPPY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIPTI MAISURIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYNDHAM HOTELS AND RESORTS, INC.
Represented By: Nancy Shane Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRI TIMKO
Represented By: Joshua P. Ward
Represented By: Filipe Franca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY ROBINSON
Represented By: Joshua P. Ward
Represented By: Filipe Franca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE DARNELL
Represented By: Joshua P. Ward
Represented By: Filipe Franca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?