OWSINSKI v. AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Plaintiff: KRISTIN I. OWSINSKI
Defendant: AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, MYLAN INC, MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, PFIZER INC., PHARMACIA CORPORATION, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA AND UPJOHN INC, THE UPJOHN COMPANY, PHARMACIA A.B., PLANNED PARENTHOOD WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA ACTION FUND, INC d/b/a PLANNED PARENTHOOD WOMEN'S HEALTH SERVICES, PLANNED PARENTHOOD WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA ACTION FUND, INC d/b/a PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF WESTERN PA, PLANNED PARENTHOOD COMMITTEE AND CLINIC OF PITTSBURGH, PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC, PLANNED PARENTHOOD CENTER OF PITTSBURGH, INC and PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2023cv01340
Filed: July 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #61 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. ERROR: MULTIPLE Relief Motion Filed as One Relief. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that Motions of this nature are to be filed using the Motion Event and clicking on all the reliefs sought in said motion. Clerk of Court added/docketed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmh)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 BRIEF in Support re #61 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for Failure to State a Claim filed by MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Matta Declaration) (Reefer, Jason)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for Failure to State a Claim by MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Conferral, #2 Proposed Order) (Reefer, Jason). Added MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on 9/20/2023 (dmh)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Sheryl Shapiro Bassin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 9/13/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for attorney Sheryl Shapiro Bassin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7881121) by AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Bassin, Sheryl)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 BRIEF in Opposition re #42 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED. (Reefer, Jason)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RESPONSE to Motion re #42 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED. (Reefer, Jason)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY BRIEF re #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PFIZER INC., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN LLC. (Williams, Raymond)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPLY BRIEF re #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Henry, Terry)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC, PLANNED PARENTHOOD WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA ACTION FUND, INC(d/b/a PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF WESTERN PA), PLANNED PARENTHOOD WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA ACTION FUND, INC(d/b/a PLANNED PARENTHOOD WOMEN'S HEALTH SERVICES). (McGuire, Joseph)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 BRIEF in Support re #52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MYLAN INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Reefer, Jason)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MYLAN INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Conferral) (Reefer, Jason)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Disclosure Statement identifying Viatris Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate by MYLAN INC. (Reefer, Jason)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED Answer due from MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED on 9/19/2023. (Reefer, Jason)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., AND AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC to #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, filed by KRISTIN I. OWSINSKI. (Friday, Peter)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION PFIZER INC., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN LLC, AND PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC to #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by KRISTIN I. OWSINSKI. (Friday, Peter)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION PLANNED PARENTHOOD DEFENDANT'S to #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, filed by KRISTIN I. OWSINSKI. (Friday, Peter)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 BRIEF in Opposition re #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim PFIZER INC., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN LLC, AND PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC filed by KRISTIN I. OWSINSKI. (Friday, Peter)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 BRIEF in Opposition re #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., AND AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC filed by KRISTIN I. OWSINSKI. (Friday, Peter)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 BRIEF in Opposition re #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by KRISTIN I. OWSINSKI. (Friday, Peter)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 BRIEF in Support re #42 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by KRISTIN I. OWSINSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Friday, Peter)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by KRISTIN I. OWSINSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Friday, Peter)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED DOCUMENT (Disclosure Statement) by MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED. Amendment to #2 Disclosure Statement. (Reefer, Jason)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Errata re #31 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by PFIZER INC., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN LLC. Reason for Correction: Case number of document does not match case number of case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B) (Williams, Raymond)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #31 Brief in Support of Motion. ERROR: Case number of document (Main document only) does not match case number of case. CORRECTION: Attorney is directed to file an Errata with corrected case number. (kss)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 BRIEF in Support re #38 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES. (Barchiesi, J.)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Barchiesi, J.)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Disclosure Statement identifying BlackRock Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (James, Ryan)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 BRIEF in Support re #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D) (Henry, Terry) Modified text on 8/11/2023. (cel)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Errata re #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. Reason for Correction: Signature and filer did not match.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Conferral re Meet and Confer) (Henry, Terry) Modified text on 8/14/2023. (ept)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Errata re #23 Disclosure Statement by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. Reason for Correction: Signature and filer did not match.. (Henry, Terry)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Proposed Order re #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by PFIZER INC., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN LLC. (Williams, Raymond)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Proposed Order re #25 Motion To Join Sections of Teva And Amphastar's Memorandum of Law In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by PFIZER INC., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN LLC. (Williams, Raymond)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 BRIEF in Support re #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PFIZER INC., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Proposed Order) (Williams, Raymond). Document removed from view and refiled as an Errata at #40 . Modified text on 8/16/2023. (dmh)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #24 Brief attached to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ERROR: Signature on Brief in support and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the Brief in support with corrected signature using the "Brief in Support of Motion" event. The Brief in Support must be linked to #24 . CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Document should been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. (rtm)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ERROR: Proposed Order, which is required for all motions in civil cases per Local Rule LCvR7, was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (rtm)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the motion using the Errata event. (rtm)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #23 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (rtm)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Disclosure Statement identifying Pharmacia LLC, Wyeth Holdings LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PHARMACIA & UPJOHN LLC. (Williams, Raymond) Modified text on 8/15/2023. (kss)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Disclosure Statement identifying Pharmacia & Upjohn LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC. (Williams, Raymond)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PFIZER INC.. (Williams, Raymond)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PFIZER INC., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN LLC. (Williams, Raymond)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 BRIEF in Support re #25 Motion To Join Sections Of Teva And Amphastar's Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Dismiss filed by PFIZER INC., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, Raymond)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION To Join Sections Of Teva And Amphastar's Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by PFIZER INC., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN LLC. (Williams, Raymond)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memo of Law, #2 Exhibits A - D, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Conferral re Meet and Confer, #4 Proposed Order) (Byers, Justina) Modified text on 8/11/2023. (rtm) Attachment #1 removed from view and redocketed at #36 . Modified text on 8/11/2023. (ept) Linked added to Errata filed at #35 . Modified text on 8/14/2023. (ept)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Disclosure Statement identifying Teva Holdco US, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (Byers, Justina) Document removed from view and refiled as an Errata at #34 . Modified text on 8/14/2023. (ept)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parents or other affiliates, by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC. (McGuire, Joseph) Modified text on 8/11/2023. (rtm)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Disclosure Statement by PLANNED PARENTHOOD WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA ACTION FUND, INC(d/b/a PLANNED PARENTHOOD WOMEN'S HEALTH SERVICES). (McGuire, Joseph)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or affiliate by PLANNED PARENTHOOD WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA ACTION FUND, INC(d/b/a PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF WESTERN PA). (McGuire, Joseph) Modified text on 8/10/2023. (kss)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 BRIEF in Support re #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC, PLANNED PARENTHOOD WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA ACTION FUND, INC(d/b/a PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF WESTERN PA), PLANNED PARENTHOOD WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA ACTION FUND, INC(d/b/a PLANNED PARENTHOOD WOMEN'S HEALTH SERVICES). (McGuire, Joseph)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC, PLANNED PARENTHOOD WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA ACTION FUND, INC(d/b/a PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF WESTERN PA), PLANNED PARENTHOOD WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA ACTION FUND, INC(d/b/a PLANNED PARENTHOOD WOMEN'S HEALTH SERVICES). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (McGuire, Joseph)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #2 Disclosure Statement, #4 Disclosure Statement, #10 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 8/16/2023. (cel)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in the future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (rtm)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Melanie S. Carter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/8/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Terry M. Henry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/8/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Melanie S. Carter to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7823963) by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (Carter, Melanie)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Terry M. Henry to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7823922) by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (Henry, Terry)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Justina L. Byers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 8/8/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Justina L. Byers to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7823346) by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (Byers, Justina)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. Answer due from TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC on 8/10/2023; AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC on 8/10/2023; PFIZER INC. on 8/10/2023; PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC on 8/10/2023; PLANNED PARENTHOOD WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA ACTION FUND, INC(d/b/a PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF WESTERN PA) on 8/10/2023; PLANNED PARENTHOOD WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA ACTION FUND, INC(d/b/a PLANNED PARENTHOOD WOMEN'S HEALTH SERVICES) on 8/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Guerra, Ricky)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Disclosure Statement identifying BlackRock Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (James, Ryan)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES - Every telephonic conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled, you will be instructed to refer back to this notice. This document has a security setting of Case Participants Only, so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (cjo)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re 12(b) Motions. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/31/23. (cjo)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Robert J. Colville added. (nae)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), this Court hereby recuses itself as to all matters of the above-captioned case and requests that this case be assigned to another member of the Court. Judge Arthur J. Schwab recused. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/28/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lar)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 7/28/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mwm)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (Guerra, Ricky)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ricky M Guerra on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. (Guerra, Ricky)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Arthur J. Schwab added. (nae)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Nora Barry Fischer added as Presider. (ept)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Nora Barry Fischer no longer assigned to case. (Assigned in error) (nae)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Viatris Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED. (dmh)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD23-004246 with Jury Demand. Copies attached: Complaint; Docket Sheet; Praecipe to Issue Writ of Summons; Praecipe to Reinstate Writ of Summons (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7803109), filed by MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED. (dmh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2023: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (dmh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWSINSKI v. AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTIN I. OWSINSKI
Represented By: A. Michael Gianantonio
Represented By: Alicia Dawn Loy
Represented By: Chad P. Shannon
Represented By: Ian Watt
Represented By: Peter D. Friday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMPHASTAR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Represented By: James Andrew Salemme
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Sheryl S. Bassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC
Represented By: Jason M. Reefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED
Represented By: Jason M. Reefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Represented By: Justina L Byers
Represented By: Melanie S. Carter
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Represented By: Terry M. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER INC.
Represented By: Antonious E. Sadek
Represented By: Danielle T Morrison
Represented By: Raymond Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHARMACIA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHARMACIA & UPJOHN LLC
Represented By: Antonious E. Sadek
Represented By: Danielle T Morrison
Represented By: Raymond Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Antonious E. Sadek
Represented By: Danielle T Morrison
Represented By: Raymond Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHARMACIA AND UPJOHN INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UPJOHN COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHARMACIA A.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLANNED PARENTHOOD WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA ACTION FUND, INC d/b/a PLANNED PARENTHOOD WOMEN'S HEALTH SERVICES
Represented By: Ashley N. Rodgers
Represented By: Joseph Andrew McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLANNED PARENTHOOD WESTERN PENNSYLVANIA ACTION FUND, INC d/b/a PLANNED PARENTHOOD OF WESTERN PA
Represented By: Ashley N. Rodgers
Represented By: Joseph Andrew McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLANNED PARENTHOOD COMMITTEE AND CLINIC OF PITTSBURGH
Represented By: Ashley N. Rodgers
Represented By: Joseph Andrew McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC
Represented By: Ashley N. Rodgers
Represented By: Joseph Andrew McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLANNED PARENTHOOD CENTER OF PITTSBURGH, INC
Represented By: Ashley N. Rodgers
Represented By: Joseph Andrew McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: J. Eric Barchiesi
Represented By: Robert T. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?