U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. 121 CHAMPION, LLC
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Defendant: 121 CHAMPION, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01862
Filed: October 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christy Criswell Wiegand
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case is administratively CLOSED pending further Order of the Court. Administrative closings comprise a familiar way in which courts remove cases from their active files without final adjudication. Penn West Assocs., Inc. v. Cohen, 371 F.3d 118, 127 (3d Cir. 2004) (citation and internal quotations omitted). Administrative closure is a docket control device used by the Court for statistical purposes, and it does not prejudice the rights of the parties in any manner. Honig v. Comcast of Georgia I, LLC, 537 F. Supp.2d 1277, 1290 n.8 (N.D. Ga. 2008). As such, this Order shall not affect any of the parties' obligations or deadlines related to this case. Finally, as and when appropriate, any party may restore this action to the Court's active calendar upon application or by motion. See In re Arbitration Between Philadelphia Elec. Co. v. Nuclear Elec. Ins., Ltd., 845 F. Supp. 1026, 1028 (S.D.N.Y. 1994) (holding same). Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/19/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjw)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Consent Judgment by 1/5/24; Public foreclosure sale by 9/30/24; Private foreclosure sale by 11/30/24. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/18/2023. (bjw)
December 18, 2023 Filing 22 Receiver's Bond BOND in the amount of $10,000 Receipt Number 3513613, posted by Trigild IVL, LLC SureTec Insurance Company as Surety. (Godfrey, Nicholas)
December 15, 2023 Filing 21 Proposed Case Management Order Joint Motion to Enter Case Management Order by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (proposed Case Management Order)) (Godfrey, Nicholas)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. Consistent with the discussion during the telephonic status conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before 12/15/23, the parties shall confer and file a joint motion requesting the entry of a case management order with a proposed order delineating the parties' proposed next steps and reasonable deadlines to complete such next steps. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/12/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjw)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/12/2023. (bjw)
December 13, 2023 Filing 18 Minute Entry for Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/12/2023 before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand. (Court Reporter: None) (bjw)
December 11, 2023 Filing 17 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 121 CHAMPION, LLC (sdp)
December 8, 2023 Filing 16 REQUEST by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION for entry of DEFAULT against 121 CHAMPION, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request to Enter Default) (Godfrey, Nicholas)
December 8, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Dauer, Jr on behalf of 121 CHAMPION, LLC. (Dauer, Robert)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Motion for Status Conference filed by U.S. Bank National Association. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. A status conference is set for 12/12/2023 at 9:30 AM via telephonic conference before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand. The parties are advised to refer to the dial-in information at ECF No. #6 . On or before 12/11/2023, counsel for Defendant 121 Champion LLC shall file his notice of appearance and shall attend the status conference. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/6/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjw)
December 5, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Status Conference by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Court) (Godfrey, Nicholas)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause by December 11, 2023 as to why the action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, or shall request an entry of default as to Defendant. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 12/4/2023. (bjw)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #8 Stipulation to Order Appointing Receiver by U.S. Bank National Association. On November 6, 2023, Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association filed a joint Stipulation to Order Appointing Receiver wherein the parties requested the appointment of a receiver over the property at issue in this action. The parties did not provide any legal or factual basis as to the need for a receiver or why the appointment of a receiver is appropriate under the law. Accordingly, on November 8, 2023, the Court ordered the parties to file a joint submission addressing that issue, which the parties did on November 11, 2023. See ECF Nos. 9, 10. The appointment of a receiver is an "extraordinary" and "drastic" remedy. Midwest Bank v. Goldsmith, 467 F. Supp. 3d 242, 248 (M. D. Pa. 2020). Because a receiver interferes with the borrower's right to control the property, "a district court should appoint a receiver only 'in cases of necessity, and when the plaintiff clearly and satisfactorily shows that an emergency exists and the receiver is needed to protect the property interests of plaintiff.'" Id. Plaintiff's primary argument for the appointment of a receiver is that the property is in default and Defendant contractually agreed to the appointment of a receiver at the time the loan originated. However, the Court's review of the contractual provision in the loan documents shows that Plaintiff is merely entitled to apply for a receiver; Plaintiff is not contractually entitled to the appointment of a receiver. See ECF No. 1-4, 7.1(g) (stating that Lender may "apply for the appointment of a receiver, trustee, liquidator or conservator of the Property, without notice and without regard for the adequacy of the security for the Debt and without regard for the solvency of Borrower, any Guarantor, Indemnifying Person with respect to the Loan or of any Person liable for the payment of the Debt). While Defendant's consent to the appointment of a receiver can weigh heavily in its favor, the ultimate decision of whether to appoint a receiver is left to the discretion of the district court. Midwest Bank, 467 F. Supp. 3d at 251. The parties have not offered any evidence or even argument that an emergency exists. Accordingly, exercising its discretion, the Court finds that the parties have not shown that the appointment of a receiver is necessary at this time. Therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #8 Stipulation to Order Appointing Receiver is HEREBY DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 11/29/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjw)
November 13, 2023 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support of #8 Stipulation (Joint) filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Godfrey, Nicholas)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Stipulation to Order Appointing Receiver by U.S. Bank National Association. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before 11/13/2023, the parties shall file a joint submission addressing the need for a receiver and why the appointment of a receiver is appropriate under the law. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 11/8/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjw)
November 6, 2023 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Order Appointing Receiver by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Godfrey, Nicholas)
November 3, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. 121 CHAMPION, LLC served on 10/30/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (Godfrey, Nicholas)
October 30, 2023 Filing 6 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (drc)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 10/30/2023. (drc)
October 30, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (drc)
October 30, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Godfrey, Nicholas)
October 30, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying CITIZENSHIP pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))., CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))., CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A AND identifying CITIZENSHIP pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)).(Disclosure Statement due by 11/6/2023.) (sdp)
October 27, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 121 CHAMPION, LLC (sdp)
October 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 121 CHAMPION, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC7953561), filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. 121 CHAMPION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Nicholas J. Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 121 CHAMPION, LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Dauer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?