AMAZON.COM, INC. et al v. VJ UNIACCENT LLC et al
Plaintiff: AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC and AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Defendant: VJ UNIACCENT LLC, VIJAY KUMAR and DOES 1-50
Case Number: 2:2023cv01939
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants to answer in this matter is hereby EXTENDED to 1/19/24. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 1/5/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
January 5, 2024 Filing 23 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 22 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, by VIJAY KUMAR, VJ UNIACCENT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email providing consent, #2 Proposed Order) (Tallman, James)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants VJ Kumar and VJ Uniaccent LLC have until 1/5/24, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 12/6/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
December 6, 2023 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Summons/Returned Returned Executed, filed by AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC. by VIJAY KUMAR, VJ UNIACCENT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email re consent, #2 Proposed Order) (Tallman, James)
December 5, 2023 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate by VJ UNIACCENT LLC. (Tallman, James)
December 5, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Tallman on behalf of VJ UNIACCENT LLC. (Tallman, James)
December 5, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Tallman on behalf of VIJAY KUMAR. (Tallman, James)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Bonnie MacNaughton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/22/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
November 22, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #13 Certificate of Service, #14 Certificate of Service. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed. This message is for informational purposes only. (kss)
November 21, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES, INC. VIJAY KUMAR served on 11/15/2023, answer due 12/6/2023; VJ UNIACCENT LLC served on 11/15/2023, answer due 12/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service VJ Uniaccent LLC) (kss)
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Bonnie MacNaughton to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7992727) by AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (MacNaughton, Bonnie)
November 21, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on VJ Uniaccent LLC by AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC. (Strassburger, David) Document removed from public view and refiled at #16 . Modified text on 11/22/2023. (kss)
November 21, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Vijay Kumar by AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC. (Strassburger, David) Document removed from public view and refiled at #16 . Modified text on 11/22/2023. (kss)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for John Freed to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/20/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney John Freed to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7988996) by AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit) (Freed, John)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Meagan Himes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/17/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
November 16, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Meagan Himes to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7985194) by AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Meagan Himes) (Himes, Meagan)
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/13/23. (jad)
November 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
November 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE (REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK by AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC. (Strassburger, David)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying Amazon Technologies, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC.. (Strassburger, David)
November 13, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to VIJAY KUMAR, VJ UNIACCENT LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (jd)
November 9, 2023 Filing 5 PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (jd)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-50, VIJAY KUMAR, VJ UNIACCENT LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7974111), filed by AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC, AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMAZON.COM, INC. et al v. VJ UNIACCENT LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Represented By: David A. Strassburger
Represented By: Meagan A. Himes
Represented By: Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton
Represented By: John D. Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC
Represented By: David A. Strassburger
Represented By: Meagan A. Himes
Represented By: Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton
Represented By: John D. Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: David A. Strassburger
Represented By: Meagan A. Himes
Represented By: Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton
Represented By: John D. Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VJ UNIACCENT LLC
Represented By: James T. Tallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIJAY KUMAR
Represented By: James T. Tallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?