LeRoy v. MAXmotive, LLC
Plaintiff: Richard LeRoy
Defendant: MAXmotive, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01978
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Referring Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER approving #24 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by MAXmotive, LLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/5/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
December 5, 2023 Filing 26 Errata re #25 Stipulation Notice and Substitution of Appearance by MAXmotive, LLC. Reason for Correction: NOTICE WAS FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. (Hamilton, Mark)
December 4, 2023 Filing 25 Notice of Substitution of Attorney appearance by MAXmotive, LLC. (Hamilton, Mark) Modified text on 12/5/2023. (cel) Document removed from public view and refiled as Errata at #26 . Modified text on 12/6/2023. (keh)
December 4, 2023 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by MAXmotive, LLC. (Hamilton, Mark)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/20/2023. (cmc)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), this Court hereby recuses itself as to all matters of the above-captioned case and requests that this case be assigned to another member of the Court. Judge Arthur J. Schwab recused. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 11/17/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lar)
November 17, 2023 Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy added. (bjr)
November 16, 2023 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:23-cv-02033. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the alternative, Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Doc. No. #6 ) is GRANTED IN PART in that the Court grants Defendant's motion to transfer venue. This action is properly transferred to the Pittsburgh Division of the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to effect the transfer. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/9/2023. (las)
September 15, 2023 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2023 re MOTION to Dismiss/General, MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by MAXmotive, LLC. #6 . Matter submitted. Written order to issue. (Court Reporter Lynne Krenz) (las)
August 17, 2023 Filing 18 Declaration of Lisa B. Ellingson in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by MAXmotive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) C, #2 Exhibit(s) D)(Ellingson, Lisa)
August 17, 2023 Filing 17 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. REFILED, SEE #18 // Declaration of Lisa B. Ellingson in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by MAXmotive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) C, #2 Exhibit(s) D)(Ellingson, Lisa) Modified text on 8/17/2023 (ACH).
August 17, 2023 Filing 16 Reply to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by MAXmotive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ellingson, Lisa)
August 3, 2023 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Change Venue #6 Motion to Dismiss/General, Motion to Transfer/Change Venue. (Daniels, Christopher)
August 3, 2023 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Richard LeRoy in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Richard LeRoy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-E)(Daniels, Christopher)
August 3, 2023 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Christopher M. Daniels in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Richard LeRoy.(Daniels, Christopher)
August 3, 2023 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Richard LeRoy. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Daniels, Christopher)
July 13, 2023 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by MAXmotive, LLC.(Dayhoff, Aimee)
July 13, 2023 Filing 10 Declaration of Robert W. Maxwell in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by MAXmotive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Dayhoff, Aimee)
July 13, 2023 Filing 9 Declaration of Lisa B. Ellingson in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by MAXmotive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Dayhoff, Aimee)
July 13, 2023 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by MAXmotive, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dayhoff, Aimee)
July 13, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue : Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Dayhoff, Aimee)
July 13, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General , MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by MAXmotive, LLC. (Dayhoff, Aimee)
July 12, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Richard LeRoy. (Daniels, Christopher)
July 12, 2023 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for MAXmotive, LLC. (Dayhoff, Aimee)
July 6, 2023 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 23-cv-2033 DWF/ECW.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMG)
July 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tenth District of Minnesota, case number 71-CV-23-708 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10390117) filed by MAXmotive, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Aimee D. Dayhoff, #3 Exhibit(s) Declaration of David Maxwell, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Dayhoff, Aimee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeRoy v. MAXmotive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard LeRoy
Represented By: Christopher M Daniels
Represented By: Nathaniel Richard Greene
Represented By: James A Bumgardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXmotive, LLC
Represented By: Aimee D Dayhoff
Represented By: Lisa B Ellingson
Represented By: Mark C. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?