RIMEL v. ALABAMA JANITORIAL & PAPER SUPPLY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE V. RIMEL
Defendant: ALABAMA JANITORIAL & PAPER SUPPLY, LLC, ALJAN PAPER SUPPLY, AMAZING PRODUCTS, INC., FIRST AND FOREMOST TRADING, LLC and WALMART, INC.
Case Number: 2:2023cv02020
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Referring Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 21 BRIEF in Support re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by AMAZING PRODUCTS, INC. (Ober, Russell)
January 2, 2024 Filing 20 BRIEF in Opposition re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by STEPHANIE V. RIMEL. (D'Amico, Anthony)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts I, III, IV, V and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint by AMAZING PRODUCTS, INC. Plaintiff's Response to Motion due by 1/23/2024, with brief limited to twenty (20) pages; and Defendant's Reply due by 2/6/2024, with brief limited to five (5) pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/22/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
December 21, 2023 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by WALMART, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Retailer Agreement) (Murphy, G. Richard)
December 21, 2023 Filing 17 BRIEF in Support re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AMAZING PRODUCTS, INC. (Ober, Russell) Modified text on 1/11/2024. (ept)
December 21, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts I, III, IV, V and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint by AMAZING PRODUCTS, INC. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ober, Russell). Modified text on 12/21/2023. (dmh)
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement identifying A.P. Holding, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by AMAZING PRODUCTS, INC. (Ober, Russell)
December 15, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STEPHANIE V. RIMEL re #8 Clerk's Entry of Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (D'Amico, Anthony)
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement identifying A.P. Holding, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by AMAZING PRODUCTS, INC. (Ober, Russell)
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by STEPHANIE V. RIMEL. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (D'Amico, Anthony)
December 11, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #9 Notice of Appearance, #10 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A AND identifying CITIZENSHIP pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 12/18/2023. (dmh)
December 8, 2023 Filing 11 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by AMAZING PRODUCTS, INC. Answer due from AMAZING PRODUCTS, INC. on 12/22/2023. (Ober, Russell)
December 8, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin D. Beck on behalf of AMAZING PRODUCTS, INC. (Beck, Justin)
December 8, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell J. Ober, Jr on behalf of AMAZING PRODUCTS, INC. (Ober, Russell)
December 6, 2023 Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy no longer assigned to case. (bjr)
December 6, 2023 Judge William S. Stickman presiding and Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy referred. (bjr)
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to FIRST AND FOREMOST TRADING, LLC (dmh)
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment against FIRST AND FOREMOST TRADING, LLC by STEPHANIE V. RIMEL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit for Default Judgment, #4 Proposed Order) (D'Amico, Anthony)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST by STEPHANIE V. RIMEL for entry of DEFAULT against FIRST AND FOREMOST TRADING, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A) (D'Amico, Anthony)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by WALMART, INC. (Murphy, G. Richard)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WALMART, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Murphy, G. Richard)
November 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/24/2023. (cmc)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by WALMART, INC. (sms)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-23-012468. Copies attached: Complaint, Praecipe for Appearance (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7994149), filed by WALMART, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (sms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIMEL v. ALABAMA JANITORIAL & PAPER SUPPLY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALABAMA JANITORIAL & PAPER SUPPLY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALJAN PAPER SUPPLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZING PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Russell J. Ober, Jr.
Represented By: Justin D. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST AND FOREMOST TRADING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART, INC.
Represented By: G. Richard Murphy
Represented By: Rebecca Sember Izsak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE V. RIMEL
Represented By: Anthony J. D'Amico
Represented By: Michael J. D'Amico
Represented By: Anthony D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?