STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. v. BEARDSLEY et al
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.
Defendant: ANDREW BEARDSLEY, MATTHEW BEARDSLEY and JOHN/JANE DOES COMPANIES, CORPORATIONS, PARTNERSHIPS (1-10)
Case Number: 2:2023cv02038
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Referring Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Motion for Reconsideration. ERROR: Document was not linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/20/2023. (lyk)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: Motions Practice. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/20/2023. (lyk)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (lyk)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that upon consideration of #10 Motion for Reconsideration filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO., said Motion is denied, as premature, and without prejudice to Plaintiff State Farm Fire & Casualty renewing its motion for consolidation after Defendants Andrew and Matthew Beardsley are joined and their positions as to consolidation are set forth in any renewed motion. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/11/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (de Luca, Daniel) Modified text on 12/22/2023 to add document linkage. (ept)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Wirth on behalf of STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. (Wirth, Amy)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. ANDREW BEARDSLEY served on 12/7/2023, answer due 12/28/2023. (de Luca, Daniel)
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. MATTHEW BEARDSLEY served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (de Luca, Daniel)
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ANDREW BEARDSLEY, MATTHEW BEARDSLEY filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. (de Luca, Daniel) Modified text on 12/8/2023. (cel)
December 8, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Amended Complaint. ERROR: Answer deadlines set on amended complaint without proof of service for original complaint. CORRECTION: Clerk of Court terminated answer deadlines. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing without prejudice #1 Complaint, filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.; denying as moot #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint by December 13, 2023 curing the deficiencies outlined here or the case will be closed. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/6/2023. (lyk)
December 5, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (de Luca, Daniel)
December 5, 2023 Judge Nora Barry Fischer added. Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly no longer assigned to case. (bjr)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 As detailed in the accompanying Order, given that motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 are discouraged if the pleading defect is curable by amendment, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of any Rule 12 motion, including motions for judgment on the pleadings under Rule 12(c), to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, Rule 12 motions must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that the moving party has made a good faith effort to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. Rule 12 motions that do not contain the required certification will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/4/2023. (ert)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ANDREW BEARDSLEY (cel)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW BEARDSLEY, MATTHEW BEARDSLEY, JOHN/JANE DOES COMPANIES, CORPORATIONS, PARTNERSHIPS (1-10) (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7999931), filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. v. BEARDSLEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: Daniel J. de Luca
Represented By: Amy Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW BEARDSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW BEARDSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES COMPANIES, CORPORATIONS, PARTNERSHIPS (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?