KODENKANDETH v. BLIND & VISION REHABILITATION OF PITTSBURGH et al
Plaintiff: JOHN F. KODENKANDETH and John F Kodenkandeth
Defendant: BLIND & VISION REHABILITATION OF PITTSBURGH, MS. ERIKA PETACH, EVERETT & HURITE and HIGHMARK HEALTH
Case Number: 2:2023cv02051
Filed: December 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2024 Filing 39 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike to #35 Motion to Strike, filed by EVERETT & HURITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, #2 Certificate of Service to Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike) (Derner, Mark)
January 29, 2024 Filing 38 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #34 Motion to Strike, filed by BLIND & VISION REHABILITATION OF PITTSBURGH, ERIKA PETACH. (Purcell, Lauren)
January 29, 2024 Filing 37 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #32 Motion to Strike, #36 Motion to Strike, filed by HIGHMARK HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Allegretto, Alessandra)
January 23, 2024 Filing 36 MOTION to Strike #15 , #16 , and #29 by John F Kodenkandeth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kodenkandeth, John) Edited document links. Modified text on 1/29/2024. (cww)
January 23, 2024 Filing 35 MOTION to Strike #12 , #13 , and #30 by John F Kodenkandeth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kodenkandeth, John) Edited document links. Modified text on 1/29/2024. (cww)
January 23, 2024 Filing 34 MOTION to Strike #9 , #10 , and #31 by John F Kodenkandeth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kodenkandeth, John) Edited document links. Modified text on 1/29/2024. (cww)
January 23, 2024 Filing 33 BRIEF in Support of #32 MOTION to Strike #1 filed by John F Kodenkandeth. (Kodenkandeth, John) Modified text on 1/29/2024. (cww)
January 23, 2024 Filing 32 MOTION to Strike #1 by John F Kodenkandeth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kodenkandeth, John) Edited document link. Modified text on 1/29/2024. (cww)
January 19, 2024 Filing 31 REPLY BRIEF re #28 Response in Opposition filed by BLIND & VISION REHABILITATION OF PITTSBURGH, ERIKA PETACH. (Purcell, Lauren)
January 19, 2024 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendant Everett & Hurite's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint] filed by EVERETT & HURITE. (Derner, Mark)
January 19, 2024 Filing 29 REPLY BRIEF re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HIGHMARK HEALTH. (Allegretto, Alessandra)
January 14, 2024 Filing 28 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION Response to 25, 26, 27 filed by John F Kodenkandeth. (Kodenkandeth, John) Modified text to add links to #25 , #26 , #27 on 1/18/2024. (keh)
January 8, 2024 Filing 27 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #22 Motion to Remand, filed by BLIND & VISION REHABILITATION OF PITTSBURGH, ERIKA PETACH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Proposed Order) (Purcell, Lauren)
January 8, 2024 Filing 26 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #22 Motion to Remand, filed by HIGHMARK HEALTH. (Allegretto, Alessandra)
January 4, 2024 Filing 25 BRIEF in Opposition re #22 Motion to Remand filed by EVERETT & HURITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service) (Derner, Mark)
December 29, 2023 Filing 24 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #19 Motion to Stay, filed by HIGHMARK HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Allegretto, Alessandra)
December 27, 2023 Filing 23 BRIEF in Support of #22 MOTION to Remand Remand 2051 filed by John F Kodenkandeth. (Kodenkandeth, John)
December 27, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand Remand 2051 by John F Kodenkandeth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kodenkandeth, John)
December 22, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STAY ALL DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS REMOVED COMPLAINT re #19 Motion to Stay filed by BLIND & VISION REHABILITATION OF PITTSBURGH, ERIKA PETACH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit :C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Proposed Order) (Purcell, Lauren) Modified text to add link on 12/27/2023. (keh)
December 22, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Stay AGAINST DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed by EVERETT & HURITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service) (Derner, Mark)
December 19, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #19 Motion to Stay. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (keh)
December 18, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay AGAINST #12 DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS by John F Kodenkandeth. (Kodenkandeth, John) Modified text to add link on 12/19/2023. (keh)
December 14, 2023 Filing 18 STIPULATION by John F Kodenkandeth. (Kodenkandeth, John)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Response re #15 Motion to Dismiss. Consistent with the undersigned's Practices and Procedures, Plaintiff's response is due by 12/27/2023. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in this case, the parties must file a stipulation consenting to such jurisdiction on or before 12/18/2023. If any party declines to consent, no stipulation or other filing is required. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/8/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
December 8, 2023 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by HIGHMARK HEALTH. (Allegretto, Alessandra)
December 8, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by HIGHMARK HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Allegretto, Alessandra)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Response re #9 and #12 Motions to Dismiss. Consistent with the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/content/cathy-bissoon-district-judge), Plaintiff JOHN F. KODENKANDETH's response is due by 12/27/2023. All future motions in this case will be governed by the undersigned's Practices and Procedures, and no briefing schedule will issue. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/8/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, [Defendant Everett & Hurite's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint] filed by EVERETT & HURITE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Letter Signature Receiving Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service to Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (Derner, Mark)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendant Everett & Hurite's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint] by EVERETT & HURITE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Proposed Order to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (Derner, Mark)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT CERTIFICATE OF MOVANT by BLIND & VISION REHABILITATION OF PITTSBURGH, ERIKA PETACH. Amendment to #9 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Purcell, Lauren)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BLIND & VISION REHABILITATION OF PITTSBURGH, ERIKA PETACH. (Purcell, Lauren) Modified text on 12/8/2023. (keh)
December 7, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BLIND & VISION REHABILITATION OF PITTSBURGH, ERIKA PETACH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Proposed Order) (Purcell, Lauren) Modified text to correct event type on 12/8/2023. (keh)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by EVERETT & HURITE. (Macerelli, Joseph)
December 6, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Derner on behalf of EVERETT & HURITE. (Derner, Mark)
December 6, 2023 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 12/13/2023. (keh)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by BLIND & VISION REHABILITATION OF PITTSBURGH, ERIKA PETACH. (Purcell, Lauren)
December 5, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Macerelli on behalf of EVERETT & HURITE. (Macerelli, Joseph)
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E. Purcell on behalf of BLIND & VISION REHABILITATION OF PITTSBURGH, ERIKA PETACH. (Purcell, Lauren)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER governing procedures for motions filed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. See contents of this filing for instructions. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/4/2023. (jmm)
December 4, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Highmark Health as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by HIGHMARK HEALTH. (sdp)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny Court, case number GD-23-12812 Copies attached: state court record ( Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, ), filed by HIGHMARK HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit STATE COURT RECORD, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KODENKANDETH v. BLIND & VISION REHABILITATION OF PITTSBURGH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN F. KODENKANDETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F Kodenkandeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLIND & VISION REHABILITATION OF PITTSBURGH
Represented By: Lauren E. Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. ERIKA PETACH
Represented By: Lauren E. Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERETT & HURITE
Represented By: Joseph A. Macerelli
Represented By: Mark Derner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGHMARK HEALTH
Represented By: Alessandra Allegretto
Represented By: William J. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?