REHWALD v. SCI GREENE
Plaintiff: PHILLIP REHWALD
Defendant: SCI GREENE
Case Number: 2:2024cv00044
Filed: January 9, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Filing 11 Remark: Correspondence to the Court from PHILLIP REHWALD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kss)
March 4, 2024 Filing 10 Appendix W to #1 Complaint by PHILLIP REHWALD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sms)
February 26, 2024 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by PHILLIP REHWALD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kss)
February 26, 2024 Filing 8 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by PHILLIP REHWALD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kss)
February 26, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PHILLIP REHWALD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kss)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing Video Conference Hearings and No ATAs as it relates to this action. The motion is denied as premature. Plaintiff has not yet addressed the items identified in the deficiency order, ECF No. 2. A copy of this order will be mailed to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 2/15/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen)
February 8, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for [Polycom/Skype] Video Conference Hearing[s] and No A.T.A. for all Proceedings by PHILLIP REHWALD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kss)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to comply with deficiency order. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time until March 6, 2024 to address the deficiencies. The motion for additional library time is denied. A copy of this order will be mailed to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 2/6/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen)
February 2, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Extend Law Library Time, MOTION for Extension of Time re #2 Deficiency Order, by PHILLIP REHWALD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kss)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER: Submission of required paperwork due by 2/16/2024. The Clerk is directed to mark this CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. As more fully stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 1/16/2024. Copy mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form, #2 Consent Form, #3 Form Complaint) (dad)
January 9, 2024 Filing 1 Remark: Complaint lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2024: #2 Exhibits) (ept).
January 9, 2024 Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (kss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REHWALD v. SCI GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP REHWALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?