PETERMAN et al v. PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: RAYMOND PETERMAN, CAROL PETERMAN and CAROLE PETERMAN
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2024cv00185
Filed: February 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 3/29/2024; Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2024; Joinder of Parties due by 4/30/2024; Discovery due by 7/16/2024: Status report due by 7/22/2024; Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 7/29/2024 at 09:00 AM in Video Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/18/2024. (bjl)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Andrew F. Szefi is appointed as mediator. Party ANDREW F. SZEFI added. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/18/2024. (bjl)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER By Stipulation of the parties during the Initial Case Management Conference, the caption is hereby amended to correct the Defendant's name from Progressive Insurance Company to Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/18/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/18/2024. (bjl)
March 18, 2024 Filing 11 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/18/2024. Orders on Case Management, 502d, and ADR to follow. (Court Reporter: Marsia Balobek) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
March 13, 2024 Filing 10 MICROSOFT TEAMS AUDIO CONFERENCING SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES - Every telephonic conference conducted will be via a Microsoft Teams Audio Conferencing call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide a conference ID. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled, you will be instructed to refer back to this notice. This document has a security setting of Case Participants Only, so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jgb)
March 11, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Twilla, Daniel)
March 11, 2024 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Twilla, Daniel)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Initial Case Management set for 3/18/2024 at 10:00 AM ; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/11/2024. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (bjl)
February 23, 2024 Filing 6 Errata re #4 Answer to Complaint by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. Reason for Correction: Filing error. (Twilla, Daniel)
February 22, 2024 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (kss)
February 21, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Agency Holdings, Inc., The Progressive Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Murdock, Adam) Modified text on 2/22/2024. (kss)
February 20, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Murdock, Adam) Errata filed at #6 . Modified text on 2/23/2024. (bjr)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE available #Here. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/16/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
February 15, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Ramaley on behalf of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Ramaley, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2024 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 2/22/2024. (elt)
February 13, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-23-012471 Copies attached: Original Complaint, Writ of Summons, Acceptance of Service, Entry of Appearance, (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8113624), filed by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (elt)
February 13, 2024 Judge Marilyn J. Horan added. (elt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PETERMAN et al v. PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND PETERMAN
Represented By: Walter J. Nalducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL PETERMAN
Represented By: Walter J. Nalducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLE PETERMAN
Represented By: Walter J. Nalducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ramaley
Represented By: Adam Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?