MARTIN v. JLE INDUSTRIES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RICK MARTIN
Defendant: JLE INDUSTRIES, LLC, JLE EQUIPMENT LEASING, LLC and EVAN POHASKI
Case Number: 2:2024cv00326
Filed: March 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Consent MOTION for Protective Order (Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Order) by RICK MARTIN. The Court enters this Confidentiality Order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(c), as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 4/9/2024. (cmc)
April 8, 2024 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Protective Order (Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Order) by RICK MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Savytska, Olena)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion of Attorney Harold Lichten to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/27/2024. (map)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion of Attorney Olea Savytska to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/27/2024. (map)
March 27, 2024 Filing 12 Proposed Order re #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RICK MARTIN. (Lichten, Harold)
March 27, 2024 Filing 11 Proposed Order re #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RICK MARTIN. (Savytska, Olena)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing that to the extent that counsel seek pro hac vice admission before this Court, they are reminded that they must be familiar with and adhere to the Local Civil Rules. Notice is hereby given that the pending motions for admission pro hac vice will not be considered until counsel comply with Local Civil Rule 7.D. and file a proposed order for each motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/26/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen)
March 26, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Harold Lichten to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8182371) by RICK MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Lichten, Harold)
March 26, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Olena Savytska to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8182331) by RICK MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Savytska, Olena)
March 26, 2024 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order, which is required for all motions in civil cases per Local Rule LCvR7, was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (jkn)
March 20, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICK MARTIN. JLE INDUSTRIES, LLC waiver sent on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Schalman-Bergen, Sarah)
March 20, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICK MARTIN. JLE EQUIPMENT LEASING, LLC waiver sent on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Schalman-Bergen, Sarah)
March 20, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICK MARTIN. EVAN POHASKI waiver sent on 3/20/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Schalman-Bergen, Sarah)
March 14, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JLE EQUIPMENT LEASING, LLC, JLE INDUSTRIES, LLC, EVAN POHASKI (Attachments: #1 Summons JLE Industries, LLC, #2 Summons Pohaski) (jkn)
March 13, 2024 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by RICK MARTIN (Attachments: #1 Summons JLE Indus, #2 Summons JLE Equip Leasing, #3 Summons Pohaski) (Schalman-Bergen, Sarah)
March 13, 2024 Filing 2 CORRECTIVE ENTRY re #1 Complaint, Reason for Correction: Taking exhibit out of complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jkn)
March 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JLE EQUIPMENT LEASING, LLC, JLE INDUSTRIES, LLC, EVAN POHASKI (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8159000), filed by RICK MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jkn) Complaint restricted, refiled at #2 . Modified text on 3/13/2024. (jkn)
March 12, 2024 Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (jkn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTIN v. JLE INDUSTRIES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICK MARTIN
Represented By: Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Harold Lichten
Represented By: Olena Savytska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLE INDUSTRIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLE EQUIPMENT LEASING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVAN POHASKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?