BOYINGTON v. PERCHERON FIELD SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff: ERIC BOYINGTON
Defendant: PERCHERON FIELD SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv00090
Filed: May 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Johnstown Office
County: Blair
Presiding Judge: Kim R. Gibson
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 243 Motion to Reopen Discovery Regarding Newly-Acquired Evidence and Compel Discovery Responses, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 11/21/2017. (dlg)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER - upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 193 ) and for the reasons set forth in the Memorandum Opinion accompanying this order, it is HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiffs&# 039; Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 193 ) is GRANTED to the extent it asks for summary judgment regarding the judicial admission made by Defendant and precludes the affirmative defense of the existence of an overtime exemption prior to December 31, 2014. However, this grant of summary judgment applies only to Eric Boyington and the current opt-in Plaintiffs. 2. Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 193 ) is also GRANTED in regard to the Second Affirmative Defense of the Amended Answer and dismisses the Second Affirmative Defense with prejudice. 3. Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED in all other regards, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion & Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 11/8/2017. (dlg)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 213 Motion to Compel; denying 214 Motion to Dismiss, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 4/12/2017. (dlg)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 176 Motion to Compel, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/14/2016. (krh)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion for Sanctions, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 5/12/2016. (dlg)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - upon consideration of Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration or, in the alternative, for Permission to File an Interlocutory Appeal (ECF No. 111 ), and for the reasons set forth in the accompanying memorandum, it is hereby Ordered that Defendant's motion is DENIED, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 3/24/2016. (dlg)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 45 Motion to Certify Class and to facilitate notice, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/15/2015. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOYINGTON v. PERCHERON FIELD SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC BOYINGTON
Represented By: Joseph H. Chivers
Represented By: John R. Linkosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERCHERON FIELD SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?