WESTPORT INSURANCE CORPORATION v. HIPPO FLEMING & PERTILE LAW OFFICES et al
Plaintiff: |
WESTPORT INSURANCE CORPORATION |
Defendant: |
HIPPO FLEMING & PERTILE LAW OFFICES and CHARLES WAYNE HIPPO, JR. |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00251 |
Filed: |
September 29, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Johnstown Office |
County: |
Blair |
Presiding Judge: |
Kim R. Gibson |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 1, 2018 |
Filing
95
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - upon consideration of the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment (ECF Nos. [80, 85 ) and for the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Westport's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 80 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Westport's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted with respect to Count I for declaratory judgment and is denied in all other respects. It is further ordered that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 85 ) is DENIED, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/1/2018. (dlg)
|
March 7, 2017 |
Filing
66
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Compel. The motion is granted with respect to the underwriting materials and Westport is ordered to produce the underwriting file and manual. The motion is denied with respect to the personnel files. It is further Ordered that Westport's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 57 is Granted and Westport has 10 days to file its amended complaint, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 3/7/2017. (dlg)
|
April 28, 2016 |
Filing
36
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. It is further Ordered that a Status Conference is scheduled for 5/11/2016, at 11:30 a.m., and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 4/28/2016. (dlg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?