WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. v. CARNELL et al

Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Defendant: JEFFREY A. CARNELL, ANNA M. CARNELL, RYAN P. JAY and LARRY E. JAY
Case Number: 3:2016cv00130
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Johnstown Office
County: Bedford
Presiding Judge: Kim R. Gibson
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1) FINAL JUDGMENT is HEREBY ENTERED against Defendant Jeffrey A. Carnell and Defendant Anna M. Carnell on Count I and Count II of Wells Fa rgo Bank N.A.'s Complaint. 2) It is HEREBY DETERMINED AND DECLARED that Defendant Jeffrey A. Carnell and Defendant Anna M. Carnell are bound to the 2009 Wells Fargo Mortgage, recorded on April 7, 2009 in record book 1273, page 389 with the Bedf ord County Recorder of Deeds. 3) It is HEREBY DETERMINED AND DECLARED that the 2009 Wells Fargo Mortgage validly encumbers Defendant Jeffrey A. Carnell and Defendant Anna M. Carnell's full interest in the Property described therein (4139 Elk Li ck Road, Everett, PA 15537, parcel number F11-19) as a mortgage lien. 4) The Bedford County Recorder of Deeds is HEREBY DIRECTED to record a copy of this Memorandum Opinion and Order to reflect the Court's determination in this matter. 5) The Bedford County Recorder of Deeds is HEREBY DIRECTED to make an appropriate notation in the relevant mortgage index to further reflect the Court's determination in this matter, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/14/2018. (dlg)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - upon consideration of Ryan P. Jay and Larry E. Jay's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (ECF No. 48 ), and for the reasons in the Memorandum Opinion accompanying this Order, it is HEREBY ORDERED that Ryan P. Jay and Larry E. Jay's Motion (ECF No. 48 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, Jeffrey A. Camell's crossclaim against Ryan P. Jay and Larry E. Jay c ontained in the Answer and Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaim, and Crossclaim by Defendant Jeffrey A. Camell (ECF No. 39 Paragraphs 79-92) is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is to terminate Ryan P. Jay and Larry E. Jay as parties to this case on the docket, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 4/19/2018. (dlg)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, it is Ordered that all claims brought in Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Complaint, (ECF No. 1 ) against Defendant Ryan P. Jay and Defendant Larry E. Jay are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 2/15/2018. (dlg)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 40 Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaim. Accordingly, Jeffrey A. Camell's Counterclaim against Wells Fargo contained in the Answer and Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaim, and Crossclaim by Defendant Jeffrey A. Camell (ECF No. 39 , Paragraphs 70-78) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 2/12/2018. (dlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. v. CARNELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Grant G. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY A. CARNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNA M. CARNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN P. JAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY E. JAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?