HAY v. SOMERSET AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Plaintiff: HEATHER HAY
Defendant: SOMERSET AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Case Number: 3:2016cv00229
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Johnstown Office
County: Somerset
Presiding Judge: Kim R. Gibson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Sign Unaltered Medical Authorizations. SASD's Motion is denied insofar as Plaintiff will not be required to sign the release form that SASD prev iously sent to Plaintiff (i.e. the release form that referred to Plaintiff's "health information"). However, Plaintiff is ORDERED to create amended release forms that specify the scope of the release as "written information, writt en notes, and written records only--no oral communications." Plaintiff is ORDERED to sign the amended release form and return it to SASD to facilitate SASD's timely receipt of the medical and mental health records SASD seeks; denying 60 Motion to Compel Stipulation of Confidentiality and to Compel the Return of Inadvertently Produced Un-redacted Documents, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 12/11/2017. (dlg)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER - upon consideration of Third-Party Defendant's Motion to Strike Complaint to Join Third-Party Defendant (ECF No. 29 ), and in accordance with the foregoing Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby Ordered that Third-Party De fendant's motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant's Third-Party Claim against the Third-Party Defendant IS HEREBY DISMISSED with prejudice, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion & Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/31/2017. (dlg)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 36 Motion to Compel; denying 45 Motion to Strike, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/29/2017. (dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAY v. SOMERSET AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER HAY
Represented By: Joel J. Feller
Represented By: Gregory Haroutounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOMERSET AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Anthony G. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?