PROFESSIONAL, INC. v. FIRST CHOICE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: PROFESSIONAL, INC.
Defendant: DONEGAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, MUTUAL BENEFIT INSURANCE COMPANY, USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PENN NATIONAL SECURITY INSURANCE CO., HARLEYSVILLE INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FIRST CHOICE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, AGENCY INSURANCE COMPANY OF MARYLAND, MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOODVILLE MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY, HORACE MANN INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE AUTO MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, METROPOLITAN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, AAA MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE, ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, MMG INSURANCE COMPANY, SAFE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY, HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, KEMPER FINANCIAL INDEMNITY COMPANY and AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2017cv00170
Filed: September 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Johnstown Office
County: Blair
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2018 Remark: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Western has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 6:18-cv-06023, filed 02/01/18. (jjg)
February 1, 2018 Remark: Case electronically transferred to USDC - Middle Florida. (jjg)
January 31, 2018 Filing 92 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Middle District of Florida. (jjg)
January 30, 2018 Filing 91 Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (jjg)
January 18, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Koch on behalf of CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Koch, Nicholas)
December 22, 2017 Filing 89 BRIEF in Opposition re #86 Motion for Joinder, filed by PENN NATIONAL SECURITY INSURANCE CO.. (Foland, Brooks)
December 22, 2017 Filing 88 RESPONSE to Motion re #86 MOTION for Joinder of Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company and Founders Insurance Company AS ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS filed by PENN NATIONAL SECURITY INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Foland, Brooks)
December 1, 2017 Filing 87 BRIEF in Support re #86 Motion for Joinder, of Pa National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company and Founders Insurance Company AS ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS filed by PROFESSIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Huff, James)
December 1, 2017 Filing 86 MOTION for Joinder of Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company and Founders Insurance Company AS ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS by PROFESSIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sheriff Service, #2 Exhibit Penn National Website, #3 Exhibit Pa. Insurance Commission Website, #4 Exhibit NJ Dept of Banking & Insurance Website, #5 Affidavit, #6 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Huff, James)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Michael H. Carpenter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 11/17/2017. (dlg)
November 14, 2017 Filing 84 MOTION for attorney Michael H. Carpenter to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4529681) by HARLEYSVILLE INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael H. Carpenter, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Carpenter, Michael)
October 30, 2017 Filing 83 Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate by PROFESSIONAL, INC. (Huff, James) Modified on 10/31/2017. (cel)
October 30, 2017 Filing 82 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Kemper Financial Indemnity Company by PROFESSIONAL, INC.. (Huff, James)
October 25, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Meyers on behalf of HARLEYSVILLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Meyers, Matthew)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Michael E. Mumford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/25/2017. (dlg)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Ernest E. Vargo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/25/2017. (dlg)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #76 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard L. McMonigle, Jr. terminated. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/25/2017. (dlg)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patricia A. Monahan terminated. Richard L. McMonigle, Jr. and Steven J. Schildt are successor counsel for USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/25/2017. (dlg)
October 18, 2017 Filing 76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Richard L. McMonigle, Esquire as counsel for USAA Casualty Insurance Company by USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McMonigle, Richard)
October 17, 2017 Filing 75 MOTION for attorney Michael E. Mumford to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4499103) by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, STATE AUTO MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Mumford, Michael)
October 17, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION for attorney Ernest E. Vargo to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4499083) by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, STATE AUTO MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Vargo, Ernest)
October 17, 2017 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #61 Notice of Substitution of Attorney, Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY and NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE. The event "Notice of Substition" may only be used by attorneys within the same firm. This message is for informational purposes only. This document was re-docketed as a Motion by the Clerk(cel) Modified on 10/17/2017. (cel)
October 16, 2017 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay B. Andreuzzi on behalf of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Andreuzzi, Lindsay)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Stay. It is further Ordered that any and all deadlines and proceedings in this action are STAYED until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether this Action will be transferred and consolidated with the Auto Body Shop MDL. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/16/2017. (dlg)
October 16, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Schildt on behalf of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Schildt, Steven)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #63 Motion for David Yohai to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/16/2017. (dlg)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Tracy A. Ederer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/16/2017. (dlg)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #64 Motion for John P. Mastando to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/16/2017. (dlg)
October 13, 2017 Filing 67 BRIEF in Support re #66 Motion to Stay Pending Transfer Decision by JPML filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hall, John)
October 13, 2017 Filing 66 Renewed MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer Decision by JPML by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hall, John)
October 13, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION for attorney Tracy A. Ederer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4495444) by 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tracy A. Ederer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Ederer, Tracy)
October 13, 2017 Filing 64 MOTION for attorney John P. Mastando III to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4495406) by 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John P. Mastando III, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Mastando, John)
October 13, 2017 Filing 63 MOTION for attorney David Yohai to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4495306) by 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Yohai, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Yohai, David)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re #60 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Safe Auto Insurance Company filed by SAFE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY - it is Ordered, Directed and Decreed that the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Safe Auto Insurance Company is granted and the Clerk of Courts will close this case as to Defendant Safe Auto Insurance Company only. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/13/2017. (dlg)
October 13, 2017 Filing 61 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Patricia A. Monahan on behalf of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. McMonigle, Jr on behalf of USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (McMonigle, Richard) Modified on 10/17/2017. (cel)
October 11, 2017 Filing 60 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by SAFE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Maierhofer, Mary)
October 11, 2017 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lou Maierhofer on behalf of SAFE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. (Maierhofer, Mary)
October 11, 2017 Filing 58 STIPULATION of Dismissal by MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (McDonnell, Thomas)
October 10, 2017 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Gable, Jr on behalf of HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Gable, Richard)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER - upon the determination of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that this case is not appropriate for inclusion in multidistrict litigation, it is HEREBY ORDERED that the stay ordered on September 28, 2017 (ECF No. #49 ) is LIFTED. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 10/6/2017. (dlg)
October 5, 2017 Filing 55 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Agency Insurance Company of Maryland only by PROFESSIONAL, INC.. (Huff, James)
October 4, 2017 Filing 54 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Metropolitan General Insurance Company only by PROFESSIONAL, INC.. (Huff, James)
October 2, 2017 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #41 Motion to Stay. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised that, in the future, documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
September 29, 2017 Filing 52 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Maine Mutual Insurance Company Only by PROFESSIONAL, INC.. (Huff, James)
September 29, 2017 Filing 51 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Meyers, Matthew)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Errata to #26 Motion for Mark L. Hanover to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 9/29/2017. (dlg)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Stay and it is hereby further ORDERED that any and all deadlines and proceedings in this Action are STAYED until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether this Action will be transferred and consolidated with the Auto Body Shop MDL. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 9/28/2017. (dlg)
September 28, 2017 Filing 48 Errata re #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. Reason for Correction: Wrong Filer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service) (Hanover, Mark)
September 27, 2017 Filing 53 BRIEF in Support re #41 Motion to Stay filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. This document was previously filed electronically. (cel) Modified on 10/4/2017. (cel)
September 27, 2017 Filing 47 Disclosure Statement identifying Cincinnati Financial Corporation (NASDAQ: CINF) as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Jenkins, Andrew)
September 27, 2017 Filing 46 JOINDER of HORACE MANN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Sysak, Andrew)
September 27, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Jenkins on behalf of CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Jenkins, Andrew)
September 27, 2017 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (McDonnell, Thomas)
September 27, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Meyers on behalf of NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Meyers, Matthew)
September 27, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Sysak on behalf of HORACE MANN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Sysak, Andrew)
September 27, 2017 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER DECISION BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 This attachment has been removed from public view, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order) (Hall, John) Modified on 10/2/2017. (cel)
September 27, 2017 Filing 40 JOINDER of NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY to #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1.1, #3 Exhibit 1.2, #4 Exhibit 1.3, #5 Exhibit 1.4, #6 Exhibit 1.5, #7 Exhibit 1.6, #8 Exhibit 1.7, #9 Exhibit 1.8, #10 Exhibit 1.9, #11 Exhibit 1.10, #12 Exhibit 1.11, #13 Exhibit 1.12, #14 Exhibit 1.13, #15 Exhibit 1.14, #16 Exhibit 1.15) (Meyers, Matthew)
September 26, 2017 Filing 39 Errata re #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. Reason for Correction: Wrong Filer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service) (Lau, Bonnie)
September 26, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks R. Foland on behalf of PENN NATIONAL SECURITY INSURANCE CO.. (Foland, Brooks)
September 26, 2017 Filing 37 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY Answer due from ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO. on 10/30/2017; ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; AGENCY INSURANCE COMPANY OF MARYLAND on 10/30/2017; AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY on 10/30/2017; CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; DONEGAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE on 10/30/2017; GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY on 10/30/2017; HARLEYSVILLE INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; HORACE MANN INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; KEMPER FINANCIAL INDEMNITY COMPANY on 10/30/2017; LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; METROPOLITAN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; PENN NATIONAL SECURITY INSURANCE CO. on 10/30/2017; SAFE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA on 10/30/2017; STATE AUTO MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017; USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY on 10/30/2017. (Hall, John)
September 26, 2017 Filing 36 Errata re #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. Reason for Correction: Wrong Filer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service) (Fenton, Richard)
September 26, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by P. Gavin Eastgate on behalf of 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Eastgate, P.)
September 25, 2017 Filing 34 JOINDER of GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Tredwell, Scott) Modified on 9/26/2017. (cel)
September 25, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott J. Tredwell on behalf of GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Tredwell, Scott)
September 25, 2017 Filing 32 EXHIBITS 5 - AMENDED in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Hall, John)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Bonnie Lau to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 9/25/2017. (dlg)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Richard L. Fenton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 9/25/2017. (dlg)
September 25, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dlg)
September 25, 2017 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Martini, Mark)
September 22, 2017 Filing 27 ERROR: WRONG FILER; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; MOTION for attorney Bonnie Lau to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4472289) by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service) (Hall, John) Modified on 9/26/2017. (cel)
September 22, 2017 Filing 26 ERROR: WRONG FILER; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; MOTION for attorney Mark L. Hanover to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4472288) by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service) (Hall, John) Modified on 9/26/2017. (cel)
September 22, 2017 Filing 25 ERROR: WRONG FILER; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; MOTION for attorney Richard L. Fenton to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4472287) by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service) (Hall, John) Modified on 9/26/2017. (cel)
September 22, 2017 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement identifying The Allstate Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Hall, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-001, #3 Exhibit B-002, #4 Exhibit B-003, #5 Exhibit B-004) (Hall, John) Modified on 9/26/2017. (cel)
September 22, 2017 Filing 22 EXHIBITS 5 in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Hall, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 21 EXHIBITS 4, Part 050 in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-050-01, #2 Exhibit 4-050-02, #3 Exhibit 4-050-03, #4 Exhibit 4-050-04, #5 Exhibit 4-050-05, #6 Exhibit 4-050-06, #7 Exhibit 4-050-07, #8 Exhibit 4-050-08, #9 Exhibit 4-050-09, #10 Exhibit 4-050-10, #11 Exhibit 4-050-11, #12 Exhibit 4-050-12, #13 Exhibit 4-050-13, #14 Exhibit 4-050-14, #15 Exhibit 4-050-15, #16 Exhibit 4-050-16, #17 Exhibit 4-050-17, #18 Exhibit 4-050-18, #19 Exhibit 4-050-19) (Hall, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 20 EXHIBITS 4, Parts 045-049 in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-045-01, #2 Exhibit 4-045-02, #3 Exhibit 4-045-03, #4 Exhibit 4-046-01, #5 Exhibit 4-046-02, #6 Exhibit 4-046-03, #7 Exhibit 4-047-01, #8 Exhibit 4-047-02, #9 Exhibit 4-048-01, #10 Exhibit 4-048-02, #11 Exhibit 4-048-03, #12 Exhibit 4-048-04, #13 Exhibit 4-048-05, #14 Exhibit 4-048-06, #15 Exhibit 4-048-07, #16 Exhibit 4-048-08, #17 Exhibit 4-048-09, #18 Exhibit 4-048-10, #19 Exhibit 4-049-01, #20 Exhibit 4-049-02, #21 Exhibit 4-049-03, #22 Exhibit 4-049-04, #23 Exhibit 4-049-05, #24 Exhibit 4-049-06, #25 Exhibit 4-049-07, #26 Exhibit 4-049-08, #27 Exhibit 4-049-09, #28 Exhibit 4-049-10, #29 Exhibit 4-049-11, #30 Exhibit 4-049-12, #31 Exhibit 4-049-13, #32 Exhibit 4-049-14, #33 Exhibit 4-049-15, #34 Exhibit 4-049-16, #35 Exhibit 4-049-17, #36 Exhibit 4-049-18, #37 Exhibit 4-049-19, #38 Exhibit 4-049-20, #39 Exhibit 4-049-21, #40 Exhibit 4-049-22, #41 Exhibit 4-049-23, #42 Exhibit 4-049-24, #43 Exhibit 4-049-25) (Hall, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 19 EXHIBITS 4, Parts 042-044 in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-042-01, #2 Exhibit 4-042-02, #3 Exhibit 4-042-03, #4 Exhibit 4-042-04, #5 Exhibit 4-042-05, #6 Exhibit 4-042-06, #7 Exhibit 4-042-07, #8 Exhibit 4-042-08, #9 Exhibit 4-042-09, #10 Exhibit 4-042-10, #11 Exhibit 4-042-11, #12 Exhibit 4-042-12, #13 Exhibit 4-042-13, #14 Exhibit 4-042-14, #15 Exhibit 4-042-15, #16 Exhibit 4-042-16, #17 Exhibit 4-042-17, #18 Exhibit 4-042-18, #19 Exhibit 4-042-19, #20 Exhibit 4-042-20, #21 Envelope 4-042-21, #22 Exhibit 4-042-22, #23 Exhibit 4-042-23, #24 Exhibit 4-042-24, #25 Exhibit 4-042-25, #26 Exhibit 4-042-26, #27 Exhibit 4-043-01, #28 Exhibit 4-043-02, #29 Exhibit 4-043-03, #30 Exhibit 4-043-04, #31 Exhibit 4-043-05, #32 Exhibit 4-043-06, #33 Exhibit 4-043-07, #34 Exhibit 4-043-08, #35 Exhibit 4-043-09, #36 Exhibit 4-043-10, #37 Exhibit 4-043-11, #38 Exhibit 4-043-12, #39 Exhibit 4-043-13, #40 Exhibit 4-043-14, #41 Exhibit 4-043-15, #42 Exhibit 4-043-16, #43 Exhibit 4-043-17, #44 Exhibit 4-043-18, #45 Exhibit 4-043-19, #46 Exhibit 4-043-20, #47 Exhibit 4-043-21, #48 Exhibit 4-044) (Hall, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 18 EXHIBITS 4, Parts 040-041 in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-040-01, #2 Exhibit 4-040-02, #3 Exhibit 4-040-03, #4 Exhibit 4-040-04, #5 Exhibit 4-040-05, #6 Exhibit 4-040-06, #7 Exhibit 4-040-07, #8 Exhibit 4-040-08, #9 Exhibit 4-040-09, #10 Exhibit 4-040-10, #11 Exhibit 4-040-11, #12 Exhibit 4-040-12, #13 Exhibit 4-040-13, #14 Exhibit 4-040-14, #15 Exhibit 4-040-15, #16 Exhibit 4-040-16, #17 Exhibit 4-040-17, #18 Exhibit 4-040-18, #19 Exhibit 4-040-19, #20 Exhibit 4-040-20, #21 Exhibit 4-040-21, #22 Exhibit 4-040-22, #23 Exhibit 4-040-23, #24 Exhibit 4-040-24, #25 Exhibit 4-040-25, #26 Exhibit 4-040-26, #27 Exhibit 4-040-27, #28 Exhibit 4-040-28, #29 Exhibit 4-040-29, #30 Exhibit 4-041-01, #31 Exhibit 4-041-02, #32 Exhibit 4-041-03, #33 Exhibit 4-041-04, #34 Exhibit 4-041-05, #35 Exhibit 4-041-06, #36 Exhibit 4-041-07, #37 Exhibit 4-041-08, #38 Exhibit 4-041-09, #39 Exhibit 4-041-10, #40 Exhibit 4-041-11, #41 Exhibit 4-041-12, #42 Exhibit 4-041-13, #43 Exhibit 4-041-14, #44 Exhibit 4-041-15, #45 Exhibit 4-041-16, #46 Exhibit 4-041-17, #47 Exhibit 4-041-18, #48 Exhibit 4-041-19, #49 Exhibit 4-041-20, #50 Exhibit 4-041-21, #51 Exhibit 4-041-22, #52 Exhibit 4-041-23, #53 Exhibit 4-041-24, #54 Exhibit 4-041-25, #55 Exhibit 4-041-26, #56 Exhibit 4-041-27, #57 Exhibit 4-041-28) (Hall, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 17 EXHIBITS 4, Parts 033-039 in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-033-01, #2 Exhibit 4-033-02, #3 Exhibit 4-033-03, #4 Exhibit 4-033-04, #5 Exhibit 4-033-05, #6 Exhibit 4-033-06, #7 Exhibit 4-033-07, #8 Exhibit 4-033-08, #9 Exhibit 4-033-09, #10 Exhibit 4-033-10, #11 Exhibit 4-033-11, #12 Exhibit 4-033-12, #13 Exhibit 4-033-13, #14 Exhibit 4-033-14, #15 Exhibit 4-034-01, #16 Exhibit 4-034-02, #17 Exhibit 4-034-03, #18 Exhibit 4-034-04, #19 Exhibit 4-034-05, #20 Exhibit 4-034-06, #21 Exhibit 4-034-07, #22 Exhibit 4-034-08, #23 Exhibit 4-035-01, #24 Exhibit 4-035-02, #25 Exhibit 4-035-03, #26 Exhibit 4-035-04, #27 Exhibit 4-035-05, #28 Exhibit 4-035-06, #29 Exhibit 4-035-07, #30 Exhibit 4-035-08, #31 Exhibit 4-035-09, #32 Exhibit 4-036-01, #33 Exhibit 4-036-02, #34 Exhibit 4-037-01, #35 Exhibit 4-037-02, #36 Exhibit 4-038-01, #37 Exhibit 4-038-02, #38 Exhibit 4-038-03, #39 Exhibit 4-038-04, #40 Exhibit 4-039-01, #41 Exhibit 4-039-02, #42 Exhibit 4-039-03, #43 Exhibit 4-039-04) (Hall, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 16 JOINDER of CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Jenkins, Andrew) Modified on 9/26/2017. (cel)
September 22, 2017 Filing 15 EXHIBITS 4, Parts 030-032 in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-030-01, #2 Exhibit 4-030-02, #3 Exhibit 4-030-03, #4 Exhibit 4-030-04, #5 Exhibit 4-030-05, #6 Exhibit 4-030-06, #7 Exhibit 4-030-07, #8 Exhibit 4-030-08, #9 Exhibit 4-030-09, #10 Exhibit 4-030-10, #11 Exhibit 4-030-11, #12 Exhibit 4-030-12, #13 Exhibit 4-030-13, #14 Exhibit 4-030-14, #15 Exhibit 4-030-15, #16 Exhibit 4-030-16, #17 Exhibit 4-030-17, #18 Exhibit 4-030-18, #19 Exhibit 4-030-19, #20 Exhibit 4-030-20, #21 Exhibit 4-030-21, #22 Exhibit 4-030-22, #23 Exhibit 4-030-23, #24 Exhibit 4-030-24, #25 Exhibit 4-030-25, #26 Exhibit 4-030-26, #27 Exhibit 4-030-27, #28 Exhibit 4-030-28, #29 Exhibit 4-030-29, #30 Exhibit 4-030-30, #31 Exhibit 4-030-31, #32 Exhibit 4-030-32, #33 Exhibit 4-030-33, #34 Exhibit 4-030-34, #35 Exhibit 4-030-35, #36 Exhibit 4-030-36, #37 Exhibit 4-031-01, #38 Exhibit 4-031-02, #39 Exhibit 4-032-01, #40 Exhibit 4-032-02) (Hall, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Joinder as to #1 Notice of Removal, by USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Disclosure Statement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Monahan, Patricia)
September 22, 2017 Filing 13 EXHIBITS 4, Parts 001-029 in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-001-01, #2 Exhibit 4-001-02, #3 Exhibit 4-001-03, #4 Exhibit 4-001-04, #5 Exhibit 4-001-05, #6 Exhibit 4-001-06, #7 Exhibit 4-002-01, #8 Exhibit 4-002-02, #9 Exhibit 4-003, #10 Exhibit 4-004-01, #11 Exhibit 4-004-02, #12 Exhibit 4-004-03, #13 Exhibit 4-005, #14 Exhibit 4-006, #15 Exhibit 4-007, #16 Exhibit 4-008, #17 Exhibit 4-009, #18 Exhibit 4-010, #19 Exhibit 4-011, #20 Exhibit 4-012, #21 Exhibit 4-013, #22 Exhibit 4-014, #23 Exhibit 4-015, #24 Exhibit 4-016, #25 Exhibit 4-017, #26 Exhibit 4-018, #27 Exhibit 4-019, #28 Exhibit 4-020, #29 Exhibit 4-021, #30 Exhibit 4-022, #31 Exhibit 4-023, #32 Exhibit 4-024, #33 Exhibit 4-025, #34 Exhibit 4-026, #35 Exhibit 4-027, #36 Exhibit 4-028, #37 Exhibit 4-029-01, #38 Exhibit 4-029-02) (Hall, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 12 EXHIBITS 3 in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Hall, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 11 EXHIBITS 2, Parts 001-002 in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-001, #2 Exhibit 2-002) (Hall, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 10 EXHIBITS 1, Parts 051-107 in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-051, #2 Exhibit 1-052, #3 Exhibit 1-053, #4 Exhibit 1-054, #5 Exhibit 1-055, #6 Exhibit 1-056, #7 Exhibit 1-057, #8 Exhibit 1-058, #9 Exhibit 1-059, #10 Exhibit 1-060, #11 Exhibit 1-061, #12 Exhibit 1-062, #13 Exhibit 1-063, #14 Exhibit 1-064, #15 Exhibit 1-065, #16 Exhibit 1-066, #17 Exhibit 1-067, #18 Exhibit 1-068, #19 Exhibit 1-069, #20 Exhibit 1-070, #21 Exhibit 1-071, #22 Exhibit 1-072, #23 Exhibit 1-073, #24 Exhibit 1-074, #25 Exhibit 1-075, #26 Exhibit 1-076, #27 Exhibit 1-077, #28 Exhibit 1-078, #29 Exhibit 1-079, #30 Exhibit 1-080, #31 Exhibit 1-081, #32 Exhibit 1-082, #33 Exhibit 1-083, #34 Exhibit 1-084, #35 Exhibit 1-085, #36 Exhibit 1-086, #37 Exhibit 1-087, #38 Exhibit 1-088, #39 Exhibit 1-089, #40 Exhibit 1-090, #41 Exhibit 1-091, #42 Exhibit 1-092, #43 Exhibit 1-093, #44 Exhibit 1-094, #45 Exhibit 1-095, #46 Exhibit 1-096, #47 Exhibit 1-097, #48 Exhibit 1-098, #49 Exhibit 1-099, #50 Exhibit 1-100, #51 Exhibit 1-101, #52 Exhibit 1-102, #53 Exhibit 1-103, #54 Exhibit 1-104, #55 Exhibit 1-105, #56 Exhibit 1-106, #57 Exhibit 1-107) (Hall, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R. Eberle on behalf of TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Eberle, Scott)
September 22, 2017 Filing 8 JOINDER of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Martini, Mark) Modified on 9/26/2017. (cel)
September 22, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Martini on behalf of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Martini, Mark)
September 22, 2017 Filing 6 JOINDER of KEMPER FINANCIAL INDEMNITY COMPANY to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Goodman, Eric) Modified on 9/26/2017. (cel)
September 22, 2017 Filing 5 JOINDER of STATE AUTO MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Goodman, Eric) Modified on 9/26/2017. (cel)
September 22, 2017 Filing 4 JOINDER of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Goodman, Eric) Modified on 9/26/2017. (cel)
September 22, 2017 Filing 3 EXHIBITS 1, Parts 001-050 in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-001, #2 Exhibit 1-002, #3 Exhibit 1-003, #4 Exhibit 1-004, #5 Exhibit 1-005, #6 Exhibit 1-006, #7 Exhibit 1-007, #8 Exhibit 1-008, #9 Exhibit 1-009, #10 Exhibit 1-010, #11 Exhibit 1-011, #12 Exhibit 1-012, #13 Exhibit 1-013, #14 Exhibit 1-014, #15 Exhibit 1-015, #16 Exhibit 1-016, #17 Exhibit 1-017, #18 Exhibit 1-018, #19 Exhibit 1-019, #20 Exhibit 1-020, #21 Exhibit 1-021, #22 Exhibit 1-022, #23 Exhibit 1-023, #24 Exhibit 1-024, #25 Exhibit 1-025, #26 Exhibit 1-026, #27 Exhibit 1-027, #28 Exhibit 1-028, #29 Exhibit 1-029, #30 Exhibit 1-030, #31 Exhibit 1-031, #32 Exhibit 1-032, #33 Exhibit 1-033, #34 Exhibit 1-034, #35 Exhibit 1-035, #36 Exhibit 1-036, #37 Exhibit 1-037, #38 Exhibit 1-038, #39 Exhibit 1-039, #40 Exhibit 1-040, #41 Exhibit 1-041, #42 Exhibit 1-042, #43 Exhibit 1-043, #44 Exhibit 1-044, #45 Exhibit 1-045, #46 Exhibit 1-046, #47 Exhibit 1-047, #48 Exhibit 1-048, #49 Exhibit 1-049, #50 Exhibit 1-050) (Hall, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2 JOINDER of TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 1-3, #4 Exhibit 1-4, #5 Exhibit 1-5, #6 Exhibit 1-6, #7 Exhibit 1-7) (Eberle, Scott) Modified on 9/26/2017. (cel)
September 22, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Blair County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2017 GN 2300, with Jury Demand. (Filing Fee, including Administrative Fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4471361) Copies attached: Complaint. Filed by ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY, ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO., ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Blair County Complaint) (jjg) Modified on 9/25/2017. (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROFESSIONAL, INC. v. FIRST CHOICE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONEGAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUTUAL BENEFIT INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Patricia A. Monahan
Represented By: Lindsay B. Andreuzzi
Represented By: Richard L. McMonigle, Jr.
Represented By: Steven J. Schildt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENN NATIONAL SECURITY INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Brooks R. Foland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARLEYSVILLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Matthew A. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Represented By: Matthew A. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENCOMPASS HOME AND AUTO INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: John E. Hall
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Scott R. Eberle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST CHOICE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGENCY INSURANCE COMPANY OF MARYLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Thomas A. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: Scott J. Tredwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODVILLE MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HORACE MANN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Andrew D. Sysak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE AUTO MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Mark A. Martini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21ST CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: John P. Mastando, III
Represented By: Tracy Ederer
Represented By: P. Gavin Eastgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John E. Hall
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: John P. Mastando, III
Represented By: Tracy Ederer
Represented By: P. Gavin Eastgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John E. Hall
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Mark L. Hanover
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Andrew G Jenkins
Represented By: Nicholas J. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMG INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew R. Clayberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAFE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Mary Lou Maierhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Richard D. Gable, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEMPER FINANCIAL INDEMNITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROFESSIONAL, INC.
Represented By: James R. Huff, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?