KENNEDY v. KELLY

Plaintiff: CHARLES J. KENNEDY
Defendant: GEORGE V. KELLY
Case Number: 3:2018cv00187
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHARLES J. KENNEDY. GEORGE V. KELLY waiver sent on 9/25/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Downey, Brian)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GEORGE V. KELLY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4870223), filed by CHARLES J. KENNEDY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNEDY v. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE V. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES J. KENNEDY
Represented By: Brian P. Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?