BROWN v. MOSER

Petitioner: CHARLES FRANKLIN BROWN
Respondent: VICKIE MOSER
Case Number: 3:2019cv00004
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
0 Judge: Kim R Gibson
1 Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Remark: Service copies were forwarded to the U.S. Marshal. (jmb)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING that the United States Marshal shall make service of the signed (ECF No. #5 ) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and the signed Brief in Support of Petition (ECF No. #6 ) upon the respondent Vickie Moser, Warden at the Federal Correctional Center at Loretto, as well as the United States Attorney for the Western District of Pennsylvania at Suite 400, U.S. Post Office and Courthouse, Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania and the United States Attorney General in Washington, D.C. Service shall be by certified mail and the costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a rule is issued upon respondents, returnable sixty (60) days after service of process, to show cause why the writ should not be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are allowed fourteen (14) days from this date to appeal this order to a district judge pursuant to 72.C.2 of the local rules. Failure to appeal within fourteen (14) days may constitute waiver of the right to appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 03/07/2019. (jmb)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re 7 STAYING and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING case. The government shutdown has ended. Therefore, this case is reopened. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on February 21, 2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcc)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER acknowledging receipt of Petitioner's signed #5 Petition and #6 Brief in Support thereof. However, due to the lapse in appropriations, the USMS is unable to effectuate service in this case at this time and therefore it must continue to remain administratively closed. The period of time to effect service is therefore extended until such time as the lapse in appropriations ends. Thus, this case is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED and shall be reopened when the lapse in appropriations has ended. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on January 24, 2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Errata with signature re #3 Brief in Support by CHARLES FRANKLIN BROWN. Reason for Correction: no signature. (jv)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Errata with signature re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by CHARLES FRANKLIN BROWN. Reason for Correction: No Signature. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Envelope) (jv)
January 18, 2019 Remark: The original Petition was mailed to the Petitioner at his address of record. (jmb)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to Strike from the docket the #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #3 Brief in Support thereof and to mark this CASE CLOSED. Petitioner did not sign his Petition or his Brief. The Clerk of Court is directed to send these documents back to Petitioner for his signature and reopen this case upon their receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on January 18, 2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kcc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support of #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CHARLES FRANKLIN BROWN. (plp)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 34668004744), filed by CHARLES FRANKLIN BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Receipt) (plp)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Memorandum in Support of Petition, Exhibits A-G and letter explaining that check was mailed in seperate correspondence is lodged, since no Motion to proceed IFP or fee paid was received with this correspondence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition, #9 Letter explaining that a check was mailed in seperate correspondence, #10 Envelope) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. MOSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHARLES FRANKLIN BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: VICKIE MOSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?