FOUR QUARTERS INTERFAITH SANCTUARY OF EARTH RELIGION v. GILLE et al

Plaintiff: FOUR QUARTERS INTERFAITH SANCTUARY OF EARTH RELIGION
Defendant: JOSHUA POWELL, WILLIAM VAN METER and KATE GILLE
Case Number: 3:2019cv00012
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - upon the Court having been advised that this case has settled and the only matters remaining to be completed are the payment of the settlement proceeds, if any, and the submission of a stipulation for dismissal under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a), and it appearing that there is no further action required by the court at this time, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk mark the above-captioned case closed; that nothing contained in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this action, and, that should further proceedings therein become necessary or desirable, either party may initiate them in the same manner as if the Order had not been entered, and, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court expressly retains jurisdiction in this matter to consider any issue arising during the period when settlement is being finalized, including, but not limited to, enforcing settlement. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 3/8/2019. (dlg)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF COURT granting #14 Motion to Extend Time in Which to Make a Responsive Filing. Defendants shall make a responsive filing to the Complaint in this matter no later than 3/8/2019. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 2/22/2019. (dlg)
February 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by KATE GILLE, JOSHUA POWELL, WILLIAM VAN METER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Daniel, Jesse)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF COURT granting #12 Motion to Extend Time in Which to Make a Responsive Filing. Defendants shall make a responsive filing to the Complaint in this matter no later than 2/22/2019. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 2/14/2019. (dlg)
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by KATE GILLE, JOSHUA POWELL, WILLIAM VAN METER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Daniel, Jesse)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER - this Court hereby Orders that it will not dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Opinion & Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 2/11/2019. (dlg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION REGARDING FORM AO 121 by KATE GILLE, JOSHUA POWELL, WILLIAM VAN METER. (Daniel, Jesse)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by KATE GILLE, JOSHUA POWELL, WILLIAM VAN METER. (Daniel, Jesse)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition to #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by FOUR QUARTERS INTERFAITH SANCTUARY OF EARTH RELIGION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Pleading, #2 Exhibit 2-Affidavit) (McKay, Donald)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven P. Passarello terminated. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 1/29/2019. (dlg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Order re #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by FOUR QUARTERS INTERFAITH SANCTUARY OF EARTH RELIGION. (Passarello, Steven)
January 29, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by FOUR QUARTERS INTERFAITH SANCTUARY OF EARTH RELIGION. (Passarello, Steven)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald J. McKay on behalf of FOUR QUARTERS INTERFAITH SANCTUARY OF EARTH RELIGION. (McKay, Donald)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER - Given the apparent lack of subject matter jurisdiction, the Court hereby Orders the parties to present evidence and brief the presence or absence of subject matter jurisdiction on or before 2/1/2019, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 1/25/2019. (dlg)
January 25, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Attorney to submit AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. Attorney advised to file the Notice within 7 days. The link to the report can be found under Other Forms at: http://www.uscourts.gov/FormsAndFees/Forms/CourtFormsByCategory.aspx (sdp)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KATE GILLE, JOSHUA POWELL, WILLIAM VAN METER (Daniel, Jesse)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Bedford County, case number 46-2019 Copies attached: Petition for Injunction (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5002869), filed by KATE GILLE, JOSHUA POWELL, WILLIAM VAN METER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOUR QUARTERS INTERFAITH SANCTUARY OF EARTH RELIGION v. GILLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA POWELL
Represented By: Jesse D. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM VAN METER
Represented By: Jesse D. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATE GILLE
Represented By: Jesse D. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOUR QUARTERS INTERFAITH SANCTUARY OF EARTH RELIGION
Represented By: Steven P. Passarello
Represented By: Donald J. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?