ROBINSON v. BLAIR COUNTY PRISON et al
Plaintiff: RASHAM ROBINSON
Defendant: Z. STITT, Warden ABBEY TATE and BLAIR COUNTY PRISON
Case Number: 3:2019cv00077
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Referring Judge: Keith A Pesto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER - it is Ordered that the complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim as recommended in the Report and Recommendation at ECF no. #2 , which is adopted as the opinion of the Court. No further leave to amend is granted. The Clerk shall mark this matter closed, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/25/2019. (dlg)
May 21, 2019 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Complaint filed by RASHAM ROBINSON, recommending that the complaint be dismissed for failure to state a claim, plaintiff has leave to amend in part, and as more fully stated; Objections to R&R due by 6/4/2019 Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 6/7/2019 (w/document #2 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 5/21/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (plp)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against BLAIR COUNTY PRISON, Z. STITT, ABBEY TATE ), filed by RASHAM ROBINSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (plp)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the Clerk shall send the plaintiff a consent form to proceed under U.S.C. Section 636(c)(1); the inmate account officer at any institution where plaintiff may be incarcerated shall forward to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania monthly installments until the entire filing fee has been paid, regardless of any dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 5/21/2019. (plp)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RASHAM ROBINSON. Motion referred to Keith A. Pesto. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibits to Complaint, #3 Inmate Account Statement, #4 Envelope Documents mailed in) (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBINSON v. BLAIR COUNTY PRISON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RASHAM ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z. STITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden ABBEY TATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAIR COUNTY PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?