SIMPSON v. HORNING et al

Plaintiff: JESSE RUSSELL SIMPSON
Defendant: P. HORNING, WARDEN MOSER, FORLINA and MILES
Case Number: 3:2019cv00078
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Referring Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff was advised by Order entered on June 10, 2019, that his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis continues to be deficient. Plaintiff was further advised that the case will remain administratively closed until he has fully complied with the requirements of 28 U.S.C. section 1915. A ruling on the #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction therefore is deferred and no action will be taken on this case until Plaintiff has fully complied with the requirements of 28 U.S.C. section 1915. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/26/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bsc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JESSE RUSSELL SIMPSON. Motion referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Envelope motion mailed in) (ksa)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 24668056912 (nll)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The motion as submitted continues to be deficient as neither a signed affidavit by the records officer nor a certified copy of Plaintiff's inmate account statement for the last six months was attached. The case will remain administratively closed until Plaintiff has fully complied with the requirements of 28 U.S.C. section 1915. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 6/10/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bsc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JESSE RUSSELL SIMPSON. Motion referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Authorization to Be Completed By Prisoner Who Seeks Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Table of Exhibits, #5 Correspondence, #6 Envelope documents mailed in) (ksa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM and ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING. The Complaint filed by JESSE RUSSELL SIMPSON has been received without a filing fee or the forms required to proceed in forma pauperis in a civil rights case. The Clerk of Court is to mark this case administratively CLOSED. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/23/2019. (sms) Modified text on 5/23/2019. (ksa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/23/2019. (sms)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: Complaint lodged, no filing fee paid, no Motion to Proceed IFP filed. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge or District Judge Option, #8 Correspondence re filing fee, #9 Envelope Documents mailed in) (ksa) Modified text on 5/24/2019. (ksa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMPSON v. HORNING et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. HORNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN MOSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE RUSSELL SIMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?