WILLIAMS v. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al

Plaintiff: JOHN WILLIAMS
Defendant: STEVE GODFREY, QUEHANNA BOOT CAMP, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, DEBPORAH CUTSHALL, TERRI SOMERS, HEARING EXAMINER NUNEZ, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and DEBORAH CUTSHALL
Case Number: 3:2019cv00101
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by STEVE GODFREY, NUNEZ, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, QUEHANNA BOOT CAMP, TERRI SOMERS. (Gayle, Justin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TERRI SOMERS, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, NUNEZ, QUEHANNA BOOT CAMP, STEVE GODFREY. TERRI SOMERS waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; NUNEZ waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; QUEHANNA BOOT CAMP waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; STEVE GODFREY waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Gayle, Justin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin A. Gayle on behalf of STEVE GODFREY, NUNEZ, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, QUEHANNA BOOT CAMP, TERRI SOMERS. (Gayle, Justin)
June 25, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy no longer assigned to the case. (jjg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, DEBPORAH CUTSHALL, STEVE GODFREY, NUNEZ, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, QUEHANNA BOOT CAMP, TERRI SOMERS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5182027), filed by JOHN WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE GODFREY
Represented By: Justin A. Gayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEHANNA BOOT CAMP
Represented By: Justin A. Gayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBPORAH CUTSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRI SOMERS
Represented By: Justin A. Gayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEARING EXAMINER NUNEZ
Represented By: Justin A. Gayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Justin A. Gayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH CUTSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN WILLIAMS
Represented By: Louis J. Kroeck, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?