MOORE v. PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC.
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN MOORE
Defendant: PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00106
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC.. (Andrisano, Anthony)
August 8, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/15/2019. (mao)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony F. Andrisano, Jr on behalf of PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC.. (Andrisano, Anthony)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN MOORE. PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC. waiver sent on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Rihn, D.)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5197155), filed by KATHLEEN MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE v. PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN MOORE
Represented By: D. Aaron Rihn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC.
Represented By: Anthony F. Andrisano, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?