WILLIAMSON v. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Plaintiff: BRADLEY D. WILLIAMSON
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES and PENNSYLVANIA DEPT. OF HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 3:2019cv00107
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney W. Charles Sipio terminated. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 8/29/2019. (dlg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (W. Charles Sipio) by BRADLEY D. WILLIAMSON. (Kolman, Timothy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M. Kolman on behalf of BRADLEY D. WILLIAMSON. (Kolman, Timothy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by PENNSYLVANIA DEPT. OF HUMAN SERVICES Answer due from PENNSYLVANIA DEPT. OF HUMAN SERVICES on 9/23/2019. (Mazzocca, Timothy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Errata re #6 Waiver of Service Executed by PENNSYLVANIA DEPT. OF HUMAN SERVICES. Reason for Correction: Document Filed in Error - No Waiver. (Mazzocca, Timothy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PENNSYLVANIA DEPT. OF HUMAN SERVICES. (Mazzocca, Timothy) Document removed from public view and redocketed at #7 . Modified text on 8/8/2019. (nll)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Mazzocca on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEPT. OF HUMAN SERVICES. (Mazzocca, Timothy)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BRADLEY D. WILLIAMSON. PENNSYLVANIA DEPT. OF HUMAN SERVICES served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Sipio, W.)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES (cel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5197831), filed by BRADLEY D. WILLIAMSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMSON v. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADLEY D. WILLIAMSON
Represented By: W. Charles Sipio
Represented By: Timothy M. Kolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA DEPT. OF HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Timothy Mazzocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?