WEAVER v. MEIER et al
Plaintiff: JASON J. WEAVER
Defendant: JASON P. MEIER and MICHELS CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2019cv00129
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION - Mediation. Gary P. Caruso is appointed as mediator. The ADR Conference shall be concluded before 2/28/2020, unless extended by Order of the Court. It is the responsibility of counsel to ensure that notice of the date, time and location of the mediation has been electronically filed with the Court on or before 1/28/2020, and as more fully stated in said Order Referring Case to ADR. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 9/30/2019. (dlg)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/15/2019; Joinder of Parties due by 11/15/2019. The parties shall complete all Fact Discovery by 3/31/2020. Expert Discovery to be completed by 9/30/2020. A Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 4/27/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Kim R. Gibson, and as more fully stated in said Initial Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 9/30/2019. (dlg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kim R. Gibson: The Court held an initial Rule 16 conference with counsel for Defendants appearing by telephone and counsel for Plaintiff appearing in person on 9/30/2019. The Court began by reviewing the parties' initial scheduling order. The Court noted that it will schedule a post-discovery status conference in April, 2020. Then, the Court reviewed the parties' ADR stipulation. The parties set a date of February 28, 2020, to complete mediation. Finally, the parties provided the Court with a brief description of the claims and defenses in this matter. (Court Reporter: None) (dlg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN pursuant to Rule 26(f) by JASON J. WEAVER. (Matassa, Jennifer)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN pursuant to Rule 26(f) by JASON J. WEAVER. (Matassa, Jennifer)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by JASON J. WEAVER. (Matassa, Jennifer)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Errata re #9 Notice of Appearance by JASON J. WEAVER. Reason for Correction: DEFENDANT INCORRECT ON CAPTION. (Lichtenstein, Jason)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M. Lichtenstein on behalf of JASON J. WEAVER. (Lichtenstein, Jason)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Case Management Conference is set for 9/30/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom A - Johnstown before Judge Kim R. Gibson, and as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 8/29/2019. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit "A" Stipulation, (2) Exhibit "B" Report, (3) Exhibit "C" Order). (krh)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Matassa on behalf of JASON J. WEAVER. (Matassa, Jennifer)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JASON P. MEIER, MICHELS CORPORATION. (Stewart, Gary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 LOCAL RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE by MICHELS CORPORATION re #2 Disclosure Statement Amended. (Stewart, Gary)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J. Simkin on behalf of JASON P. MEIER, MICHELS CORPORATION. (Simkin, Sarah)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane B. Carvell on behalf of JASON P. MEIER, MICHELS CORPORATION. (Carvell, Diane)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MICHELS CORPORATION. (Stewart, Gary)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF BLAIR COUNTY, case number 2019 GN 2161 with BOTH Copies attached: Lower Court Complaint, Notice to Defend (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5243825), filed by MICHELS CORPORATION, JASON P. MEIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LOWER COURT COMPLAINT, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEAVER v. MEIER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON P. MEIER
Represented By: Diane B. Carvell
Represented By: Sarah J. Simkin
Represented By: Gary N. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELS CORPORATION
Represented By: Diane B. Carvell
Represented By: Sarah J. Simkin
Represented By: Gary N. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON J. WEAVER
Represented By: Jennifer L. Matassa
Represented By: Jason M. Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?