SASSE v. WETZEL et al
Plaintiff: CHAD ALLEN SASSE
Defendant: PATRICK NAGLE, REBECCA REIFER, JOHN WETZEL, CASEY THORNLEY, MARGARET BARNES, MUHAMMAD NAJI, MD, DORETTA CHENCHARICK, JANET PEARSON, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, L.L.C., BARRY SMITH and THERESA CANTOLINA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00130
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Referring Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by CHAD ALLEN SASSE re #8 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by CHAD ALLEN SASSE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (plp)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING the #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 09/19/2019. (jmb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against MARGARET BARNES, THERESA CANTOLINA, DORETTA CHENCHARICK, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, L.L.C., PATRICK NAGLE, MUHAMMAD NAJI, MD, JANET PEARSON, REBECCA REIFER, BARRY SMITH, CASEY THORNLEY, JOHN WETZEL, filed by CHAD ALLEN SASSE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (plp)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by CHAD ALLEN SASSE, which is hereby construed as a renewed Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED to the extent that this case may proceed without prepayment of the entire filing fee. Plaintiff shall pay $41.49 as an initial partial filing fee as provided by 28 USC 1915(b)(1)(A); however, he is still assessed the total $350.00 filing fee in this case. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward, within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this Order, the initial partial filing fee of $41.49 to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff shall be required to make monthly payments of twenty percent of the preceding month's income (that is, all funds deposited into the account) credited to the account. Plaintiff is warned that he is ultimately responsible for payment of the filing fee if the agency with custody over him lapses in its duty to make payments on his behalf. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order to the Inmate Account Officer at Plaintiff's place of confinement. The Clerk of Court shall enclose an authorization form which Plaintiff shall complete and return within ten (10) days of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to reopen this case and to file the Complaint and any attached exhibits. If Plaintiff authorizes payments and the initial partial filing fee of $41.49 is not received within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this Order then this action may be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on September 18, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Authorization) (kcc)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Remark: Two duplicate copies of the Complaint with exhibits A-C, Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Declaration in Support of Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Summons, and Proposed Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order forwarded to chambers. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (nll)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by CHAD ALLEN SASSE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (plp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by CHAD ALLEN SASSE. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (plp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by CHAD ALLEN SASSE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (plp)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that plaintiffs Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF. No. #1 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case closed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff may submit another motion to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a certified copy of the inmate account statement for the six (6) months preceding the filing of the complaint. If that resubmitted motion is granted, the case will be reopened. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff may reopen the case by paying the $400.00 filing fee. AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are allowed fourteen (14) days from this date to appeal this order to a district judge pursuant to Local Rule 72.C.2. Failure to appeal within fourteen (14) days may constitute waiver of the right to appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 08/26/2019. (jmb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHAD ALLEN SASSE. Motion(s) referred to Lisa Pupo Lenihan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Envelope B, #4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #5 Proposed Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order, #6 Letters from Lawyers and Other Places that Provide Assistance, #7 Envelope) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SASSE v. WETZEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK NAGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA REIFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASEY THORNLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET BARNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUHAMMAD NAJI, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORETTA CHENCHARICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET PEARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESA CANTOLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD ALLEN SASSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?