DANIEL V. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: WILLIAM T. DANIEL
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00133
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Referring Judge: Keith A Pesto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-22724. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/20/2019. (br)
August 19, 2019 Case transferred to District of Western District of Pennsylvania electronically. (drz)
August 19, 2019 Case Reopened by Clerk for Transfer to Western District of Pennsylvania. (drz)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; Adopting #7 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling Closing Case. Motions terminated: #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by William T. Daniel Recommending that this petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 be TRANSFERRED to. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by William T. Daniel; Recommending that this petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 be TRANSFERRED to the proper venue, which is the Western District of Pennsylvania. Objections to R&R due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by United States of America. (Rochlin, Karen)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE requiring the Government to brief its position regarding the request made in the #1 "Motion for Modification Nunc Pro Tunc," which has been construed as a Section 2241 Petition. The Response is due before July 29, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid (bca)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karen Rochlin on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Karen Rochlin added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Rochlin, Karen)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (vjk)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for Motion for Modification of Sentence and notices for all filings in case as to William T. Daniel. Motions referred to Judge Lisette M. Reid. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 6/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00 NOT PAID/NO IFP, filed by William T. Daniel.(vjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DANIEL V. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM T. DANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Karen Rochlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?