AINA v. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: ANDRE YANICK AINA
Defendant: KURT MATTERN-GEOFFREY, BARRY SMITH, JOHN E. WETZEL, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and TRACY BAKAYSA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00151
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Referring Judge: Stephanie L Haines
2 Judge: Keith A Pesto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 Partial Payment of Filing Fee by ANDRE YANICK AINA. Fee $196.00, receipt number 34668005090. (plp)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by ANDRE YANICK AINA. (plp)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANDRE YANICK AINA. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (Attachments: #1 inmate account statement, #2 Envelope) (plp)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Stephanie L. Haines for all further proceedings. Judge Kim R. Gibson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 10/23/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 Partial Payment of Filing Fee by ANDRE YANICK AINA. Fee $74.88, receipt number 34668005031. (plp)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Waive Costs and Fees of the United States Marshal Service for service of process, by ANDRE YANICK AINA. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Plaintiff to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Status by ANDRE YANICK AINA (plp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by ANDRE YANICK AINA. (plp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Waive Prepayment of Fees and Costs to the United States Marshal Service for the Service of Process by ANDRE YANICK AINA. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (plp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ANDRE YANICK AINA. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (plp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against TRACY BAKAYSA, KURT MATTERN-GEOFFREY, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, BARRY SMITH, JOHN E. WETZEL, filed by ANDRE YANICK AINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit R, #18 Exhibit S, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U, #21 Exhibit V, #22 Envelope) (plp)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the inmate account officer at any institution where plaintiff may be incarcerated shall forward to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania monthly installments until the entire filing fee is paid, regardless of any dismissal of the complaint; the motion for a preliminary injunction at ECF no #1 is denied as completely conclusory and as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 9/23/2019. (plp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by ANDRE YANICK AINA. (plp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANDRE YANICK AINA. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (plp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Rights complaint lodged pending payment of filing fee or the granting of a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Envelope) (plp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AINA v. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KURT MATTERN-GEOFFREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN E. WETZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY BAKAYSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRE YANICK AINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?