BIGLER BOYZ ENVIRO, INC. v. CLEAN FUELS OF INDIANA,INC., et al
Plaintiff: BIGLER BOYZ ENVIRO, INC.
Defendant: WAL-MART, INC., CLEAN FUELS OF INDIANA, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. and WAL-MART STORES
Case Number: 3:2019cv00186
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 4:19-cv-01774. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania; Clerk directed to close this case. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/30/19. (case closed)(lg)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/15/2019. (jr)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. from Clearfield Court of Common Plea, case number 2019-1500. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4898035), filed by Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Notices, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIGLER BOYZ ENVIRO, INC. v. CLEAN FUELS OF INDIANA,INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART, INC.
Represented By: Patrick J. McDonnell
Represented By: Douglas J. Bench, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAN FUELS OF INDIANA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC.
Represented By: Patrick J. McDonnell
Represented By: Douglas J. Bench, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES
Represented By: Patrick J. McDonnell
Represented By: Douglas J. Bench, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIGLER BOYZ ENVIRO, INC.
Represented By: C.J. Zwick
Represented By: Matthew R. Zwick
Represented By: Gregory D. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?