BOSLET v. EVEY BLACK ATTORNEYS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA L. BOSLET
Defendant: KATHY J MAUK, THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS S WALTON, LLC, AMY ORR ROSENSTEEL, NATHAN W. KARN, SR. and EVEY BLACK ATTORNEYS, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00071
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF COURT granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Absent further action by the Court, Defendants shall file a response to the Complaint on or before 6/15/2020. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/5/2020. (dlg)
June 4, 2020 Filing 13 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (on or before June 15, 2020) by EVEY BLACK ATTORNEYS, LLC, NATHAN W. KARN, SR, KATHY J MAUK, AMY ORR ROSENSTEEL, THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS S WALTON, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Monico, Ralph)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF COURT granting #11 Motion to Extend Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Absent further action by the Court, Defendants shall file a response to the Complaint on or before 6/4/2020. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 5/21/2020. (dlg)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION to Extend Time to 06/04/2020 by EVEY BLACK ATTORNEYS, LLC, NATHAN W. KARN, SR, KATHY J MAUK, AMY ORR ROSENSTEEL, THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS S WALTON, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Monico, Ralph)
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF COURT granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Absent further action by the Court, Defendants shall file a response to the Complaint on or before 5/20/2020. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 5/5/2020. (dlg)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by CYNTHIA L. BOSLET by EVEY BLACK ATTORNEYS, LLC, NATHAN W. KARN, SR, KATHY J MAUK, AMY ORR ROSENSTEEL, THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS S WALTON, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Monico, Ralph)
April 26, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph M. Monico on behalf of EVEY BLACK ATTORNEYS, LLC, NATHAN W. KARN, SR, KATHY J MAUK, AMY ORR ROSENSTEEL, THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS S WALTON, LLC. (Monico, Ralph)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CYNTHIA L. BOSLET. KATHY J MAUK waiver sent on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Bowser, Anthony)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CYNTHIA L. BOSLET. AMY ORR ROSENSTEEL waiver sent on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Bowser, Anthony)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CYNTHIA L. BOSLET. NATHAN W. KARN, SR waiver sent on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Bowser, Anthony)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CYNTHIA L. BOSLET. THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS S WALTON, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Bowser, Anthony)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CYNTHIA L. BOSLET. EVEY BLACK ATTORNEYS, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Bowser, Anthony)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dlg)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EVEY BLACK ATTORNEYS, LLC, NATHAN W. KARN, SR, KATHY J MAUK, AMY ORR ROSENSTEEL, THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS S WALTON, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5562351), filed by CYNTHIA L. BOSLET. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOSLET v. EVEY BLACK ATTORNEYS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY J MAUK
Represented By: Ralph M. Monico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS S WALTON, LLC
Represented By: Ralph M. Monico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY ORR ROSENSTEEL
Represented By: Ralph M. Monico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATHAN W. KARN, SR.
Represented By: Ralph M. Monico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVEY BLACK ATTORNEYS, LLC
Represented By: Ralph M. Monico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA L. BOSLET
Represented By: Solomon Z. Krevsky
Represented By: Anthony T. Bowser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?