JACKSON v. ESTOCK et al
Petitioner: BLAINE V. JACKSON
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, LEE ESTOCK and THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF JOHNSTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 3:2020cv00168
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Referring Judge: Keith A Pesto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by BLAINE V. JACKSON, recommending that the petition be dismissed without need of service or response and that no certificate of appealability issue and as more fully stated; Objections to R&R due by 10/27/2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (plp)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 34668005405), filed by BLAINE V. JACKSON. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (plp)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING; the Clerk shall mark this matter administratively closed until petitioner pays the filing fee or files a motion to proceed in forma pauperis with an inmate account statement and as more fully stated in said order. Blank consent/district judge option form sent to petitioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 8/26/2020. (plp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Remark: Habeas Petition lodged with no filing fee or In Forma Pauperis motion (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. ESTOCK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Peter J. Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LEE ESTOCK
Represented By: Peter J. Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF JOHNSTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Peter J. Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BLAINE V. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?