ARTLEY v. CYBERGUARD SYSTEMS, LLC
Plaintiff: SHAKIRA ARTLEY
Defendant: CYBERGUARD SYSTEMS, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00172
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Stephanie L Haines
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CYBERGUARD SYSTEMS, LLC. (Loeffler, Catherine)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine S. Loeffler on behalf of CYBERGUARD SYSTEMS, LLC. (Loeffler, Catherine)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHAKIRA ARTLEY. CYBERGUARD SYSTEMS, LLC waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Williams, Susan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (gpr)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CYBERGUARD SYSTEMS, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-586045), filed by SHAKIRA ARTLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARTLEY v. CYBERGUARD SYSTEMS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAKIRA ARTLEY
Represented By: Susan N. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYBERGUARD SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By: Catherine S. Loeffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?