CORSON v. JOHNSTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: GEORGE CORSON
Defendant: JOHNSTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT and JOHN DOES 1-2
Case Number: 3:2020cv00174
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Stephanie L Haines
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF COURT re: #6 Case Management Order. The Court will conduct the initial case management conference in this case set for 10/27/20 @ 11:30 a.m. via an AT&T call-in number, which requires participants to dial in and provide an access code. The Court will provide the dial in number and access code via an email to all counsel. In the event of any change in circumstances relating to this conference, the parties will be notified via ECF. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 10/16/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (gpr)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by GEORGE CORSON. (Giannetti, Anthony)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Initial Scheduling Order by GEORGE CORSON. (Giannetti, Anthony)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Giannetti, Anthony)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 and 16.2, an Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference shall be held on Tuesday, 10/27/2020, at 11:30 a.m., in Courtroom A at 319 Washington Street, Johnstown, Pennsylvania, and as more fully stated in said Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Stipulation Selecting ADR, #2 Exhibit "B" - Fed.R.Civ. P. 26(f) Report, #3 Exhibit "C" - Initial Scheduling Order) (dlg)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis D. Wymard on behalf of JOHN DOES 1-2, JOHNSTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT. (Wymard, Francis)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by JOHN DOES 1-2, JOHNSTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT. (Wymard, Francis)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (gpr)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JOHNSTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT (jv)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-2, JOHNSTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5866643), filed by GEORGE CORSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORSON v. JOHNSTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSTOWN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Francis D. Wymard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-2
Represented By: Francis D. Wymard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE CORSON
Represented By: Anthony J. Giannetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?