TMP MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC. v. FAIRGROUND TRANSPORTATION et al
Plaintiff: TMP MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.
Defendant: BEST AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC. and FAIRGROUND TRANSPORTATION
Case Number: 3:2020cv00204
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by FAIRGROUND TRANSPORTATION - Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties hereto, through their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate and agree that the within matter between Plaintiff, TMP Manufacturing Company, Inc./TAFCO, and Defendants Fairground Transportation and Best American Transport, Inc., is hereby dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs. IT IS SO ORDERED, Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 11/20/2020. (dlg)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by FAIRGROUND TRANSPORTATION. (King, Bradley)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clearfield County, case number 2020-1064 with none Copies attached: state court record (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5980315), filed by FAIRGROUND TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TMP MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC. v. FAIRGROUND TRANSPORTATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEST AMERICAN TRANSPORT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIRGROUND TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: Bradley A. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TMP MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: John R. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?