SNIDER v. ALVAREZ et al
Plaintiff: JOEL SNIDER
Defendant: ROBIN ALVAREZ and STEVENS
Respondent: Officer Heckert, C/O KILLEEN, Captain Eichenberg, SCOTT MILLER, Unknown Defendants 1-7, Officer Hatcher, KATHLEEN ZWEIRZYNA, SCI Coal Township, ERIC TICE, Accountant DENNIS DECKER, Officer McKeehan, MICHAEL KLOPOTOSKI, SHEIK, Officer Nichtman, DAN CARO, JOHN DOE THREE, Trish Kelley, E. Kalsky, Lieutenant Kuzar, Sgt. Gault, LT. BAPTIST, D. Alvord, Jennifer Herrold, Director Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, Major Horner, SCOTT MOORE, NICK JAMISON, Dr. Ralph Tomei, United States Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania, MARK CAPOZZA, CO BRANDT, Officer Morton, LT. LEGGORE, JOHN DOE ONE, A. KOT, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, Sgt. Koelsch, MICHAEL MILLER, ROBIN LEWIS, Sgt. Rivera, James Meintel, DAWN DAVIS, SGT. CLEAVER, Cherie Fallon, JOHN WETZEL, JOHN DOE FOUR, Crystal Auman, VINCENT MOONEY, CRAWFORD, Hughney, LT. DAVY, Anthony Luscavage, Christine Schenck, M. Newmyer, Officer Byrne, C.O. MCCOY, SUPERINTENDANT HARRY, Levell Jenkins, JOHN DOE TWO, CO BECKER, SCI CAMP HILL, OFFICER CARBERRY, Caitlyn Wiegle and JAMES BARNACLE
Case Number: 3:2020cv00241
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Referring Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 153 Remark: Pursuant to the (ECF No. 152) Order entered 01/21/2021, a copy of this Remark and of the docket sheet were mailed to the Plaintiff at his address of record. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING (ECF No. #151 ) Plaintiff's Motion for Copy of Docket Sheet and Copies of Filings and Orders. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of the docket sheet as well the documents filed at ECF Nos. #139 , #143 , #144 , #146 , #149 and 150 . This includes all documents in this case since it was transferred from the Middle District of Pennsylvania, with the exception of any documents filed by the Plaintiff himself. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 01/21/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
January 20, 2021 Filing 151 MOTION for Copies of Docket Sheet, Filings and Orders by JOEL SNIDER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjg)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER re #147 Objections filed by JOEL SNIDER. Plaintiff is objecting to the requirement in the Court's scheduling order that he submit all discovery requests to the Court for approval. The Court will treat this as a motion for reconsideration of its scheduling order and deny it for the following reasons. The undersigned has a significant number of pro se filed cases and enters this exact order in all of them. Rule 1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure commands the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding." In addition, a district court possesses inherent powers that are governed not by rule or statute but by the control necessarily vested in courts to manage their own affairs so as to achieve the orderly and expeditious disposition of cases. Dietz v. Bouldin, 136 S.Ct. 1885, 1891 (2016) citing Link v. Wabash R. Co., 370 U.S. 626, 630631 (1962). This is the method the Court finds most effective in managing its pro se docket to achieve the just, speedy and inexpensive determination of the action. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Case Management Order is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 1/15/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Lenihan, Lisa)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than January 28, 2021. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a District Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Any party who has filed a Consent to Trial by a Magistrate Judge or District Judge form does not need to refile it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 01/07/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form) (jmb)
January 5, 2021 Filing 148 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JOEL SNIDER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjg)
January 5, 2021 Filing 147 OBJECTIONS to #146 Case Management Order, by JOEL SNIDER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jjg)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: No formal discovery, such as interrogatories, requests for production or requests for admission will be allowed in this case without leave of court. However, no later than January 15, 2021 the defendant(s) shall provide plaintiff with the following: (1) all incident reports, grievances, disciplinary reports, or other similar documents in its possession concerning the alleged incident or incidents; (2) all medical records in its possession regarding Plaintiff that relate to the claims in his complaint. Defendants are ordered to file a Notice with this Court stating that this Order has been complied with, including a general description of what was provided and the date of compliance. Plaintiff shall, no later than February 15, 2021, advise the court of any further discovery, if any, he deems necessary for the prosecution of this case. He may not submit requests for discovery to the defendant(s) without leave of court. All dispositive motions and briefs in support thereof must be filed by March 15, 2021. Responses are due April 15, 2021. If Defendant/s do/es not intend to file dispositive motions, they are ordered to file a notice with the court by the motions deadline that so states. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 12/09/2020. (jmb)
December 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan added. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge no longer assigned to case. (cel)
December 2, 2020 Filing 145 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 4:18-cv-00801. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - IT IS ORDERED that The Clerk of Court shall forthwith transfer this matter to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. The Clerk of Court shall forthwith close this case in this District. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 12/2/20. (rw)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER re #141 Petition filed by Joel Snider.Upon considering Plaintiffs Motion to reopen or reconsider (ECF Doc. No. 141) our November 2, 2020 Order dismissing claims against medical professionals (ECF Doc. No. 135) but not providing a basis of a claim, also mindful the case continues and he may be able to obtain the certificate of merit necessary to proceed as we dismissed his medical negligence claims without prejudice, it is ORDERED Plaintiffs Petition to reopen (ECF Doc. No. 141) is DENIED without prejudiceSigned by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 12/2/20. (aaa)
December 2, 2020 Filing 142 EXHIBITS by Joel Snider re #141 Document Filed. (Attachments: A #1 Exhibit(s) B, #2 Exhibit(s) C, #3 Exhibit(s) D, #4 Exhibit(s) E, #5 Exhibit(s) F, #6 Exhibit(s) G, #7 Exhibit(s) H, #8 Exhibit(s) I, #9 Exhibit(s) J, #10 Exhibit(s) K)(ga)
December 2, 2020 Filing 141 Plaintiff's Petition to Reopen Judgment of Non Pros by Joel Snider.. (ga)
November 23, 2020 Filing 140 RESPONSE by Robin Alvarez, Stevens to #136 Order to Show Cause, . (Boland, Nicole)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying #138 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 11/20/2020 (mw)
November 20, 2020 Filing 138 MOTION for Extension of Time of Thiry (30 days to File said Pleadings by Joel Snider.(ga)
November 18, 2020 Filing 137 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Robin Alvarez, Stevens.(Boland, Nicole)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-It is ORDERED Plaintiff and counsel for Robin Alvarez and PSS Stevens shall show cause in separate memoranda not exceeding ten (10) pages filed no later than November 23, 2020 as to why we should not transfer Plaintiffs remaining pro se claim challenging conduct in Somerset County and entirely involving persons in SCI-Houtzdale and SCI-Somerset to the United States District Court for the Western District of PennsylvaniaSigned by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 11/2/20. (aaa)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry).1. The Pennsylvania officials Motion (ECF Doc. No. 72) is GRANTED as to:a. all claims against Defendants Wetzel, Davis, Jamison, Tice, Caro, Schenk, Wiegle, Decker, Newmyer and Capozza and they are dismissed;b. all claims against Defendants Robin Alvarez and PSS Stevens except for the Eighth Amendment deliberate indifference claims arising from their alleged failure to provide him with medical care in response to his mental illness concerns in late 2018;2. Dr. Sheikhs Motion to dismiss (ECF Doc. No. 67) is GRANTED and she is dismissed;3. Defendants Alvarez and PSS Stevens shall file an Answer to the amended Complaint no later than November 18, 2020; and,4. We amend the caption and docket to reflect the remaining claims only against Robin Alvarez and PSS Stevens.Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 11/2/20. (aaa)
November 2, 2020 Filing 134 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 11/2/20. (aaa)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs request #132 to add a private e-mail address to the docket is DENIED without prejudice to him continuing to advise us if he does not timely receive filings as Defendants- are required to serve him simultaneous with their filing of any document and our Clerk of Court is mailing all of our filings to him at his address on the docket. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 9/17/20. (rw)
September 16, 2020 Filing 132 Letter from Joel Snider, Re: Issues/problems with mail. (ga)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 Motion for Leave to File and will consider the exhibits attached to his Motion as matters of public record and afford appropriate weight in addressing the Motions to dismiss. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 8/10/2020 (mfa)
August 7, 2020 Filing 130 MOTION for Leave to File Post-Conviction Documents on Record by Joel Snider.(ga)
July 20, 2020 Filing 129 CERTIFICATE of by Robin Alvarez, Mark Capozza, Dan Caro, Dawn Davis, Dennis Decker, Director Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, Nick Jamison, M. Newmyer, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, Christine Schenck, Sheik, Stevens, Eric Tice, John Wetzel, Caitlyn Wiegle re #128 Order on Motion to Strike,, Certificate of Service. (Boland, Nicole)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #126 Motion to Strike - 1. We deny the request to strike the Notice of Supplemental Records we requested under our July 8, 2020 Order (ECF Doc. No. 121); but,2. Commonwealth Defendants shall immediately mail the entire Notice (ECF Doc. No. 126) including Exhibits A-E as timely filed with the Court upon the incarcerated pro se Plaintiff and file a certificate of service of this Order no later than July 20, 2020. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 7/17/2020 (mfa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 127 OBJECTIONS to Commonwealth Defendants "Notice of Supplemental Records" by Joel Snider.. (ga)
July 17, 2020 Filing 126 MOTION to Strike "Notice of Supplemental Records" for lack of service. by Joel Snider.(ga)
July 17, 2020 Filing 125 Letter from Joel Snider, Re: Clarification. (ga)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying #123 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 7/14/2020 (mfa)
July 13, 2020 Filing 123 MOTION for Reconsideration re #118 Order re Discovery filed by Joel Snider.(bg)
July 10, 2020 Filing 122 Supplement by Robin Alvarez, Mark Capozza, Dan Caro, Dawn Davis, Dennis Decker, Director Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, M. Newmyer, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, Christine Schenck, Sheik, Stevens, Eric Tice, John Wetzel, Caitlyn Wiegle. to #121 Order, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A- PCRA Petition, #2 Exhibit(s) B-Amended PCRA Petition, #3 Exhibit(s) C- Snider's 10/24/19 Filing, #4 Exhibit(s) D-Union County Order & Opinion, #5 Exhibit(s) E-Plaintiff's Superior Court Brief)(Boland, Nicole)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Commonwealth Defendants' counsel of record with the Pennsylvania Attorney General shall file on or before July 10, 2020, a Notice of supplemental public records attaching: 1. The Plaintiffs PCRA petition filed in state court; 2. The October 24, 2019 Rule 1925 statement and trial court opinion filed in 1161 MDA 2019; and, 3. The briefs filed in the Pennsylvania Superior Court on the Plaintiffs PCRA appeal. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 7/8/20. (rw)
July 8, 2020 Filing 120 Letter dtd 7/4/20 from Joel Snider (ao)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiffs renewed Motion #117 for an advisory opinion is DENIED as we will address these issues in connection with the pending Motions to dismiss. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 6/30/20. (rw)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiffs Motion #116 for early discovery is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 6/30/20. (rw)
June 30, 2020 Filing 117 MOTION For Court Determination As To The Necessity Of Filing A Certificatw of Merit by Joel Snider.(ga)
June 30, 2020 Filing 116 RENEWED MOTION For Leave To Engage In Discovery by Joel Snider.(ga)
June 30, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document 118, Motion for leave to Withdraw has been deleted as it was filed in error. (rw)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the incarcerated pro se Plaintiffs Motion #109 for the appointment of counsel or guardian ad litem is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 6/19/20. (rw)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the incarcerated pro se Plaintiffs Motion #112 to withdraw class claims is GRANTED and to the extent Plaintiff sought to bring claims on behalf of other persons, such claims are dismissed. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 6/18/20. (rw)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to withdraw #110 is GRANTED and we will proceed to resolve the pending motions to dismiss under our attached June 9, 2020 Order; and, Plaintiffs Motion for leave to withdraw #107 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 6/17/20. (rw)
June 17, 2020 Filing 112 MOTION to witdraw all class claims by Joel Snider.(ao)
June 17, 2020 Filing 110 MOTION to Withdraw #107 MOTION to Withdraw Case by Joel Snider.(ao)
June 17, 2020 Filing 109 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by Joel Snider.(ao)
June 17, 2020 Filing 108 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #67 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Sheik.(Neal, Cassidy)
June 17, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc #111 docketed in wrong case and deleted. Docketed in correct case. (ao)
June 15, 2020 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw Case by Joel Snider.(ao)
June 11, 2020 Filing 106 NOTICE of withdrawal of claims against Defts U.S. and U.S. District Court for the Middle District of PA by Joel Snider (ao) (Main Document 106 replaced on 6/11/2020) (ao).
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that moving Defendants are each granted leave to file reply Memoranda not exceeding ten pages on or before June 22, 2020 to the pending Motions #67 , #72 to dismiss and, No further briefing shall be submitted without leave of Court which shall be granted only upon demonstrated good cause with no further delay in proceedings. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 6/9/20. (rw)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying #103 Motion to Correct as there is nothing to correct in the docket entries Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 4/09/2020 (mfa)
April 9, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION to Correct Docket by Joel Snider.(ao)
March 30, 2020 Filing 102 MDL 2934 ORDER that the motion for centralization of these actions is denied. (ao)
February 24, 2020 Filing 101 Letter from Joel Snider to Judge Kearney. (ga)
February 10, 2020 Filing 100 Plaintiff's Service of Multi-District Litigation Filings by Joel Snider. (ao)
January 30, 2020 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENT (Docs. 15 &17) per Pennsylvania Department of Corrections Legal Mail Policy. (aaa)
January 21, 2020 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENT Re: #23 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend, #21 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File per Pennsylvania Department of Corrections Legal Mail Policy. (mfa)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion #97 for Leave to engage in discovery is DENIED without prejudice to the pro se Plaintiff renewing a motion following return of this case to our active docket. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 1/15/20. (rw)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion #96 for court determination as to the necessity of filing a certificate of merit is DENIED withoutprejudice to the pro se Plaintiff renewing a motion following the return of this case to our active docket. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 1/15/20. (rw)
January 15, 2020 Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to Engage in Discovery Pursuant to P.R.Civ.P. 1042.5 by Joel Snider.(ga)
January 15, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION for Court Determination as to the Neccessity of file a Certificate of Merit by Joel Snider.(ga)
January 15, 2020 Filing 95 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #90 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Joel Snider.(ga)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER(memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) granting in part and denying in part #90 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying as moot #91 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; denying as moot #92 Motion to Extend Time Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 1/13/2020 (mfa)
January 13, 2020 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 1/13/2020. (mfa)
January 9, 2020 Filing 92 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases and for Stay Pending Resolution of Specific Issues by Joel Snider.(ga)
January 7, 2020 Filing 91 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support to #90 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Joel Snider.(ga)
January 7, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Stay Pending Resolution of Specific Issues by Joel Snider.(ga)
January 6, 2020 Filing 89 AMENDED BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to Corrections Defendants' and to Medical Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, filed by Joel Snider.(rw)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for leave #87 is GRANTED and the Clerk of Court shall file ECF Doc. No. 87-1 as a Supplement to the Plaintiffs Opposition to the Motions #85 to dismiss the amended Complaint andDefendants may file a Reply no later than January 13, 2020 if necessary. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 1/6/20. (rw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to Amend Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Joel Snider.(ga) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2020: #1 Amended Brief in Opposition) (ga).
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying without prejudice #82 , #83 Motion for Leave to File; denying without prejudice #84 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 1/3/20 (aaa)
December 27, 2019 Filing 85 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joel Snider.(ga)
December 27, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Second Amended Complaint along with Motion for Leav to Amend and Brief in Support by Joel Snider. (Attachments: #1 Part Two)(ga)
December 27, 2019 Filing 83 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #82 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Complaint filed by Joel Snider.(ga)
December 27, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Complaint by Joel Snider. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Complaint)(ga)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)- IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion #77 for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 12/9/19. (rw)
December 9, 2019 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 12/9/19. (rw)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the prose Plaintiffs second Motion #78 is GRANTED in part to allow him one last extension to respond to the pending Motions to dismiss no later than December 20, 2019, but he may not file a second amended Complaint absent an Order granting his timely motion to amend which attaches a proposed second amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 12/4/19. (rw)
December 4, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joel Snider.(ao)
November 22, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to Appoint Counsel or MOTION to Appoint Mental Health Expert for the limited purpose of obtaining Review for the statement required to submit certificate of merit by Joel Snider.(ga)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting in part #74 Motion to Extend Time and he may respond to the pending Motions to dismiss no later than 12/2/19.Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 11/15/19. (aaa)
November 14, 2019 Filing 75 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration of September 30, 2019 Memorandum Order by Joel Snider.(ga) Modified on 11/15/2019 (rw). MOTION FILED IN ERROR.
November 14, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Joel Snider.(ga)
October 29, 2019 Filing 73 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Robin Alvarez, Mark Capozza, Dan Caro, Dawn Davis, Dennis Decker, Director Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, Nick Jamison, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, Christine Schenck, Eric Tice, John Wetzel, Caitlyn Wiegle.(Boland, Nicole)
October 29, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Robin Alvarez, Mark Capozza, Dan Caro, Dawn Davis, Dennis Decker, Director Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, Nick Jamison, M. Newmyer, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, Christine Schenck, Stevens, Eric Tice, John Wetzel, Caitlyn Wiegle.(Boland, Nicole)
October 29, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 72 deleted at request of counsel and will be refiled. (dmn)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER - The Commonwealth Defendants' Motion to dismiss #70 is DENIED without prejudice. See Order for further details.Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 10/25/19. (dmn)
October 24, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Robin Alvarez, Mark Capozza, Dan Caro, Dawn Davis, Dennis Decker, Nick Jamison, M. Newmyer, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, Christine Schenck, Stevens, Eric Tice, John Wetzel, Caitlyn Wiegle.(Boland, Nicole)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part the #68 Motion to Extend Time and the Court amends our 9/30/19 order solely to allow the Commonwealth Defendants to respond to the first amended complaint no later than 10/24/2019.Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 10/15/2019. (sc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Robin Alvarez, Mark Capozza, Dan Caro, Dawn Davis, Dennis Decker, Nick Jamison, M. Newmyer, Christine Schenck, Stevens, Eric Tice, John Wetzel, Caitlyn Wiegle.(Boland, Nicole)
October 15, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Sheik.(Neal, Cassidy)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying #65 Motion for Preliminary Injuction; See Order for all info; Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 10/7/19 (ep)
October 4, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Order Secretary John Wetzel to Ensure Plaintiff's Meanigful Access to Court by Joel Snider.(ga)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying #62 Motion for Leave to File. Please see Order for details.Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 9/30/2019 (bg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 63 BRIEF in Support re #62 MOTION for Leave to File, filed by Joel Snider. Related document: #62 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Joel Snider.(kpf)
September 19, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File Documents in Case by Joel Snider.(ep)
April 18, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joel Snider (ga)
March 18, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Boland on behalf of Director Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections (Boland, Nicole)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER- IT IS ORDERED that Pltf's Motion #55 to order defendants to serve documents contrary to current practice is DENIED. The parties shall continue to effect service in the mannor consistant with our 2/27/19 Order #53 . Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 3/4/9. (rw)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER - Upon considering Pltf's Motion #54 for Marshal Service and finding the Marshals effected service, IT IS ORDERED that Pltf's Motion #54 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 3/4/19. (rw)
March 1, 2019 Filing 57 Summons Issued as to Pennsylvania Department of Corrections and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw) (Main Document 57 replaced on 3/1/2019) (rw).
March 1, 2019 Filing 56 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #55 MOTION MOTION Re Service at SCI Houtzdale filed by Joel Snider.(bg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION Re Service at SCI Houtzdale by Joel Snider.(bg)
February 28, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION To Order U.S. Marshal Service To Serve Summons ans Complaint on Deft. Pennsylvania Department of Corrections by Joel Snider.(ga)
February 28, 2019 Receipt of payment from JOEL SNIDER in the amount of $350.00 for PLRA CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 2/27/2019. Receipt number 333064589 processed by aoswald. (jjs, )
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion #50 for extension of time is GRANTED and the Clerk of Court shall not enter judgment of default; We stay further progress of this matter until such time as we can make a competency finding as to Mr. Snider in the earlier filed action at No. 15-951; Defendants Motion #51 to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to be renewed upon removing this case from a stay; No party may file motions or papers in this case until further Order following resolution of a determination of Mr. Sniders ability to proceed in this case. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 2/27/19. (rw)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER : Motion for Leave (Doc. 49) is DENIED without prejudice. (see original order for further details. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 02/21/19. (pjr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss by Robin Alvarez, Mark Capozza, Dan Caro, Dawn Davis, Dennis Decker, Nick Jamison, M. Newmyer, Christine Schenck, Stevens, Eric Tice, John Wetzel, Caitlyn Wiegle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boland, Nicole)
February 19, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Merit by Joel Snider.(ga)
February 19, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION For Leave To Engage In Limited Discovery Related To Obtaining An Appropriate Medical Expert And Obtaining A Certificate Of Merit by Joel Snider.(ga)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion Change of Address and to resend documents. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 1/30/19. (aaa)
January 30, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION To Enter Change of Address and to Resend all Documents Mailed Since January 9, 2019 by Joel Snider.(ga)
January 29, 2019 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Caitlyn Wiegle, Stevens, Robin Alvarez, Mark Capozza, Nick Jamison, Dawn Davis, Dennis Decker, M. Newmyer, Eric Tice, Dan Caro, John Wetzel, Christine Schenck. Caitlyn Wiegle waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Stevens waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Robin Alvarez waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Mark Capozza waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Nick Jamison waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Dawn Davis waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Dennis Decker waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; M. Newmyer waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Eric Tice waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Dan Caro waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; John Wetzel waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; Christine Schenck waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Boland, Nicole)
January 29, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Boland on behalf of Robin Alvarez, Mark Capozza, Dan Caro, Dawn Davis, Dennis Decker, Nick Jamison, M. Newmyer, Christine Schenck, Stevens, Eric Tice, John Wetzel, Caitlyn Wiegle (Boland, Nicole)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying #39 Motion for TRO. It is ORDERED the prose Plaintiffs Motion(ECF Doc. No. 39) is DENIED without prejudice to be renewed following the filing of an affidavit of service of the amended Complaint upon the Department of Corrections or other responsible party for internal prison placements under our December 18, 2018 Order (ECF Doc. No. 30). See order for further details.Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 1/22/19 (aaa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Intention to Enter Judgment of Non Pros on Professional Liability Claim, filed by Sheik.(Neal, Cassidy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Sheik. Sheik waiver sent on 1/2/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Neal, Cassidy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassidy L Neal on behalf of Sheik (Neal, Cassidy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 40 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #39 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Joel Snider.(bg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Joel Snider.(bg)
January 18, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joel Snider (ga)
January 17, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joel Snider (ga)
January 2, 2019 Filing 36 U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ga)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: AND NOW, this 28th day of December 2018, upon considering the pro se Plaintiffs Motion to provide Court access through injunctive relief (ECF Doc. No. 32) but unable to presently proceed for imminent equitable relief absent service of the summons and Complaint upon the Defendants until the Defendants are served, it is ORDERED the pro se Plaintiffs Motion (ECF Doc. No. 32) is DENIED without prejudice to be renewed following service of the amended Complaint under our December 18, 2018 Order (ECF Doc. No. 30). Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 12/28/18. (pjr)
December 20, 2018 Filing 34 EXHIBITS by Joel Snider re #33 Brief in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Part Two, #2 Exhibit(s) Part Three)(ga)
December 20, 2018 Filing 33 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #32 MOTION for Order filed by Joel Snider.(ga)
December 20, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Order Defendants PA Doc, Wetzel, Newmyer, Davis and Tice to Provide Joel Snider with Meaningful Court Access by Joel Snider.(ga)
December 19, 2018 Filing 31 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Electronically Mailed to Deputy Attorney General Keli Neary as to Defendants Robin Alvarez, Mark Capozza, Dan Caro, Dawn Davis, Dennis Decker, Director Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, Christine Schenck, Doctor Sheik, PSS Stevens, Eric Tice, John Wetzel, and Caitlyn Wiegle. WAIVERS NOT SENT TO John Doe One, John Doe Two, John Doe Three and John Doe Four DUE TO UN-NAMED DEFENDANTS. Waiver of Service due by 1/18/2019. (rw)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. Pltf's Motion #26 for Leave is DENIED AS MOOT as Pltf has already been granted leave to amend; The First Amended Complaint #28 is deemed filed as it satisfies our November 9, 2018 Order #23 . Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 12/18/18. (rw)
December 14, 2018 Filing 29 Supplement by Joel Snider to #28 Proposed Amended Complaint. (bg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 28 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Joel Snider. #26 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Part ii, #2 Part iii, #3 Part iv)(bg) Modified on 12/19/2018 (rw).
December 14, 2018 Filing 27 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #26 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Joel Snider. (Attachments: #1 Part ii)(bg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Joel Snider.(bg)
November 30, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joel Snider (ga)
November 26, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joel Snider (ga)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED IN PART and we amend our order to allow Plaintiff to file amdcmp no later than 1/4/19 with no further extensions to be granted absent extraordinary good cause. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 11/9/2018. (sc)
November 9, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time of Sixty (60) days to Amend #1 Complaint by Joel Snider.(ga)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Motion #20 for Extension of Time to File Objections is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 10/31/18. (rw)
October 31, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to October 22, 2018 Memorandum Order by Joel Snider.(ga)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #18 Motion for permission to file an interlocutory appeal. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 10/29/18. (aaa)
October 29, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION For Permission To Appeal Denial of Appointment Of Counsel To Third Circuit Court of Appeals by Joel Snider.(ga)
October 22, 2018 Filing 17 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER sent to Prison Superintendent/Warden.(rw)
October 22, 2018 Filing 16 Supplemental COMPLAINT filed by Joel Snider. #1 (sc)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED; #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; #10 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint is GRANTED and the Complaint and Supplemental Complaint #16 are DISMISSED; GRANT Pltf leave to file an amended complaint consistent with this order; and DENY the #14 Motion to Stay. Amended Pleadings due by 11/21/2018. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 10/22/2018 (sc)
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Stay Pending Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Joel Snider.(ga)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF DESIGNATION by the Third Circuit Court of Appeals. Case reassigned to Judge Honorable Mark A Kearney of the ED of PA is hereby designated and assigned this matter. Judge Honorable Matthew W. Brann and Magistrate Judge Schwab no longer assigned to the case.Signed by Honorable D. Brooks Smith, Chief Judge U.S. Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Designation Letter)(jw)
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Joel Snider, Re: Will be filing Motion for Leave to Amend. (ga)
July 9, 2018 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by Joel Snider.(ga)
July 9, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint by Joel Snider.(ga) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2018: #1 Supplementl Complaint) (ga).
April 25, 2018 Filing 9 Letter from Joel Snider to Judge Schwab, Re: Questions and concerns about a number of different cases. (ga)
April 25, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joel Snider.(ga)
April 25, 2018 Filing 7 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION by Joel Snider allowing prison to submit copy of prisoner's trust fund account to the court, and approving the entire filing fee to be deducted from prisoner inmate account.. (ga)
April 13, 2018 Filing 6 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (lg)
April 13, 2018 Filing 5 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (lg)
April 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Joel Snider.(lg)
April 13, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION by Joel Snider allowing prison to submit copy of prisoner's trust fund account to the court, and approving the entire filing fee to be deducted from prisoner inmate account. (lg)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joel Snider.(lg)
April 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joel Snider, pro se (Attachments: #1 complaint continued, #2 Exhibit(s))(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNIDER v. ALVAREZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Officer Heckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C/O KILLEEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Captain Eichenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SCOTT MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown Defendants 1-7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Officer Hatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KATHLEEN ZWEIRZYNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SCI Coal Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ERIC TICE
Represented By: Nicole J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Accountant DENNIS DECKER
Represented By: Nicole J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Officer McKeehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL KLOPOTOSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SHEIK
Represented By: Cassidy L. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Officer Nichtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAN CARO
Represented By: Nicole J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOE THREE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Trish Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: E. Kalsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lieutenant Kuzar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sgt. Gault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LT. BAPTIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. Alvord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jennifer Herrold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole
Represented By: Nicole J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Major Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SCOTT MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NICK JAMISON
Represented By: Nicole J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dr. Ralph Tomei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARK CAPOZZA
Represented By: Nicole J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CO BRANDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Officer Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LT. LEGGORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOE ONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. KOT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Nicole J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sgt. Koelsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ROBIN LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sgt. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Meintel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAWN DAVIS
Represented By: Nicole J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SGT. CLEAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cherie Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN WETZEL
Represented By: Nicole J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOE FOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Crystal Auman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: VINCENT MOONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hughney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LT. DAVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anthony Luscavage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christine Schenck
Represented By: Nicole J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. Newmyer
Represented By: Nicole J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Officer Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C.O. MCCOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SUPERINTENDANT HARRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Levell Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOE TWO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CO BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SCI CAMP HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: OFFICER CARBERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Caitlyn Wiegle
Represented By: Nicole J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JAMES BARNACLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN ALVAREZ
Represented By: Nicole J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVENS
Represented By: Nicole J. Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL SNIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?