TRINIDAD v. FAULKNER et al
Plaintiff: PABLO TRINIDAD
Defendant: S. FAULKNER, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA and THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF CAMBRIA COUNTY
Case Number: 3:2022cv00070
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Keith A Pesto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 8/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 7/7/2022. Copy mailed to non-ECF user. (bgs)
July 6, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by S. FAULKNER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Jacqueline)
June 16, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order and Habeas Petition served on US Attorney Office on 06/02/2022, filed by PABLO TRINIDAD. (dmh)
June 16, 2022 Filing 11 Return of Service Returned Executed by PABLO TRINIDAD. S. FAULKNER served on 6/8/2022, answer due 08/08/2022. (dmh)
June 16, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PABLO TRINIDAD. (dmh). Document removed from view and refiled at #11 . Modified on 6/16/2022 (dmh).
June 6, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by S. FAULKNER. (Brown, Jacqueline)
June 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Brown on behalf of S. FAULKNER. (Brown, Jacqueline)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED RULE and ORDER: Petitioner paid the $5 filing fee for his petition for a writ of habeas corpus after the court granted his motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The grant of in forma pauperis status is therefore modified to extend to service only: the Marshal shall make service of the petition and this Order on the respondent (Shaun Faulkner, Warden, F.C.I. Loretto), the Attorney General, and the United States Attorney for the Western District of Pennsylvania, costs to be advanced by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 5/18/2022. Copy mailed to non-ECF user. (bgs)
May 16, 2022 Filing 5 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 34668005904 (dmh)
May 16, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by PABLO TRINIDAD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lar)
May 10, 2022 Filing 6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by PABLO TRINIDAD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (kss)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE and ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Marshal shall make service of the petition and this order on the respondent (Shaun Faulkner, Warden, F.C.I. Loretto), the Attorney General, and the United States Attorney for the Western District of Pennsylvania, costs to be advanced by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 5/10/2022. Copy mailed to non-ECF user. (bgs)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by PABLO TRINIDAD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lar)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PABLO TRINIDAD. (Attachments: #1 Habeas Petition lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Sealed Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Envelope) (lar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRINIDAD v. FAULKNER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PABLO TRINIDAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. FAULKNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF CAMBRIA COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?