MILLER v. MANNION et al
Petitioner: Akeem Ricky Miller
Respondent: Steve Mannion, Philadelphia Field Office, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, MERRICK GARLAND and Warden of Moshannon Valley Correctional Facility
Case Number: 3:2022cv00120
Filed: August 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Johnstown Office
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Referring Judge: Kim R Gibson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Akeem Ricky Miller (Barre, Abadir)
September 16, 2022 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT by Akeem Ricky Miller. (Barre, Abadir)
August 26, 2022 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER - the MOTION for attorney Abadir Barre to Appear Pro Hac Vice #16 was stricken on 8/11/2022 as it failed to comport with the PAWD Local Rules. Counsel was directed to resubmit his motion, but to date has failed to do so. See Order of 8/11/2022 17 . It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for Petitioner shall (1) file a status report with the Court by 9/16/2022 indicating whether Petitioner has had his final merits hearing and whether Petitioner intends to continue to pursue this habeas case; and, if so, (2) counsel shall resubmit his motion to appear pro hac vice in compliance with this Court's Local Rules by 9/16/2022. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/26/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bsc)
August 11, 2022 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER striking #16 Motion for Abadir Barre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel's motion does not comport with PAWD Local Rule 83.2 B,5. Counsel shall resubmit his motion in accordance with this Court's Local Rules. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/11/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
August 6, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Abadir Barre to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7232833) by Akeem Ricky Miller. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Abadir Barre, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Barre, Abadir)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM ORDER - Upon consideration of Petitioner's filings insofar as he requests a Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction (ECF Nos. #1 , #3 , #10 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Mr. Miller's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. The Court reiterates that it is not now ruling on Mr. Miller's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 8/4/2022. (dlg)
August 3, 2022 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: All counsel are advised that this Court's records indicate they have not been admitted to practice in the Western District of Pennsylvania. Therefore, counsel shall immediately: 1) Make arrangements to receive general admission; 2) Make arrangements for pro hac vice admission; or 3) Advise the Court that they have obtained local counsel who has been admitted to practice in this court. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/3/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
August 2, 2022 Judge Kim R. Gibson presiding and Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy referred. (dmh)
August 2, 2022 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:22-cv-00840. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Schwab; Case is TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Pennsylvania; Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 8/1/22. (sm)
July 11, 2022 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Akeem Ricky Miller - We recommend that the court transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Objections to R&R due by 7/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on July 11, 2022. (kjn)
July 11, 2022 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Robert D. Mariani and referred to Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab for the filing of a Report and Recommendation. (jkc)
June 23, 2022 Filing 10 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF by Akeem Ricky Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Location of Moshannon Valley Correctional Center, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B - Location of Philipsburg, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C - Petitioner's Motion for Bond Redetermination on April 1, 2022, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. D - Petitioner's Motion for Bond Redetermination on May 12, 2022, #5 Exhibit(s) Ex. E - Petitioner's Appeal of Denial of Bond Redetermination, #6 Exhibit(s) Ex. F - Petitioner's Upcoming Final Merits Hearing)(Barre, Abadir)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting ptnr's request #8 for ext of time to file reply to respondents' response until 6/22/2022. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 6/16/22. (ki)
June 15, 2022 Filing 8 Letter from Plaintiff requesting an extension of time. . (Barre, Abadir)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: petition #1 for writ of h/c & response #4 , directing that ptnr Miller may file a reply by 6/15/2022. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 6/1/22. (ki)
June 1, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Merrick Garland, Steve Mannion, Alejandro Mayorkas, Philadelphia Field Office, Warden of Moshannon Valley Correctional Facility by Merrick Garland, Steve Mannion, Alejandro Mayorkas, Philadelphia Field Office, Warden of Moshannon Valley Correctional Facility. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s), #2 Unpublished Opinion(s), #3 Unpublished Opinion(s), #4 Unpublished Opinion(s), #5 Exhibit(s) A, #6 Exhibit(s) B, #7 Exhibit(s) C, #8 Exhibit(s) D, #9 Exhibit(s) E)(Butler, Michael)
June 1, 2022 ADMISSION FORMS SENT to Attorney Janelle Baptiste. (lg)
May 31, 2022 Receipt of payment from AKEEM MILLER in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 5/27/2022. Receipt number 333081275 processed by epetrosk. (jjs)
May 27, 2022 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE on the United States Attorney. (gs)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that The Clerk of Court is directed to immediately serve a copy of the petition #1 and application for order to show cause #3 and this Order on the United States Attorney. On or before June 1, 2022, the United States Attorney shall file a response to the application for order to show cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 5/27/22. (rw)
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 Petitioner's Application for Order to Show Cause in Support of Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Pursuant to 28 USC 2243 by Akeem Ricky Miller.. (lp)
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Abadir Jama Barre on behalf of Akeem Ricky Miller Attorney Abadir Jama Barre is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50 Filing Fee: 50.00 Receipt Number: 333081274 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Movant (Barre), #2 Proposed Order for Pro Hoc Vice) (lp) Modified on 5/27/2022 (lp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2022: #3 Pro Hoc Vice Receipt) (lp).
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5, Receipt Number 333), filed by Akeem Ricky Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter)(lp) Modified on 5/27/2022 (lp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2022: #3 Copy of Filing Fee Receipt) (lp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. MANNION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Akeem Ricky Miller
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Represented By: Janelle A. Baptiste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Mannion
Represented By: Joseph J. Terz
Represented By: Michael Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Philadelphia Field Office
Represented By: Joseph J. Terz
Represented By: Michael Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Represented By: Joseph J. Terz
Represented By: Michael Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MERRICK GARLAND
Represented By: Joseph J. Terz
Represented By: Michael Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Moshannon Valley Correctional Facility
Represented By: Joseph J. Terz
Represented By: Michael Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?