MANDER v. SCI HOUTZDALE et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III
Defendant: SCI HOUTZDALE, JOHN DOE, C.O. MUNSHOWER, STAFF and PRISON OFFICIALS
Case Number: 3:2024cv00021
Filed: February 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying #38 as moot Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. On 3/26/24, this Court entered a Memorandum Order directing that on or before April 26, 2024, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint. ECF No. 32. The Court directed that Plaintiffs Amended Complaint, if any, should be a stand-alone document, complete in itself and without reference to any previous pleadings. It should set forth all claims against all parties in short, concise, and plain statements, and in sequentially numbered paragraphs. Further, it was ordered that Plaintiff must sign the Amended Complaint and must indicate the nature of the relief sought. Notice was given that failure to comply with these instructions may result in the Court striking the amended pleading. A copy of this order will be mailed to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 4/2/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen)
April 1, 2024 Filing 38 MOTION to Amend #18 Complaint by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
March 29, 2024 Filing 37 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, Waiver of the Service of a Summons, Complaint and Order mailed to MUNSHOWER, SCI HOUTZDALE on 3/14/2024 by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III re #17 Order Directing Service, (keh)
March 28, 2024 Filing 36 Remark: Correspondence related to SCI Houtzdale placing plaintiff in Administrative Custody for filing a tax return to obtain a refund for sales taxes paid through commissary purchases (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
March 26, 2024 Filing 33 Remark: Correspondence to the Court (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint; granting #30 Motion to Amend; Plaintiff shall file any Amended Complaint by April 26, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/26/24. (ndf)
March 22, 2024 Filing 31 Remark: Correspondence to the Court Enclosing Additional Copies of Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
March 22, 2024 Filing 30 MOTION to Amend #18 Complaint by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
March 19, 2024 Filing 35 Remark: Correspondence related to conditions of confinement and inadequacy of prison grievance system (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
March 19, 2024 Filing 34 Remark: Correspondence to the Court related to mail sent to court at ECF 23-25 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
March 19, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Complaint by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (keh)
March 18, 2024 Filing 28 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
March 18, 2024 Filing 27 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III. (keh)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. As more fully stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/18/2024. Copies mailed to Plaintiff and inmate accounts officer. (dad)
March 15, 2024 Filing 25 Remark: Correspondence including prison grievances. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (keh)
March 14, 2024 Filing 24 Remark: Correspondence to the Court (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
March 14, 2024 Filing 23 Remark: Correspondence to the Court (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
March 11, 2024 Filing 22 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
March 11, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Authorization Form, #2 Envelope) (keh)
March 7, 2024 Filing 20 Remark: Correspondence to the Court (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
February 27, 2024 Filing 19 Remark: Service Copies forwarded to U.S. Marshals on this date; Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (map)
February 27, 2024 Filing 18 COMPLAINT against SCI HOUTZDALE, C.O. MUNSHOWER, STAFF and PRISON OFFICIALS filed by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit) (map)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SERVICE ORDER: The United States Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit, request for waiver of service of summons, waiver, and this Order to each named defendant as directed by plaintiff. Costs shall be advanced by the government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 2/27/2024. (map)
February 26, 2024 Filing 16 Remark: Correspondence to the Court (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 2/23/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ndf)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DEFICIENCY ORDER : Submission of Required Paperwork (serivce documents) due by 3/25/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 2/23/24. (ndf)
February 22, 2024 Filing 13 Remark: Correspondence to the Court (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
February 22, 2024 Filing 12 Remark: Correspondence to the Court (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
February 20, 2024 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
February 20, 2024 Filing 10 Remark: Correspondence to the Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (keh)
February 20, 2024 Filing 9 Remark: Correspondence to the Court (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2024: #2 Exhibit) (ept). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/21/2024) (ept).
February 20, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
February 16, 2024 Filing 5 Remark: Amended Complaint lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (keh)
February 15, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Authorization Form, #2 Envelope) (keh)
February 15, 2024 Filing 6 Remark: Correspondence to the Court (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
February 12, 2024 Filing 4 Remark: Correspondence to the Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (keh)
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
February 7, 2024 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (keh)
February 7, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Authorization Form, #2 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #3 Envelope) (keh)
February 7, 2024 Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (keh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MANDER v. SCI HOUTZDALE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH EUGENE MANDER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI HOUTZDALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. MUNSHOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRISON OFFICIALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?