Merritts v. Blair County Prison et al
Plaintiff: Terry L. Merritts
Defendant: BLAIR COUNTY PRISON, PRIME CARE MEDICAL INC., ABBIE TATE, Chad Murrey, JENNIFER BENNETT, Anne Frioli and TIFFANY JONES
Case Number: 3:2024cv00108
Filed: May 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Keith A Pesto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2024 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:24-cv-00043. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - AND SO, on this 21st day of May 2024, in accordance with the foregoing, IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER the above-captioned action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania; 2. Plaintiffs motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. Nos. 6, 10) are left to the discretion of the transferee court; and 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/21/24. (dmn)
May 21, 2024 Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto added. (bgs)
March 21, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Terry L. Merritts. (ao)
March 8, 2024 Filing 11 UNCERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Terry L. Merritts. (sh) Modified on 3/8/2024 (lp).
March 8, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terry L. Merritts. (Attachments: #1 Authorization)(sh)
February 20, 2024 Filing 9 SECOND FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Warden or other appropriate official of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide to the Court, under oath, or declare under penalty of perjury, a statement of the current balance in the Plaintiffs account and a record of the transactions in his account that have occurred with the preceding six (6) months. Order sent to Warden and plaintiff. Signed by LP on 02/20/2024. (lp) Modified on 2/26/2024 (lp).
January 24, 2024 Filing 8 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Warden or other appropriate official of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide to the Court, under oath, or declare under penalty of perjury, a statement of the current balance in the Plaintiffs account and a record of the transactions in his account that have occurred with the preceding six (6) months. Order sent to Warden and plaintiff.Signed by LP on 01/24/2024. (lp)
January 23, 2024 Filing 7 AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (sh)
January 23, 2024 Filing 6 UNCERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terry L. Merritts.(sh) Modified on 1/23/2024 (lp).
January 10, 2024 Filing 5 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 01/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
January 10, 2024 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Fed and Local Rules, #4 398 Forms, #5 399 Form) (lp)
January 10, 2024 Filing 3 AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (lp)
January 10, 2024 Filing 2 Application to proceed in forma pauperis (incorrectly completed form - with incorrect filing fee amounts submitted by Terry L. Merritts.. (lp)
January 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Terry L. Merritts.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merritts v. Blair County Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry L. Merritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLAIR COUNTY PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME CARE MEDICAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBIE TATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Murrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Frioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIFFANY JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?