Delpin-Aponte, et al v. Potter, et al
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Serrano-Serrano, Ada Caraballo, Carlos D. Santiago, Merciadel Rodriguez-Bermudez, Marlene E. Perez-Tejada, Luis Angel Marquez-Montanez, Bernardo Brito-Franco, Lorenzo Silva, Conjugal Partnership Monges-Marzan, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Baez, Jose A. Marquez, Benjamin Otero, Jose O. Espada, Maria M. Franco, Magaly Reyes-Mojica, Eneida Soto, Isidro Moran-Perez, All Plaintiffs, Francisco Jusino, Nancy Garcia, Noel Concepcion-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Coparrepa, Maria Torres, Conjugal Partnership Delgado-Caraballo, Norma I. Velasquez, Evelyn Hernandez-Moreno, Carlos A. Malaret, Lourdes Nieves, Gilberto Vazquez-Sierra, Maria de-L. Cambrela-Hernandez, Jose Luis Santiago, Anibal D. Rios-Adorno, Conjugal Partnership Otero-Sanchez, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Alvarado, Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Vega, Conjugal Partnership Mendoza-Munoz, Conjugal Partnership Rabull-Roder, Leopoldo Martinez-Santiago, Jossie Flores-Flores, Tomas J. Hernandez, Ismael Castillo, Carlos J. Rudas, Jose M. Reyes, Myriam R. Vazquez-Santiago, Maria Angelica Martinez, Maritza Ayala, Samuel A. Hernandez-Algarin, Zandra M. Garcia, Maria V. Coparrepa, Sandra I. Maldonado, Conjugal Partnership Beitia-Fernandez, Teresita Ortiz-Montes, Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Menendez, Brunilda Lopez, Cesar E. Soto, Luis A. Lopez-Ruiz, Sol Edwin Berrios, Manuel A. Izquierdo, Conjugal Partnership Melendez-Lebron, Juan L. Toro-Mercado, Maria Resto, Ernesto Colon-Garcia, Sixto Acevedo, Minerva Marrero-Figueroa, Ana Ivette Correa-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Brignoni-Lopez, Nemecia Menendez-Soto, Conjugal Partnership Bermudez-Bermudez, Anthony Reyes-Miranda, Felix Ortiz-Cabrera, Joe Curet-Lopez, Conjugal Partnership Arroyo-Davila, Conjugal Partnership Santos-Cruz, Maria Marrero-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Sostre-Rivera, Rafael A. Nieves, Miguel A. Monges-Marzan, Francisco A. Crespo-Ortiz, Gloria Martinez, Daniel Soto, Felix Santos-Ortiz, Jose L. Rabull-Baez, Amalia Lopez-Santiago, Belinda Echevarria-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Machuca-Aponte, Edwin Hernandez, Jane Doe 02CV1787, Carmen D. Gaud, Conjugal Partnership Arroyo-Portela, Pedro Rivera-Catzo, Carmen L. Banda, Melba Lopez, Conjugal Partnership Camacho-Campus, Valpas, Milagros Serrano-Serrano, Idalia M. Silva, Harry Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Gomez-Montanez, Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Rodriguez, Jessica M. Dones-Olivo, Conjugal Partnership Medina-Nieves, Conjugal Partnership Serrano-Cora, Orlando Hiraldo, Conj. Part. Nieves-Nieves, Roberto Rodriguez-Maldonado, James Smith, Jaime Perez, Conjugal Partnership Moya-Marrero, Manuel Rivera, Dorca I. Flores, Rafael Hernandez, Diana Concepcion, Hydee Cintron-Quinones, Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Garcia, Conjugal Partnership Berrios-Cerp, Conjugal Partnership Izquierdo-Lopez, Ivonne Rosario Cora, Gregorio Banda, Conjugal Partnership Banda-Banda, Luis E. Casillas, Keyla Davila, Irma G. Nieves-Hernandez, Angel M. Velez, Jorge A. Delpin-Aponte, Manuel Tirado, Conjugal Partnership Castro-Oriach, Sonia I. Lugo, Cristobal Otero, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Lebron-Franco, Conjugal Partnership Rios-Andino, Richard Lugo, Glafira Lopez, Carmen M. Salgado-Colon, Carlitos Pacheco-Rodriguez, Jorge Jadee Nietzsche-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Rolon-Rolon, Epifania Rivera, Conjugal Partnership of Otero-Otero, Yolanda Marrero, Hector M. Segui-Caban, Leslie E. Munoz-Alonso, Luis A. Zayas-Hernandez, Rosa J. Aponte-Padilla, Davis Rios-Ramos, Martin Nieves, Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Colon, Ruben Lugo-Sabalier, Satina Sanchez-de-Leon, Enid Perez-Nunez, Conjugal Partnership Rentas-Martinez, Cnjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Ortiz, Lydia E. Colon-De-Ramos, Ana Hilda Alvarado-Rodriguez, Lilliam Hernandez-Figueroa, Luisa Sostre-Figueroa, Longino Lebron, Hector L. Castro, Pedro A. Tirado, Nixsa L. Lebron-Barbosa, Marta Nieves-Rodriguez, Luis R. Rivera, Victor Manuel Arroyo-Hatct, Jose A. Mena-Gonzalez, Zoraida Campus, Conjugal Partnership Acevedo-Cedeno, Edna Rios, Conjugal Partnership Zayas-Velasquez, Conjugal Partnership Marquez-Gonzalez, Ruznilda Saluatella, Magdaluz Avila-Jimenez, Jose M. Rosario, Maria A. Serrano, Mayra Enid Santiago-Santiago, Lilliam M. Ortiz, Maria de-los-Angeles Garcia-Gonzalez, Victor A. Falcon, Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Munoz, Yolanda Marrero-Alamo, Conjugal Partnership Mena-Desarden, Nilda Carrion-Estrada, Felix Echevarria-Rivera, Julio Cuevas, Elba Luz Lopez, Jesus E. Bermudez, C/P Sierra-Leon, Jose Peguero, Nancy Fontan, Sarah Sanchez-De-Leon, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Soto, Conjugal Partnership Colon-Serrano, Juan C. Gonzalez-Del-Valle, Carlos R. Rentas-Acevedo, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Lopez, Elida Montanez-Amaro, Luis R. Giron, Julio M. Ortiz, Otilio Melendez-Gonzalez, Ralph Vega, Conjugal Partnership Claudio-Serrano, Carmen M. Rodriguez, Rafael Rivera, Gloria E. Arroyo-Casiano, Edwin Arroyo-Borras, Trinidad Baez, Miguel A. Pizarro, Conjugal Partnership Giron-Marrero, William Cortez, Ana H. Ortiz, Vera Monserrate Nieves, Carlos D. Carambot, Conjugal Partnership Peguero-Cedeno, Jesus E. Adorno, John A. Rolon, Juan A. Fernandez-Concepcion, Conjugal Partnership Rios-Nieves, Rogelio Lopez, Esteban Amaro-Pintor, Pedro Colon-Melendez, Jose L. Otero, Jose Luis Otero-Zayas, Richard H. Sierra, Conjugal Partnership Reyes-Cambrela, Conjugal Partnership Rios-Dros, Arsenio Claudio, Carmen D. Nieves, Awilda Rodriguez, Violeta Morales, Conjugal Partnership Curet-Cintron, Conjugal Partnership Brito-Donato, Maria de-Lourdes Fernandez, Sigfredo Rios, William Ayala-Serrano, Conjugal Partnership Tirado-Espinell, Carmen L. Otero, Wilson Zayas, Conjugal partnership Sanchez-Nieves, Conjugal Partnership Burgos-Valdez, Conjugal Partnership Marcano-Garcia, Carmen Ivette Nieves-Ayala, Rafael A. Diaz-Nunez, Conjugal Partnership Santiago-Perez, Rafael Antonio Monge-Berrios, Sonia I. Goveo, Conjugal Partnership Feliciano-Cosme, Lourdes Dros-Morales, Luis Rene Torres, Conjugal Partnership Amaro-Martinez, Jose Rafael Beitia-Perez, Pedro L. Ortiz, Norma I. Cosme-Archilla, Conjugal Partnership Velazquez-Agosto, Aida Luz Davila-Gonzalez, Arcadio Mendoza, Agustin Torres, Jose V. Roman-Rivera, Cristino Delgado-Ocasio, Lidia Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Nieves-Perez, Luis A. Camacho, Birgit Roder, Conjugal Parnership Smith-Smith, Mariano Perez-Vazquez, Emilio Burgos-Rodriguez, Hector L. Perez-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Segui-Avila, Conjugal Partnership Malaret-Albino, Margarita Ortiz-Lopez, Hector Rivera-Arzola, Nancy E. Rosa, Jeffrey Gonzalez-Garcia, Maria E. Ramos-Aquino, Melvin Henry Ramos, Ada I. Leon, Feliciano Santiago-Rosado, Neyda David, Gladys Cruz-Martinez, Maxima Oriach-Rojas, Margie Boll, Rosa M. Reyes, Eduardo Machuca-Garcia, Idys Y. Vazquez, Maria Edna Perez, Benjamin Hernandez, Carlos E. Berrios-Torres, Conjugal Parnership Perez-Perez, Eddie Diaz-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Resto-Resto, Hilda M. Rolon, Aurea M. Espinell, Ruben Merced-Merced, Mary E. Marzan-Marzan, Sonia Ivette Gonzalez-Marquez, Victor M. Torres-Sanchez, Jorge Luis Nieves, Ilia Rodriguez-Figueroa, Joseph A. Rodriguez-Sanchez, Gumersindo Gonzalez, Eden Desarden, Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-David, Nilda Rivera, Jr Francisco Ortiz, Martin O. Febres, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Ramirez, Peggy D. Droz-Torres, William Rios, Jorge L. Torres-Suarez, Carmen Astacia, Conjugal Partnership Martinez-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Aquino, Angel R. Lorenzana, Sylvia Matos-Perez, Jose L. Sostre, Guillermina Garcia, KeirryDei C. Alvarez-Martinez, Miguel A. Burgos-Vega, Jenaro Laguer, Wilfredo Sanchez-Rivera, Eva I. Valdez-Acevedo, Nydia V. Rivera, Nilsa Margarita Portela-Mendez, Gloria M. Gonzalez, Nilda J. Garcia, Maria Isabel Caraballo, Gerardo Gomez-Arroyo, Ana L. Lopez-Corcino, Conjugal Partnership Cortez-Boll, Vivian Perez-Serra, Luis Angel Palacios-Alvarez, Felix A. Perez, Marcelino Velazquez-Olivencia, Ronda Santa Santiago, Conjugal Partnership Pacheco-Rodriguez, Olga Violeta Olmedo-Ruiz, Norma I. Meurer, Conjugal Partnership Jose M. Hernandez-Rodriguez and Antonia Lopez-Caceres, Gilberto Velazquez-Mendez, Ernesto Melendez-Nieves, Roberto Marrero-Almodovar, Brunilda Hernandez, Evelyn Hernandez, Juan A. Marcano-Perez, Anthony Melendez, Sarai Cruz-Maldonado, Wanda Cerp, Luz E. Ortiz, Rafael Medina-Hernandez, Angeles Bermudez-Gomez, Melba Agosto-Febo, Conjugal Partnership Tirado-Vazquez, Conjugal Partnership Jusino-Hernandez, Evelyn Soto-Llanger, Edna Rijos, Conjugal Partnership Melendez-Torres, Laura I. Vega-Vazquez, Laura E. Munoz, Richard Garcia-Aleman, Xavier A. Vega-Sanchez, Angel Luis Torres-Cortes, Milton Martinez-Hernandez, Jessica V. Donato-Matias, Oneida Andino, Santa H. Aquino-Mercado, Conjugal Partnership Pizarro-Ayala, Conjugal Partnership Santiago-Santiago, Miguel Lazada-Rolon, Conjugal Partnership Berrios-Vazquez, Conjugal Partnership Rios-Ortiz, Josephine Ayllon, Maria M. Rivera, Daniel Santos-Rivera, Irina Smith, Juan A. Feliciano, Daisy Albino, Conjugal Partnership Otero-Saluatella, Carmen S. Vazquez-Soto, Conjugal Partnership Navarro-Ortiz, Carmen Zoraida Ortiz-Rivera, Rosa Cedeno, Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Vega-Droz, Epifanio Moya-Ramos, C/P Diaz-Santiago, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Flores, Jorge L. Rosario-Oliveras, Enrique Resto-Rodriguez, Zaida Malave-Torres, Norberto Ramirez-Caraballo, Maria L. Cedeno, Conj part Carmelo Gonzalez and Anastacia Cruz, Nancy M. Romero, Manuel Morales-del-Valle, Conjugal Partnership Santos-Ortiz, Conjugal Partnership Febres-Doe, Miguel A. Gonzalez, Damian Fonseca, Conjugal Partnership Vega-Garcia, John A. Pastrana, Ricardo Rivera-Ortia, Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Davila, Hector Brignoni, Carlos Sanchez-Cruz, Conjugal Partnership Nietzsche-Olmedo, Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Ramos, Juan Camacho, Conjugal Partnership Marrero-Marrero, Victor D. Navarro, Luis R. Garcia, Ernesto Lopez-Merced, Alberto Ortiz-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Carrion, Conjugal Partnership Delpin-Echevarria, Nancy Rodriguez-Otero, Conjugal Partnership Lorenzana-Soto, Elisa Ramirez-Gomez, Conjugal Partnership Laguer-Sostre and Jose David Munoz-Melendez
Defendant: Roberto Perez-De-Leon, John E. Potter and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 3:2002cv01787
Filed: May 24, 2002
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2005. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2005 Filing 102 Letter from US Courts of Federal Claims. (jg, )
June 15, 2005 Filing 101 TRANSMITTAL Letter to the US Federal Claims forwarding certified copies of Order of Transfer,Docket Sheet with case record attached. (jg, )
June 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for #96 Report and Recommendation and granting in part and denying in part #72 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John E. Potter. The Clerk shall transfer this case to the United States Court of Federal Claims. . Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 06/15/05. (jg, )
June 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER noted #85 Motion to Amend/Correct . Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 6/15/05. (ac, )
January 27, 2005 Filing 98 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation re: #96 Report and Recommendation; filed by John E. Potter (Wynn, Nicole) Modified on 1/31/2005 add link (jg, ).
January 21, 2005 Filing 97 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #96 Report and Recommendation, (Lampon-Gonzalez, Santiago)
January 13, 2005 Filing 96 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #72 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs filed by John E. Potter. Objections to R&R due by 1/28/2005. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/13/05. (frm)
January 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER VACATING #93 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/13/05. (frm)
January 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER finding MOOT #91 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by John E. Potter. See Docket No. 92 . Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/13/05. (frm)
January 13, 2005 Filing 93 **FILED IN ERROR-PDF INCOMPLETE-SEE #96**REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #72 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs filed by John E. Potter. Objections to R&R due by 1/28/2005. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/13/05. (frm) Modified on 1/19/2005 (ft, ).
January 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re: #89 Motion to Stay. DENIED. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/13/05. (frm)
January 13, 2005 Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by John E. Potter Re: #89 MOTION to Stay re: #72 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs filed by John E. Potter, filed by All Plaintiffs, (Wynn, Nicole)
January 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #89 MOTION to Stay re: #72 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs filed by John E. Potter, filed by All Plaintiffs,, #72 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs filed by John E. Potter,, #85 MOTION to Amend/Correct Re: #80 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs, filed by All Plaintiffs, TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Gustavo A. Gelpi for Report & Recommendation or disposition where appropriate. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 1/12/05. (ac, )
January 12, 2005 Magistrate Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi added to correct the Case Assignment Deck for conversion purposes of the new Automated Case Assignment Module in CM/ECF. (li, )
January 12, 2005 Magistrate Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi terminated briefly to correct the Case Assignment Deck for conversion purposes of the new Automated Case Assignment Module in CM/ECF. (li, )
January 11, 2005 Filing 89 MOTION to Stay re: #72 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs filed by John E. Potter, AND/OR FOR EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL 1/28/05 TO PROPERLY OPPOSE THE NEW ARGUMENTS RAISED BY THE USPS filed bySantiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/24/2005 (Related document(s) #72 ) (Lampon-Gonzalez, Santiago) Modified on 1/13/2005 to add docket text. (ft, ).
January 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER noted #86 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by John E. Potter. Noted and Granted #87 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Vladimir Mihailovich-Nikolich filed by plaintiffs. Remainig counsel for plaintiffs shall comply with any remaining deadlines . Signed by Magistrate-Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/10/05. (sm, )
January 6, 2005 Filing 87 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Attorney as to Vladimir Mihailovich-Nikolich filed byVladimir Mihailovich-Nikolich on behalf of all plaintiffs (Mihailovich-Nikolich, Vladimir)
December 30, 2004 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to re: #72 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by John E. Potter Re: #85 MOTION to Amend/Correct Re: #80 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs, filed by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' June 17, 2004 Expert Report#2 Exhibit Treatise Excerpt)(Wynn, Nicole) Modified on 1/4/2005 (jg, ).
December 16, 2004 Filing 85 MOTION to Amend/Correct Re: #80 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs, filed bySantiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/29/2004 (Related document(s) #80 ) (Lampon-Gonzalez, Santiago) Modified on 12/17/2004 to create relationship to document #72 (ft, ).
December 7, 2004 Reset Deadlines as to #72 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 12/31/2004. (Re #84). (ft, )
December 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Leave to File. Granted as requested. Plaintiffs shall have until December 31, 2004 to file a surreply, if any. No further extension shall be granted. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/7/04. (frm)
December 6, 2004 Filing 83 First MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply filed by Nicole Wynn on behalf of John E. Potter Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/20/2004 (Wynn, Nicole)
December 3, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re: #81 Motion for Leave to File. Granted. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/3/04. (frm)
December 2, 2004 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to File Document in the Clerk's Office filed by Vladimir Mihailovich-Nikolich on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/15/2004 (Mihailovich-Nikolich, Vladimir) Modified on 12/7/2004. EXHIBITS FILED IN THE CLERK'S OFFICE. (ft, ).
December 2, 2004 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #72 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs filed by John E. Potter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Admitted and Disputed Facts in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Mihailovich-Nikolich, Vladimir)
November 15, 2004 Reset Deadlines as to #72 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs. Response due by 11/30/2004. (Re #79). (ft, )
November 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re #78 Motion for extension of time. Granted as requested. No further extensions shall be allowed. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/15/04. (frm)
November 15, 2004 Filing 78 Second MOTION for extension of time until November 30, 2004 to reply to #72 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Vladimir Mihailovich-Nikolich on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/29/2004 (Mihailovich-Nikolich, Vladimir) Modified on 11/22/2004 to create link to docket #72. (ft, ).
October 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: The Pretrial Conference set for Monday, October 18, 2004 is hereby set aside. A new Pretrial Conference date will be set. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on October 15, 2004. (cat,)
October 12, 2004 Reset Deadlines as to #72 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs. Response due by 11/13/2004. (Re #76). (ft, )
October 12, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting as requested #74 Motion for extension of time . Signed by Magistrate-Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/12/04. (sm, )
October 12, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting as requested #73 Motion for extension of time . Signed by Magistrate-Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/12/04. (sm, )
October 8, 2004 Filing 74 MOTION for extension of time until November 13, 2004 to Reply to #72 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Vladimir Mihailovich-Nikolich on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/21/2004 (Mihailovich-Nikolich, Vladimir) Modified on 10/18/2004 to link to docket #72. (ft, ).
October 8, 2004 Filing 73 Second MOTION for extension of time until October 26, 2004 to Make Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosure to Plaintiffs filed by Nicole Wynn on behalf of John E. Potter Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/21/2004 (Wynn, Nicole)
September 30, 2004 Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs filed by Nicole Wynn on behalf of John E. Potter Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/13/2004 (Wynn, Nicole)
August 26, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER finding as moot #42 Motion for Leave to File . Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 8/26/04. (ac, )
August 26, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER finding as moot in part and granting in part 34 Motion to Dismiss, granting #41 Motion to Dismiss, granting [] Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 8/26/04. (ac, )
August 19, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER NOTED #68 Notice of Appearance filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 08/19/04. (sm, )
August 19, 2004 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Vladimir Mihailovich-Nikolich by on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mihailovich-Nikolich, Vladimir)
August 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting as requested #66 Motion for Extension of Time to File . Signed by Magistrate-Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 08/18/04. (sm, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 66 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/30/04 to File Dispositive Motions and to continue PTC until 10/18/04 filed by Nicole Wynn on behalf of John E. Potter Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/31/2004 (Wynn, Nicole) Modified on 8/20/2004 to add docket text.(ft, ).
August 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER NOTED re #64 Notice (Other) filed by All Plaintiffs . Signed by Magistrate-Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 08/18/04. (sm, ) Modified on 8/20/2004 to delete filers. (ft, ).
August 18, 2004 Filing 64 NOTICE of Depositions by All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notices of Deposition)(Lampon-Gonzalez, Santiago) Modified on 8/20/2004 to delete filers. (ft, ).
August 2, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re #60 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Cnjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Ortiz, et. al.: This document shall be striken from the record. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 08/02/04. (sm, )
August 2, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER noted #61 INFORMATIVE motion . Signed by Magistrate-Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 08/02/04. (sm, )
July 29, 2004 Filing 61 INFORMATIVE Motion re: expert witness report filed by Marcos Valls-Sanchez on behalf of all plaintiffs (Valls-Sanchez, Marcos) Modified on 7/30/2004 to add docket text. (ft, ).
July 28, 2004 Filing 60 **STRIKEN FROM THE RECORD**FILED IN ERROR-WRONG PDF ATTACHED** INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Marcos Valls-Sanchez on behalf of all plaintiffs (Valls-Sanchez, Marcos) Modified on 7/29/2004 (ft, ). Modified on 8/3/2004 (ft, ).
July 28, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER noted #58 INFORMATIVE motion . Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 7/28/04. (ac, )
July 27, 2004 Filing 58 First INFORMATIVE Motion re Defendant's Rule 26(a) Expert Disclosure filed by Nicole Wynn on behalf of John E. Potter (Wynn, Nicole)
July 20, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Noting #56 Notice of Service filed by defendants. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 07/20/04. (ec)
July 19, 2004 Filing 56 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Documents by John E. Potter (Wynn, Nicole)
July 9, 2004 Set Deadlines: Motions due by 8/30/2004. (Re #55). (ft, )
July 9, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: In light of this Court's order, Docket No. 53 , motions for summary judgment shall be filed no later than thirty (30) days from the date which discovery is concluded. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 07/09/04. (ec)
July 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re #52 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by United States Postal Service, Roberto Perez-De-Leon, John E. Potter. SEE RULING AS TO DOCKET NO. 51. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 07/01/04. (sm, )
July 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granted as requested #51 Motion for extension of time . No further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 07/01/04. (sm, )
June 30, 2004 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by all defendants Re: #51 First MOTION for extension of time to Suplement Answers to Interrogatories filed by Cnjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Ortiz, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Lopez, Rafael Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Rivera, Conj part Carmelo Gonzalez and Anastacia Cruz, Manuel Rivera, Conjugal Parnership Smith-Smith, Conj. Part. Nieves-Nieves, Conjugal Partnership of Otero-Otero, Maria M. Rivera, Harry Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Santiago-Santiago, C/P Diaz-Santiago, C/P Marrero-Marrero, Conjugal Partnership Martinez-Perez, Yolanda Marrero, Conjugal Partnership Jose M. Hernandez-Rodriguez and Antonia Lopez-Caceres, Nancy Fontan, Conjugal Partnership Santiago-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Soto, Conjugal Partnership Berrios-Vazquez, Conjugal Partnership Colon-Serrano, Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Colon, Conjugal Parnership Perez-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Garcia, Benjamin Hernandez, Carmen M. Rodriguez, Gloria Martinez, Jose L. Otero, Edwin Hernandez, Hector L. Castro, Conjugal Partnership Acevedo-Cedeno, Conjugal Partnership Diaz-Ramos, Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Hernandez, Miguel A. Gonzalez, William Rios, Felix Ortiz, Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Rodriguez, Rosa Cedeno, Juan Camacho, Conjugal partnership Sanchez-Nieves, Daniel Soto, Rafael Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Santos-Ortiz, Conjugal Partnership Tirado-Vazquez, Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Munoz, Conjugal Partnership Nieves-Perez, Luis R. Rivera, Awilda Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Ramirez, Conjugal Partnership Sostre-Rivera, Milton Martinez-Hernandez, Maria Resto, Nilda Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Vega, Jorge A. Delpin-Aponte, Belinda Echevarria-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Delpin-Echevarria, Noel Concepcion-Rivera, Diana Concepcion, Juan C. Gonzalez-Del-Valle, Evelyn Hernandez, Samuel A. Hernandez-Algarin, Leslie E. Munoz-Alonso, Alberto Ortiz-Torres, Melvin Henry Ramos, Lydia E. Colon-De-Ramos, Davis Rios-Ramos, Irma G. Nieves-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Rios-Nieves, Ricardo Rivera-Ortia, Roberto Rodriguez-Maldonado, Jorge L. Rosario-Oliveras, Laura I. Vega-Vazquez, Marcelino Velazquez-Olivencia, Sarah Sanchez-De-Leon, Conjugal Partnership Otero-Sanchez, All Plaintiffs, Zaida Malave-Torres, Yolanda Marrero-Alamo, Xavier A. Vega-Sanchez, Peggy D. Droz-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Vega-Droz, Wilson Zayas, Norma I. Velasquez, Conjugal Partnership Zayas-Velasquez, Lilliam M. Ortiz, Conjugal Partnership Rios-Ortiz, William Cortez, Margie Boll, Conjugal Partnership Cortez-Boll, William Ayala-Serrano, Victor Manuel Arroyo-Hatct, Aida Luz Davila-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Arroyo-Davila, Victor M. Torres-Sanchez, Sol Edwin Berrios, Wanda Cerp, Conjugal Partnership Berrios-Cerp, Sixto Acevedo, Maria L. Cedeno, Sigfredo Rios, Oneida Andino, Conjugal Partnership Rios-Andino, Feliciano Santiago-Rosado, Ronda Santa Santiago, Jose Luis Santiago, Sandra I. Maldonado, Ruben Merced-Merced, Sonia I. Goveo, Rosa J. Aponte-Padilla, Eduardo Machuca-Garcia, Conjugal Partnership Machuca-Aponte, Roberto Marrero-Almodovar, Minerva Marrero-Figueroa, Richard Lugo, Keyla Davila, Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Davila, Richard H. Sierra, Ada I. Leon, C/P Sierra-Leon, Richard Garcia-Aleman, Nancy Rodriguez-Otero, Trinidad Baez, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Baez, Rafael Antonio Monge-Berrios, KeirryDei C. Alvarez-Martinez, Rafael A. Nieves, Carmen D. Nieves, Rafael A. Diaz-Nunez, Maria E. Ramos-Aquino, Pedro Rivera-Catzo, Teresita Ortiz-Montes, Pedro Colon-Melendez, Milagros Serrano-Serrano, Pedro A. Tirado, Idys Y. Vazquez, Otilio Melendez-Gonzalez, Orlando Hiraldo, Violeta Morales, Norma I. Meurer, Norberto Ramirez-Caraballo, Nancy Garcia, Miguel Lazada-Rolon, Sylvia Matos-Perez, Miguel A. Pizarro, Maritza Ayala, Conjugal Partnership Pizarro-Ayala, Sarai Cruz-Maldonado, Miguel A. Burgos-Vega, Eva I. Valdez-Acevedo, Conjugal Partnership Burgos-Valdez, Merciadel Rodriguez-Bermudez, Carmen Zoraida Ortiz-Rivera, Melba Agosto-Febo, Gilberto Velazquez-Mendez, Conjugal Partnership Velazquez-Agosto, Martin Nieves, Lourdes Nieves, Marta Nieves-Rodriguez, Mariano Perez-Vazquez, Elisa Ramirez-Gomez, Manuel Tirado, Aurea M. Espinell, Conjugal Partnership Tirado-Espinell, Manuel Morales-del-Valle, Magaly Reyes-Mojica, Luis Rene Torres, Luis R. Garcia, Guillermina Garcia, Luis E. Casillas, Sonia I. Lugo, Luis A. Zayas-Hernandez, Luis A. Lopez-Ruiz, Santa H. Aquino-Mercado, Conjugal Partnership Lopez-Aquino, Luis A. Camacho, Luis Angel Palacios-Alvarez, Ana Ivette Correa-Rivera, Luis Angel Marquez-Montanez, Sonia Ivette Gonzalez-Marquez, Conjugal Partnership Marquez-Gonzalez, Lorenzo Silva, Idalia M. Silva, Longino Lebron, Maria M. Franco, Conjugal Partnership Lebron-Franco, Lidia Gonzalez, Julio M. Ortiz, Neyda David, Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-David, Juan L. Toro-Mercado, Juan A. Marcano-Perez, Maria de-los-Angeles Garcia-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Marcano-Garcia, Juan A. Fernandez-Concepcion, Evelyn Hernandez-Moreno, Joseph A. Rodriguez-Sanchez, Ana Hilda Alvarado-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Alvarado, Jose V. Roman-Rivera, Jose O. Espada, Jose M. Rosario, Jose M. Reyes, Rosa M. Reyes, Josephine Ayllon, Jose Rafael Beitia-Perez, Maria de-Lourdes Fernandez, Conjugal Partnership Beitia-Fernandez, Jose Luis Otero, Satina Sanchez-de-Leon, Jose L. Sostre, Epifania Rivera, Jose L. Rabull-Baez, Birgit Roder, Conjugal Partnership Rabull-Roder, Julio Cuevas, Jose David Munoz-Melendez, Joe Curet-Lopez, Hydee Cintron-Quinones, Conjugal Partnership Curet-Cintron, Jose A. Marquez, Jorge Jadee Nietzsche-Hernandez, Olga Violeta Olmedo-Ruiz, Conjugal Partnership Nietzsche-Olmedo, John A. Pastrana, Jeffrey Gonzalez-Garcia, James Smith, Irina Smith, Jaime Perez, Ivonne Rosario Cora, Jose Antonio Serrano-Serrano, Conjugal Partnership Serrano-Cora, Ismael Castillo, Isidro Moran-Perez, Hector Rivera-Arzola, Hector M. Segui-Caban, Magdaluz Avila-Jimenez, Conjugal Partnership Segui-Avila, Hector L. Perez-Rivera, Vivian Perez-Serra, Gloria M. Gonzalez, Gloria E. Arroyo-Casiano, Gilberto Vazquez-Sierra, Gerardo Gomez-Arroyo, Elida Montanez-Amaro, Conjugal Partnership Gomez-Montanez, Jorge L. Torres-Suarez, Myriam R. Vazquez-Santiago, Francisco Ortiz, Felix Echevarria-Rivera, Lilliam Hernandez-Figueroa, Felix A. Perez, Jossie Flores-Flores, Conjugal Partnership Perez-Flores, Valpas, Esteban Amaro-Pintor, Maria Angelica Martinez, Conjugal Partnership Amaro-Martinez, Ernesto Melendez-Nieves, Nixsa L. Lebron-Barbosa, Conjugal Partnership Melendez-Lebron, Ernesto Lopez-Merced, Ernesto Colon-Garcia, Epifanio Moya-Ramos, Maria Marrero-Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Moya-Marrero, Enrique Resto-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Resto-Resto, Eneida Soto, Cesar E. Soto, Emilio Burgos-Rodriguez, Eddie Diaz-Gonzalez, Mayra Enid Santiago-Santiago, Dorca I. Flores, Brunilda Lopez, Cristino Delgado-Ocasio, Maria Isabel Caraballo, Conjugal Partnership Delgado-Caraballo, Carmen M. Salgado-Colon, Carmen L. Banda, Gregorio Banda, Conjugal Partnership Banda-Banda, Carlos E. Berrios-Torres, Carmen S. Vazquez-Soto, Carlos D. Carambot, Benjamin Otero, Ruznilda Saluatella, Conjugal Partnership Otero-Saluatella, Arsenio Claudio, Maria A. Serrano, Conjugal Partnership Claudio-Serrano, Arcadio Mendoza, Laura E. Munoz, Conjugal Partnership Mendoza-Munoz, Anthony Reyes-Miranda, Maria de-L. Cambrela-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Reyes-Cambrela, Anthony Melendez, Maria Torres, Conjugal Partnership Melendez-Torres, Anibal D. Rios-Adorno, Lourdes Dros-Morales, Conjugal Partnership Rios-Dros, Angel Luis Torres-Cortes, Amalia Lopez-Santiago, Elba Luz Lopez, Miguel A. Monges-Marzan, Mary E. Marzan-Marzan, Conjugal Partnership Monges-Marzan, Cristobal Otero, Carmen L. Otero, Daniel Santos-Rivera, Gladys Cruz-Martinez, Conjugal Partnership Santos-Cruz, Manuel A. Izquierdo, Glafira Lopez, Conjugal Partnership Izquierdo-Lopez, Rogelio Lopez, Luz E. Ortiz, Wilfredo Sanchez-Rivera, Vera Monserrate Nieves, Jesus E. Bermudez, Angeles Bermudez-Gomez, Conjugal Partnership Bermudez-Bermudez, Jenaro Laguer, Luisa Sostre-Figueroa, Conjugal Partnership Laguer-Sostre, Jessica M. Dones-Olivo, Agustin Torres, Felix Santos-Ortiz, Margarita Ortiz-Lopez, Juan A. Feliciano, Norma I. Cosme-Archilla, Conjugal Partnership Feliciano-Cosme, Carlitos Pacheco-Rodriguez, Ilia Rodriguez-Figueroa, Conjugal Partnership Pacheco-Rodriguez, Hector Brignoni, Ana L. Lopez-Corcino, Conjugal Partnership Brignoni-Lopez, Nilda J. Garcia, Edwin Arroyo-Borras, Nilsa Margarita Portela-Mendez, Conjugal Partnership Arroyo-Portela, Jose Peguero, Conjugal Partnership Peguero-Cedeno, Damian Fonseca, Francisco A. Crespo-Ortiz, Zoraida Campus, Conjugal Partnership Camacho-Campus, Ada Caraballo, John A. Rolon, Hilda M. Rolon, Conjugal Partnership Rolon-Rolon, Tomas J. Hernandez, Melba Lopez, Carlos D. Santiago, Enid Perez-Nunez, Victor A. Falcon, Carmen D. Gaud, Pedro L. Ortiz, Maria V. Coparrepa, Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Coparrepa, Nydia V. Rivera, Francisco Jusino, Brunilda Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Jusino-Hernandez, Daisy Albino, Carlos A. Malaret, Conjugal Partnership Malaret-Albino, Luis R. Giron, Conjugal Partnership Giron-Marrero, Nilda Carrion-Estrada, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Carrion, Martin O. Febres, Jane Doe 02CV1787, Conjugal Partnership Febres-Doe, Victor D. Navarro, Ana H. Ortiz, Conjugal Partnership Navarro-Ortiz, Carlos R. Rentas-Acevedo, Conjugal Partnership Rentas-Martinez, Leopoldo Martinez-Santiago, Marlene E. Perez-Tejada, Angel R. Lorenzana, Evelyn Soto-Llanger, Conjugal Partnership Lorenzana-Soto, Carmen Astacia, Carlos Sanchez-Cruz, Carlos J. Rudas, Jose A. Mena-Gonzalez, Eden Desarden, Conjugal Partnership Mena-Desarden, Jorge Luis Nieves, Maria Edna Perez, Ruben Lugo-Sabalier, Nemecia Menendez-Soto, Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Menendez, Maxima Oriach-Rojas, Conjugal Partnership Castro-Oriach, Edna Rios, Gumersindo Gonzalez, Nancy M. Romero, Angel M. Velez, Bernardo Brito-Franco, Jessica V. Donato-Matias, Conjugal Partnership Brito-Donato, Rafael Medina-Hernandez, Carmen Ivette Nieves-Ayala, Conjugal Partnership Medina-Nieves, Zandra M. Garcia, Ralph Vega, Conjugal Partnership Vega-Garcia, Jesus E. Adorno, Nancy E
June 29, 2004 Filing 51 First MOTION for extension of time to Suplement Answers to Interrogatories filed by Marcos Valls-Sanchez on behalf of all plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/12/2004 (Valls-Sanchez, Marcos)
June 23, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting as unopposed #44 Motion to Compel . Signed by Magistrate-Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 06/23/04. (sm, )
June 22, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER noted #48 Informative motion . Signed by Magistrate-Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 06/22/04. (sm, )
June 18, 2004 Filing 48 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez on behalf of all plaintiffs (Lampon-Gonzalez, Santiago)
May 24, 2004 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion Deadline due by 6/20/2004 re: #44 Motion to Compel. (ct, ).
May 24, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time as requested. No further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 05/24/04. (ec)
May 24, 2004 Filing 46 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants Motion to Compel Responses to First set of Interrogatories filed by Marcos Valls-Sanchez on behalf of all plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/7/2004 (Valls-Sanchez, Marcos)
May 19, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ENDORSED ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #44 MOTION to Compel filed by United States Postal Service, Roberto Perez-De-Leon, John E. Potter TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Gustavo A. Gelpi for disposition. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 5/19/04. (ac, )
May 17, 2004 Filing 44 MOTION to Compel responses to defts' first set of interrogatories and requests for production of documents filed by Nicole Wynn on behalf of all defendants (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit)(ft, )
April 6, 2004 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by all defendants Re: #42 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Plaintiff's O pposition filed by United States Postal Service, Roberto Perez-De-Leon, John E. Potter (Sevillano-Del-Rio, Fidel) Modified on 4/19/2004 to correct filing date. (ft, ).
April 6, 2004 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Plaintiff's O pposition filed by Fidel A. Sevillano-Del-Rio on behalf of all defendants Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/19/2004 (Sevillano-Del-Rio, Fidel)
March 26, 2004 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by all plaintiffs Re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by all defendants filed by United States Postal Service, Roberto Perez-De-Leon, John E. Potter. (See #41). (ft, )
March 26, 2004 MOTION to Withdraw the cause of actions for Title VII discrimination, and the Retiree Class claim to recover deficient pension payments filed by all plaintiffs. (See #41). (ft, )
March 26, 2004 Filing 41 MOTION to dismiss Motion for Partial Withdrawal and Opposition to Motion to Dismiss as to Roberto Perez filed by Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez on behalf of all parties Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/8/2004 (Lampon-Gonzalez, Santiago) Modified on 3/30/2004 to correct docket text. (ft, ).
March 19, 2004 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by all defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/23/2004. (See #40). (ft, )
March 19, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by all defendants filed by United States Postal Service, Roberto Perez-De-Leon, John E. Potter. No further extension shall be granted. . Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 3/19/04. (ac, )
March 19, 2004 Filing 39 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Until March 23, 2004 as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by all defendants filed by United States Postal Service, Roberto Perez-De-Leon, John E. Potter, 38 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, Order on Motion for extension of time, filed by Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez on behalf of all plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/1/2004 (Related document(s) 34 , 38 ) (Lampon-Gonzalez, Santiago)
March 16, 2004 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by all defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/19/2004. Notice of compliance deadline by 3/19/04. (See #38). (ft, )
March 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, granting #37 Motion for extension of time to file expert report and announce additional expert. Response due by 3/19/2004.. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 3/16/04. (ac, )
March 15, 2004 Filing 37 MOTION for extension of time To Announce Expert Witness and To File Expert Report filed by Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez on behalf of all plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/29/2004 (Lampon-Gonzalez, Santiago)
March 12, 2004 Filing 36 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Until March 19, 2004 filed by Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez on behalf of all plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/25/2004 (Lampon-Gonzalez, Santiago)
March 1, 2004 Filing 35 Second NOTICE of Interrogatories by United States Postal Service (Sevillano-Del-Rio, Fidel)
February 20, 2004 Filing 34 MOTION w/memorandum in support to Dismiss all Title VII claims, the Retiree Class, and all pltfs named solely in rep of their conjugal relationship w/an Agent employee filed by all defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/4/2004 (ft, )
January 30, 2004 Filing 33 REPORT re: R. 26(a)(1) initial disclosures by all plaintiffs. (ft, )
January 27, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER adopting 31 Stipulation filed by John E. Potter, All Plaintiffs Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2004 10:00 AM in JAG's Chambers before Jay A Garcia-Gregory. Settlement Conference set for 9/17/2004 10:00 AM in JAG's Chambers before Jay A Garcia-Gregory. A Trial date will be set at that time. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 1/23/04. (ft, )
January 14, 2004 Filing 31 STIPULATION under R. 16(b) and R. 26(f) by the pts (ft)
January 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting [29-1] motion for Nicole Wynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory ) (ft)
December 29, 2003 Filing 29 MOTION by John E. Potter, Roberto Perez-De-Leon for Nicole Wynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ni)
December 11, 2003 Filing 28 Intial Scheduling Conference Report: Conf held on 12/9/03. Pts are to inform w/in 5 days if consent to proceed before a mag is going to be given. W/in the next 10 days, they are to submit a proposed time table for the final disposition of the case. set Notice of Compliance deadline to 12/19/03 . Should pts believe that a mediation and/or stlmt conf will help in the final disposition of the case, the req and scheduling can be made on short ntc. signed by Magistrate Judge Jesus A. Castellanos (ft)
December 9, 2003 Scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Jesus A. Castellanos (ft)
November 14, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER reset Initial Scheduling Conference for 10:00 12/9/03 before Magistrate Judge Jesus A. Castellanos ( signed by Magistrate Judge Jesus A. Castellanos ) (ft)
November 13, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER set Initial Scheduling Conference for 9:00 11/18/03 before Magistrate Judge Jesus A. Castellanos ( signed by Magistrate Judge Jesus A. Castellanos ) (ft)
November 3, 2003 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM of the Clerk assigning the case to Magistrate Judge Jesus A. Catellanos for an ISC. (ft)
October 29, 2003 Filing 24 Joint response to ct ordered case mngmt plan filed by the pts (ft)
October 7, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time until 10/29/03 to file jt case mngmt memo memorandum due 10/29/03 for the pts ( signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory ) (ft)
September 30, 2003 Filing 22 MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Extend Time until 10/29/03 to file jt case mngmt memo (ft)
September 5, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER mooting [11-1] motion to request order for the Ct to incorporate into the CMO any pertinent proceedings pursuant R. 23 Jt Case Mngmt Memorandum and Jt Disc Plan due 10/9/03 for the pts granting [14-1] motion to request order to include eleven additional pltfs granting [15-1] motion to request order to include eigth additional pltfs and to support request for class certification granting [17-1] motion requesting order to include 4 additional pltfs and in support of req for class certification [19-1] motion supplementing req for class certification Noted. ( signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory ) (ft)
September 5, 2003 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: [11-1] motion to request order for the Ct to incorporate into the CMO any pertinent proceedings pursuant R. 23, and [19-1] motion supplementing req for class certification. Ct concludes this lenient standard of class cert to be applicable in this case. The class is conditionally certified, etc as stated herein. ( signed by Jay A. Garcia-Gregory ) (ft)
April 23, 2003 Filing 19 MOTION by All Plaintiffs supplementing req for class certification (ft)
April 15, 2003 Filing 18 RESPONSE by John E. Potter, US Postal Service in opposition to [15-1] motion to request class certification by All Plaintiffs (yr)
February 7, 2003 Filing 17 MOTION by All Plaintiffs requesting order to include 4 additional pltfs and in support of req for class certification (ft)
February 6, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting [13-1] motion to request order to include one additional pltf, granting [12-1] motion requesting order to include additional pltfs, [11-1] motion to request order for the Ct to incorporate into the CMO any pertinent proceedings pursuant R. 23 taken under advisement. The CMO dkt #10 is hereby vacated pending a determination of pltf's motion regarding req. for class certification. ( signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory ) (sr)
February 5, 2003 Filing 15 MOTION by All Plaintiffs to request order to include eigth additional pltfs and to support request for class certification Response due 2/18/03 . (sr) Modified on 02/07/2003
February 5, 2003 Filing 14 MOTION by All Plaintiffs to request order to include eleven additional pltfs Response due 2/18/03 . (sr) Modified on 02/07/2003
January 29, 2003 Filing 13 MOTION by All Plaintiffs to request order to include one additional pltf (ft)
January 29, 2003 Filing 12 MOTION by All Plaintiffs requesting order to include additional pltfs (ft)
January 29, 2003 Filing 11 MOTION by All Plaintiffs to request order for the Ct to incorporate into the CMO any pertinent proceedings pursuant R. 23 (ft)
January 15, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER set Amended Pleadings deadline to 2/6/03 , jt case mngmt memorandum and consent req due 3/11/03 for the pts . ISC to be held during the week of 4/8/03 before a mag judge. set Motions to dism Filing deadline to 5/9/03 , set Discovery deadline to 7/8/03 , set Motions for summ jgm Filing deadline to 8/12/03 , set Pretrial Order deadline to 10/10/03 , set Pretrial Conference for 3:00 10/23/03 before Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory , and set Settlement Conference for 3:00 10/23/03 before Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory , set Jury Trial for 9:30 11/10/03 Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory ( signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory ) (ft)
January 2, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting [8-1] appear/appearance notice ( signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory ) (ft)
December 23, 2002 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for All Plaintiffs by Marcos Valls-Sanchez (cm)
December 4, 2002 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by John E. Potter, Roberto Perez-De-Leon, US Postal Service (ft)
November 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time until 12/6/02 to file a responsive pldg set Answer deadline to 12/6/02 for US Postal Service, for Roberto Perez-De-Leon, for John E. Potter ( signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory ) (ft)
November 6, 2002 Filing 5 MOTION by John E. Potter, US Postal Service to Extend Time until 12/6/02 to file a responsive pldg (ft)
August 21, 2002 SUMMONS issued for US Postal Service thru US Atty Gen. and AUSA Follow up by 11/20/02 (ft)
June 19, 2002 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to John E. Potter on 6/10/02 Answer due on 7/1/02 for John E. Potter (sr)
June 10, 2002 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Roberto Perez-De-Leon on 6/7/02 Answer due on 6/27/02 for Roberto Perez-De-Leon (yr)
June 10, 2002 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to John E. Potter, through Roberto Perez De Leon, on 6/7/02 Answer due on 6/27/02 for John E. Potter (yr)
May 30, 2002 SUMMONS issued for John E. Potter, Roberto Perez-De-Leon (su)
May 24, 2002 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 127284 (yr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delpin-Aponte, et al v. Potter, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Serrano-Serrano
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Caraballo
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos D. Santiago
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merciadel Rodriguez-Bermudez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene E. Perez-Tejada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Angel Marquez-Montanez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardo Brito-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Silva
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Monges-Marzan
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Baez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Marquez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Otero
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose O. Espada
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria M. Franco
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magaly Reyes-Mojica
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eneida Soto
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isidro Moran-Perez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Represented By: Marcos Valls-Sanchez
Represented By: Vladimir Mihailovich-Nikolich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Jusino
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Garcia
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Concepcion-Rivera
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Coparrepa
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Torres
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Delgado-Caraballo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma I. Velasquez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Hernandez-Moreno
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos A. Malaret
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lourdes Nieves
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Vazquez-Sierra
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria de-L. Cambrela-Hernandez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Santiago
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anibal D. Rios-Adorno
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Otero-Sanchez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Alvarado
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Rosario-Vega
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Mendoza-Munoz
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Rabull-Roder
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leopoldo Martinez-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jossie Flores-Flores
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas J. Hernandez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Castillo
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos J. Rudas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Reyes
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myriam R. Vazquez-Santiago
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Angelica Martinez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza Ayala
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel A. Hernandez-Algarin
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zandra M. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria V. Coparrepa
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra I. Maldonado
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Beitia-Fernandez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresita Ortiz-Montes
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Lugo-Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brunilda Lopez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar E. Soto
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis A. Lopez-Ruiz
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sol Edwin Berrios
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel A. Izquierdo
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Melendez-Lebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan L. Toro-Mercado
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Resto
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Colon-Garcia
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sixto Acevedo
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Marrero-Figueroa
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Ivette Correa-Rivera
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Brignoni-Lopez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nemecia Menendez-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Bermudez-Bermudez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Reyes-Miranda
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Ortiz-Cabrera
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Curet-Lopez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Arroyo-Davila
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Santos-Cruz
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Marrero-Rivera
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Sostre-Rivera
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael A. Nieves
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Monges-Marzan
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco A. Crespo-Ortiz
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Soto
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Santos-Ortiz
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L. Rabull-Baez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amalia Lopez-Santiago
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Echevarria-Torres
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Machuca-Aponte
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Hernandez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 02CV1787
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen D. Gaud
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Arroyo-Portela
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Rivera-Catzo
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen L. Banda
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melba Lopez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Camacho-Campus
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valpas
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milagros Serrano-Serrano
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idalia M. Silva
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Rodriguez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Gomez-Montanez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Rodriguez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica M. Dones-Olivo
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Medina-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Serrano-Cora
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Hiraldo
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conj. Part. Nieves-Nieves
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Rodriguez-Maldonado
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Smith
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Perez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Moya-Marrero
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Rivera
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorca I. Flores
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Hernandez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Concepcion
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hydee Cintron-Quinones
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Garcia-Garcia
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Berrios-Cerp
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Izquierdo-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivonne Rosario Cora
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregorio Banda
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Banda-Banda
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis E. Casillas
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyla Davila
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma G. Nieves-Hernandez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel M. Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge A. Delpin-Aponte
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Tirado
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Castro-Oriach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia I. Lugo
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristobal Otero
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Perez-Rivera
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Lebron-Franco
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Rios-Andino
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lugo
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glafira Lopez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen M. Salgado-Colon
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlitos Pacheco-Rodriguez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Jadee Nietzsche-Hernandez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Rolon-Rolon
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epifania Rivera
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership of Otero-Otero
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Marrero
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector M. Segui-Caban
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie E. Munoz-Alonso
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis A. Zayas-Hernandez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa J. Aponte-Padilla
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davis Rios-Ramos
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Nieves
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Colon
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Lugo-Sabalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satina Sanchez-de-Leon
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enid Perez-Nunez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Rentas-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cnjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Ortiz
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia E. Colon-De-Ramos
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Hilda Alvarado-Rodriguez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilliam Hernandez-Figueroa
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luisa Sostre-Figueroa
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Longino Lebron
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector L. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro A. Tirado
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nixsa L. Lebron-Barbosa
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta Nieves-Rodriguez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis R. Rivera
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Manuel Arroyo-Hatct
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Mena-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoraida Campus
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Acevedo-Cedeno
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Zayas-Velasquez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Marquez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruznilda Saluatella
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdaluz Avila-Jimenez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Rosario
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria A. Serrano
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra Enid Santiago-Santiago
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilliam M. Ortiz
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria de-los-Angeles Garcia-Gonzalez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor A. Falcon
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Hernandez-Munoz
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Marrero-Alamo
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Mena-Desarden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nilda Carrion-Estrada
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Echevarria-Rivera
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Cuevas
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elba Luz Lopez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus E. Bermudez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C/P Sierra-Leon
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Peguero
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Fontan
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Sanchez-De-Leon
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Soto-Soto
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Colon-Serrano
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C. Gonzalez-Del-Valle
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos R. Rentas-Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Soto-Lopez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elida Montanez-Amaro
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis R. Giron
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio M. Ortiz
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otilio Melendez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Claudio-Serrano
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen M. Rodriguez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Rivera
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria E. Arroyo-Casiano
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Arroyo-Borras
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinidad Baez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Pizarro
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Giron-Marrero
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cortez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana H. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Monserrate Nieves
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos D. Carambot
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Peguero-Cedeno
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus E. Adorno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Rolon
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan A. Fernandez-Concepcion
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Rios-Nieves
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Lopez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Amaro-Pintor
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Colon-Melendez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L. Otero
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Otero-Zayas
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard H. Sierra
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Reyes-Cambrela
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Rios-Dros
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arsenio Claudio
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen D. Nieves
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Awilda Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violeta Morales
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Curet-Cintron
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Brito-Donato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria de-Lourdes Fernandez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigfredo Rios
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ayala-Serrano
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Tirado-Espinell
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen L. Otero
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Zayas
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal partnership Sanchez-Nieves
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Burgos-Valdez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Marcano-Garcia
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Ivette Nieves-Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael A. Diaz-Nunez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Santiago-Perez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Antonio Monge-Berrios
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia I. Goveo
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Feliciano-Cosme
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lourdes Dros-Morales
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Rene Torres
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Amaro-Martinez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rafael Beitia-Perez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro L. Ortiz
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma I. Cosme-Archilla
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Velazquez-Agosto
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aida Luz Davila-Gonzalez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arcadio Mendoza
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin Torres
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose V. Roman-Rivera
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristino Delgado-Ocasio
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Gonzalez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Nieves-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis A. Camacho
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Birgit Roder
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Parnership Smith-Smith
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariano Perez-Vazquez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Burgos-Rodriguez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector L. Perez-Rivera
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Segui-Avila
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Malaret-Albino
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Ortiz-Lopez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Rivera-Arzola
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy E. Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Gonzalez-Garcia
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria E. Ramos-Aquino
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Henry Ramos
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada I. Leon
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feliciano Santiago-Rosado
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neyda David
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Cruz-Martinez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxima Oriach-Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie Boll
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa M. Reyes
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Machuca-Garcia
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idys Y. Vazquez
Represented By: Santiago F. Lampon-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Edna Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing |