Colon v. Blades
Plaintiff: William Anthony Colon
Defendant: Ruben Blades
Case Number: 3:2007cv01380
Filed: May 4, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 364 OPINION AND ORDER. Morgalo's claim is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Final judgment to be entered. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on May 16, 2013.(McGiverin, Bruce)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 327 OPINION AND ORDER denying 322 motion for summary judgment. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on November 2, 2012. (McGiverin, Bruce)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 291 OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 12/27/2011.(yo)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 264 OPINION AND ORDER denying re 234 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment against Robert Morgalo filed by Ruben Blades Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Justo Arenas on 12/28/2010.(nydi)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 263 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part re 249 MOTION for Reconsideration re 244 Opinion and Order,MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION for Reconsideration re 244 Opinion and Order, filed by William Anthony Colon Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Justo Arenas on 12/22/2010.(nydi)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 257 OPINION AND ORDER denying re 246 MOTION for Joinder of Ruben Blades Productions, Inc. as Co-Plaintiff to Cross-Claim and denying 247 MOTION to Alter Judgment Re: 245 Opinion and Order filed by Ruben Blades, 247 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Roberto Morgalo Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Justo Arenas on 10/21/2010.(nydi) Modified on 10/21/2010 to add docket entry relationship and docket entry information. (re)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 245 OPINION AND ORDER denying re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Roberto Morgalo Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Justo Arenas on 9/2/2010.(Arenas, Justo)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 244 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part re 238 MOTION for Reconsideration Alter/Amend re 235 Opinion and Order filed by Ruben Blades Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Justo Arenas on 9/1/2010.(Arenas, Justo)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 235 OPINION AND ORDER denying re 221 MOTION for Attorney Fees / Memorandum of Law and Cost Report filed by Ruben Blades Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Justo Arenas on 7/14/2010.(nydi)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 228 OPINION AND ORDER directing the Clerk to enter a partial final judgment in favor of Rubn Blades re 133 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Martinez, Morgalo and Associates, LLC. filed by Ruben Blades Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Justo Arenas on 6/15/2010.(nydi)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 209 OPINION AND ORDER denying re 200 MOTION to Stay re: 199 Notice of Appeal filed by Roberto Morgalo MOTION to Stay re: 199 Notice of Appeal filed by Roberto Morgalo filed by Roberto Morgalo Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Justo Arenas on 05/13/2010.(Bayouth, Alberto)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 OPINION AND ORDER denying re 167 MOTION for Reconsideration re 154 Opinion and Order, filed by Roberto Morgalo Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Justo Arenas on 4/28/2010.(nydi)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 OPINION AND ORDER denying re 153 MOTION for Reconsideration re 145 Opinion and Order filed by Roberto Morgalo Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Justo Arenas on 4/14/2010.(nydi)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 OPINION AND ORDER granting re 148 MOTION to dismiss Defamation Action for Failure To Answer Interrogatories as to Roberto Morgalo filed by Ruben Blades Productions, Inc., Ruben Blades Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Justo Arenas on 3/31/2010.(nydi)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 OPINION AND ORDER granting re 119 Emergency MOTION to Compel Morgalo and Counsel for Colon filed by Ruben Blades Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Justo Arenas on 3/19/2010.(nydi)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 OPINION AND ORDER denying re 108 MOTION for Reconsideration re 107 Opinion and Order filed by Ruben Blades Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Justo Arenas on 10/14/2009.(nydi)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 OPINION AND ORDER denying re 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Ruben Blades Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Justo Arenas on 8/21/2009.(nydi)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon v. Blades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Anthony Colon
Represented By: Juan H. Saavedra-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Blades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?