Adrian v. Mesirow Financial
Plaintiff: Yanisse Adrian
Defendant: Mesirow Financial and Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC
Petitioner: attorney Benjamin Acosta Jr
Case Number: 3:2008cv01180
Filed: February 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MANDATE of USCA as to #185 Notice of Appeal filed by Yanisse Adrian; VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED. RE: #198 USCA JUDGMENT. (xi)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 USCA JUDGMENT as to #185 Notice of Appeal filed by Yanisse Adrian; VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED. (xi)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Returned: #185 Notice of Appeal filed by Yanisse Adrian RE: #198 USCA Judgment, #199 USCA Mandate, #188 Appeal Record Sent to USCA. (xi)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PENDING APPEAL #190 Bill of Costs filed by Mesirow Financial, Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. Signed by Clerk of Court on 11/30/2010. (js)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER re #195 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief: DENIED. See Local Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/23/2010. (brc)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MOTION to Hold Taxation of Costs in Abeyance re #193 Statement filed by Mesirow Financial, Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC, #190 Bill of Costs filed by Mesirow Financial, Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC, 194 Order, #191 Affidavit filed by Mesirow Financial, Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Reynaldo Quinones-Souss on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Related document(s) #193 , #190 , 194 , #191 ) (Quinones-Souss, Reynaldo)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER re #190 Bill of Costs. Referred to the Clerk for taxation. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/20/2010. (brc)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 193 STATEMENT Certificate of Service filed by Mesirow Financial, Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Atwater, PHV Richard)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 BRIEF Memorandum of Law in Support of Bill of Costs by Mesirow Financial, Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Atwater, PHV Richard)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Bill of Costs by Mesirow Financial, Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Atwater, PHV Richard)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 190 BILL OF COSTS by Mesirow Financial, Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Atwater, PHV Richard)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 189 USCA Case Number 10-1926 for #185 Notice of Appeal filed by Yanisse Adrian. (cm)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #185 Notice of Appeal [Docket Entries 183 - 185](xi)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER re #186 Motion for Extension of Time to File : GRANTED. No further extensions of time will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 7/23/2010. (grf)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 22, 2010 to file Verified Bill of Costs filed by PHV Richard Scott Atwater on behalf of Mesirow Financial, Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/9/2010 (Atwater, PHV Richard)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #183 Opinion and Order, #184 Judgment by Yanisse Adrian. ( Filing fee $ 455 receipt number 0104-2008954.) (Quinones-Souss, Reynaldo)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 JUDGMENT dismissing plaintiff's claims with prejudice. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 7/9/10.(re)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 183 OPINION re Motion for Summary Judgment and ORDER at Docket No. 182. Judgment shall now be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/09/2010. (brc)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER re #132 Motion for Summary Judgment: GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED, with prejudice. ORDER finding as MOOT #130 Motion to Strike; #144 Motion to Strike; #151 Informative Motion; and #169 Motion in Limine. The Pretrial Conference scheduled to be held on 6/11/2010 at 9:00 a.m. is vacated and set aside. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/10/2010. (brc)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 REPLY to Response in Opposition to Motion in Limine filed by Mesirow Financial, Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Re: #169 MOTION in Limine Re: Joseph DiGangi filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Transcript of Joseph DiGangi)(Atwater, PHV Richard) Modified on 6/9/2010 to correct title. (re)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER re #179 Motion for Leave to File: GRANTED. The Reply will be filed electronically as a separate document no later than 6/9/2010. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/08/2010. (brc)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by PHV Richard Scott Atwater on behalf of Mesirow Financial, Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/24/2010 (Attachments: #1 Defendant Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements, LLC's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Mesirow's Motion in Limine, #2 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Joseph DiGangi)(Atwater, PHV Richard)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Reynaldo Quinones-Souss on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Quinones-Souss, Reynaldo)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER re #174 Motion for Leave to File: MOOT. See Docket No. 175. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/07/2010. (brc)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER re #175 Motion for Leave to File: GRANTED. The reply will be filed no later than 6/8/2010 at 12:00 noon. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/07/2010. (brc)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to #169 Motion in Limine, filed by PHV Richard Scott Atwater on behalf of Mesirow Financial, Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/24/2010 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Reply Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A)(Atwater, PHV Richard) Modified on 6/8/2010 to add docket entry relationship. (re)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to #169 Motion in Limine, filed by PHV Richard Scott Atwater on behalf of Mesirow Financial, Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/24/2010 (Atwater, PHV Richard) Modified on 6/8/2010 to add docket entry relationship. (re)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion in Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Joseph DiGangi filed by Yanisse Adrian Re: #169 MOTION in Limine Re: Joseph DiGangi filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Yanisse Adrian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Toledo-Davila, Ana)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Proposed Pretrial Order (Joint) by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC, Yanisse Adrian. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instructions, #2 Plaintiff's Proposed Voir Dire) (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Proposed Voir Dire by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Proposed Jury Instructions by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MOTION in Limine Re: Joseph DiGangi filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DiGangi Deposition Pages)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER re: #167 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 3/24/2010. (bg)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION Informing Brief Technical Difficulty and Request that Reply Brief be accepted re #166 Reply to Response to Motion,,, filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Related document(s) #166 ) (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 REPLY to Response to Motion in Opposition by Plaintiff to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Re: #155 MOTION for Leave to File Document in Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Extension of Time until March 18, 2010 to File Response/Reply as to #147 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Yanisse Adrian filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Attachments: #1 Response to Additional Facts, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco) Modified on 3/25/2010 to correct repetitive text (rc).
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER re: #164 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: GRANTED. Response to Motion Deadline due by 3/23/2010. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 3/19/2010. (bg)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 23, 2010 to File Response/Reply due to Medical Emergency as to 156 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/5/2010 (Related document(s) 156 ) (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition (Response) to Plaintiff's Informative Motion filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Re: #151 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Yanisse Adrian filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER re #161 Motion for Leave to File: GRANTED. The sur-reply will be filed electronically as a separate document no later than 3/16/2010. No further filings will be permitted on this issue. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/15/2010. (brc)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION for Leave to File Document (sur-reply) filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/31/2010 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tendered Sur-reply)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 160 REPLY to Response to Motion Re: #157 RESPONSE to Motion by filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC, filed by Yanisse Adrian filed by Yanisse Adrian filed by Yanisse Adrian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Toledo-Davila, Ana) Modified on 3/11/2010 to add link (rc).
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER re #158 Motion for Leave to File: GRANTED. The Reply and its exhibits will be filed electronically as a separate document no later than 3/12/2010. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/11/2010. (brc)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Informative Motion filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/26/2010 (Attachments: #1 Reply, #2 Exhibit A to Reply, #3 Exhibit B to Reply)(Toledo-Davila, Ana)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 157 RESPONSE to Motion by Plaintiff, filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Re: #151 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Yanisse Adrian filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER re #155 Motion for Leave to File and Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: GRANTED. The Reply will be filed no later 3/18/2010 and will comply strictly with Local Civil Rule 7(c). Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/08/2010. (brc)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION for Leave to File Document in Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Extension of Time until March 18, 2010 to File Response/Reply as to #147 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, filed by Yanisse Adrian filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/22/2010 (Related document(s) #147 ) (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER re #153 Motion submitting: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/03/2010. (brc)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION Submitting Exhibit List re: #147 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, filed by Yanisse Adrian filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List)(Related document(s) #147 ) (Toledo-Davila, Ana)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER re #151 Informative Motion. Defendant will respond to this motion no later than 3/12/2010. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/02/2010. (brc)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Toledo-Davila, Ana)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER re #148 Informative Motion: NOTED. Docket No. 146 is stricken from the record as superfluous. (See Docket No. 147.) Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/02/2010. (brc)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER re #145 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/02/2010. (brc)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Filing of Opposition to Summary Judgment filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Toledo-Davila, Ana)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Yanisse Adrian Re: #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Yanisse Adrian. (Attachments: #1 Opposing Statement of Material Facts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit List)(Toledo-Davila, Ana)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Yanisse Adrian Re: #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Yanisse Adrian. (Toledo-Davila, Ana)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Toledo-Davila, Ana)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Experts for Failure to Disclose Reports by February 12, 2010 as Ordered by the Court filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/8/2010 (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER re #130 Motion to Strike Certain Claims for Failure to Discover. The parties are ORDERED TO MEET no later than 3/1/2010, to attempt to resolve their discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/18/2010.(brc)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER re #141 Motion submitting: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/18/2010. (brc)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations of Exhibits J and II to Supporting Statement of Material Facts at Docket 132 re: #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J Certified Translation of Adm Det 07-01, #2 Exhibit II - Certified Translation Adm Det 08-04)(Related document(s) #132 ) (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER re #138 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: GRANTED. Plaintiff may exceed the 15-page limit by two pages, as requested. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/17/2010. (brc)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Strike Certain Claims for Failure to Discover, or in the Alternative, to Compel Discovery filed by Yanisse Adrian Re: #130 MOTION to Strike Certain Claims for Failure to Discover filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Yanisse Adrian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Toledo-Davila, Ana)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Toledo-Davila, Ana)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER re #134 Motion submitting: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/16/2010. (brc)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER re #133 Motion for extension of time and Motion submitting: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/16/2010. (brc)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER re #131 Informative Motion: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/16/2010. (brc)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION Submitting Exhibit PP-Declaration by Gustavo Gelpi, Esq. re: #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PP)(Related document(s) #132 ) (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION for extension of time until February 26, 2010 to submit certified translations of exhibits J and II( Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/4/2010), MOTION Submitting inadvertently omitted Exhibit EE to Supporting Statement of Material Facts re: #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EE)(Related document(s) #132 ) (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
February 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 3/3/2010. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Statement of Material Facts, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN, #41 Exhibit OO)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
February 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Quashed Subpoena filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Toledo-Davila, Ana)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION to Strike Certain Claims for Failure to Discover or in the Alternative, to Compel Discovery filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/17/2010 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E-1, #6 Exhibit E-2, #7 Exhibit E-3, #8 Exhibit E-4, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco) Modified on 2/2/2010 to add docket text (rc).
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER re #128 Motion to Quash. This belated attempt at a second bite of the apple is DENIED. The subpoena is quashed. Any further attempt to subpoena Mr. Acosta will be dealt with harshly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/19/2010. (brc)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Second MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena filed by David Fernandez-Esteves on behalf of Benjamin Acosta Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fernandez-Esteves, David)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER re #124 Motion to Quash. No opposition having been filed, the motion is GRANTED and the subpoena is quashed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/11/2010. (brc)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER re #125 Motion for extension of time : GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Discovery is extended until January 30, 2010, but dispositive motions will be filed by February 15, 2010, the original date set. Discovery due by 1/30/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2010. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/11/2009. (grf)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Joint MOTION for extension of time until January 30, 2010 to complete discovery filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC, Yanisse Adrian Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/28/2009 (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION to Quash filed by David Fernandez-Esteves on behalf of Benjamin Acosta Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fernandez-Esteves, David)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by David Fernandez-Esteves on behalf of Benjamin Acosta Jr (Fernandez-Esteves, David)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER re #120 Motion to clarify: GRANTED in all respects. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/07/2009. (brc)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER re #119 Motion for extension of time: GRANTED. No further extensions of time will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/07/2009. (brc)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION to Clarify Order at Docket 114 filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A,, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION for extension of time until March 15, 2010 to Conclude Expert Discovery filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC, Yanisse Adrian Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/23/2009 (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER re #115 Motion for extension of time and Motion to Continue: GRANTED. Discovery deadline: 12/15/2009; Dispositive Motion Deadline: 2/15/2010; Responses to Dispositive Motions Deadline: 3/1/2010; Replies Deadline: 3/8/2010; Proposed Joint Pretrial Order, Proposed Voir Dire Questions, and Proposed Preliminary and Final Jury Instructions due 5/15/2010; Pre-trial and Settlement Conference on 6/11/2010 at 9:00 a.m. Jury Trial to commence on 6/28/2010 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/04/2009. (brc)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER re #116 Stipulation: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/04/2009. (brc)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION Concerning Work-Product Waiver by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC, Yanisse Adrian. (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION for extension of time until December 15, 2009 to conclude discovery( Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/21/2009), MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial and Trial for 60 days filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons for Jury Duty)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 OPINION AND ORDER re #31 Motion to Disqualify Counsel; and re #80 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Plaintiff has waived her attorney-client privilege with respect to all communications made with Paul H. Hulsey and/or the members of the Hulsey Litigation Group, LLC. The parties will file simultaneous memoranda, no later than 9/4/2009, discussing whether plaintiff has or has not waived the work product privilege, the scope such a waiver might entail and why, with supporting case law. Plaintiff's motion to amend her complaint is DENIED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/25/2009.(brc)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER re #112 Motion submitting: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/17/2009. (brc)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION Submitting Controversies for Disposition by the Court filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC, Yanisse Adrian (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER re #40 Motion for Sanctions; re #41 Supplemental Motion; re #42 Motion for Protective Order; re #44 Motion for Sanctions. The Court deems plaintiff's motion for sanctions (Docket Nos. 40, 41 and 44) as withdrawn. The Court considers Mesirows motion for protective order (Docket No. 42) to be deemed withdrawn. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/10/2009. (brc)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER re #31 Motion to Disqualify Counsel: The motion will be considered only as to the issue whether plaintiff waived the attorney-client privilege. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/10/2009. (brc)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re #106 Motion for Recusal and Motion for Miscellaneous Relief: MOOT. Defendant has withdrawn Mr. Suarez as its expert. (See Docket Nos. 107 and 108.) Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/10/2009. (brc)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER re #107 Motion to Withdraw: GRANTED. Defendant is allowed until 6/19/2009 to disclose its expert on economic damages to substitute Mr. Suarez. No extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/10/2009. (brc)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION to Withdraw Expert, and Request for Ten Day Extension to Notify Alternate Economic Damage Expert filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION for Recusal, MOTION In Support of Informative Motion Pursuant to Court's Order re #104 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Court Order (Docket No. 103) filed by Yanisse Adrian, 105 Order on Informative Motion filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Related document(s) #104 , 105 ) (Toledo-Davila, Ana)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re #104 Informative Motion: DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file a proper motion with analysis and citing authority. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/08/2009. (brc)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding re: 103 Order filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Toledo-Davila, Ana) Modified on 6/9/2009 to add link (rc).
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER re #102 Informative Motion: NOTED. Mr. Armando Suarez is the judge's personal accountant. The parties will indicate, no later than 6/12/2009 whether the Court should recuse itself from this case for that reason. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/08/2009. (brc)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Submission of Experts' Curriculum Vitae filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, email dated 5/29/09 from Ms. Kelly Paquette, #2 Exhibit 2, Letter dated 5/29/09 from Mr. Scott Atwater, #3 Exhibit 3, CV for Dr. Haydee Costas, #4 Exhibit 4, Email dated 6/1/09 from Mr. Coln to counsel for plaintiff, #5 Exhibit 5, CV for Mr. Armando Surez)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER re #100 Motion for Extension of Time : GRANTED as a final extension. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/01/2009. (brc) Modified on 6/2/2009 to correct docket text (rc).
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Consent Order or Otherwise Submit Matter for Court's Consideration filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC, Yanisse Adrian, (Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/17/2009)(Toledo-Davila, Ana) Modified on 6/2/2009 to correct docket text and remove filer (rc).
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER re #97 Motion Submitting: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 05/19/2009. (brc)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION Submitting Ex Parte Documents filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Toledo-Davila, Ana)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Francisco A. Besosa:Initial Scheduling Conference held on 5/15/2009. Present were: Attys. Ana Toledo and Frederick Jekel for plaintiff; Attys. Francisco Colon-Ramirez and Scott Atwater for defendant. The Court has received the discovery plan filed by the parties. The parties inform that they have had settlement talks since August, 2007. The Court hears the parties' arguments regarding plaintiff's motion for leave to amend complaint (docket #80). The parties are ordered to exchange the names and curriculum vitae of their respective experts by June 1, 2009. Defense counsel discuss Mesirow's duties. The Court will vacate the 'moot' order (docket #93) as to the qualification of counsel and the order will remain as to the attorney-client privilege issue. The parties will file a proposed consent order by June 1, 2009 addressing, among other matters, the qualification of counsel issues and the appearance of Mr. Hulsey and members of his firm at the depositions. Motions due by 6/1/2009. (Court Reporter Rolayne Volpe.) (grf)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER re #39 Motion for Leave to File: MOOT. See Docket Nos. 60 and 61. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 05/11/2009. (brc)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER re #38 Motion to Clarify: MOOT. See Docket Nos. 60 and 61. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 05/11/2009. (brc)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re #35 Motion to Stay: MOOT. See Docket Nos. 60 and 61. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 05/11/2009. (brc)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER re #31 Motion to Disqualify Counsel and Motion Requesting Order: MOOT. See Docket Nos. 60 and 61. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 05/11/2009. (brc)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by all parties. (Atwater, PHV Richard) Modified on 5/11/2009 to correct docket text (rc).
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT MEMORANDUM and Report of Rule 26(f) meeting, by all parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Atwater, PHV Richard) Modified on 5/11/2009 to correct docket text (rc).
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re #87 Informative Motion: DENIED AS MOOT. See Docket No. 89. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/23/2009. (brc)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re #88 Reply to Response to Motion: DENIED as untimely. See Docket No. 86. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 03/23/2009. (brc)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Yanisse Adrian Re: #80 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Re: #13 Amended Complaint filed by Yanisse Adrian, filed by Yanisse Adrian. (Toledo-Davila, Ana) Modified on 3/24/2009 to correct duplicate text (rc).
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Filing filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Toledo-Davila, Ana)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re #85 Motion for Leave to File : GRANTED. The reply will be filed no later than March 16, 2009. Reply due by 3/16/2009. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 3/13/2009. (grf)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition to Amend Complaint re: #84 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/30/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Toledo-Davila, Ana) Modified on 3/16/2009 to correct docket text and add link (rc).
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Re: #80 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Re: #13 Amended Complaint filed by Yanisse Adrian (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E1, #7 Exhibit E2)(Atwater, PHV Richard) Modified on 3/2/2009 to correct title (rc).
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Re: #31 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for PlaintiffEmergency MOTION requesting Order Ruling that Plaintiff Waived the Attorney-Client Privilege filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2)(Atwater, PHV Richard)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re #81 Motion in Compliance: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/11/2009. (brc)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Motion In Compliance With Court Order filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Re: #13 Amended Complaint filed by Yanisse Adrian filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/27/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2nd Amended Complaint)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Toledo-Davila, Ana)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re #45 INFORMATIVE motion : NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 2/9/2009. (grf)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re #43 Motion for Hearing : MOOT. See Docket No. #70 . Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 2/9/2009. (grf)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re #37 INFORMATIVE motion : NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 2/9/2009. (grf)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re #34 Motion for Leave to File : GRANTED. The Reply will comply strictly with Local Rule 7.1(c). Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 2/9/2009. (grf)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re #32 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages : GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 2/9/09. (grf)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re #73 Motion to Clarify: GRANTED. The Clerk will note Mr. Atwater's new e-mail address on the docket. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/16/2009. (brc)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to Clarify filed by PHV Richard Scott Atwater on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Atwater, PHV Richard)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re #67 Response to Motion. The Court is unclear what plaintiff means by "expert/consultant," but the Court is clear that the phrase will not be used as a ruse to designate former counsel as experts pursuant to Rule 26. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/15/2009. (brc)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Request for Order filed by Yanisse Adrian Re: #67 Response to Motion, filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Yanisse Adrian. (Toledo-Davila, Ana)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SCHEDULING ORDER/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2009 at 09:00 AM before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Discovery due by 10/15/2009. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/15/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2010 at 09:00 AM before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2010 at 09:00 AM before Judge Francisco A. Besosa.Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 1/13/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List)(grf)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re #68 Motion to allow Frederick J. Jekel to appear pro hac vice. The Court, having considered Frederick J. Jekel's Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, orders that the application be GRANTED. The Clerk shall deposit the admission fee to the Court's Non-Appropriated Funds account. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/13/2009. (brc) Modified on 1/20/2009 to correct event type and title (rc).
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Motion to allow Frederick J. Jekel to appear pro hac vice filed by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Receipt #01040000000001359219)(Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toledo-Davila, Ana) Modified on 1/13/2009 to add receipt number (dv).
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE to Motion to Withdraw and Request for Court Order filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Re: #60 MOTION to Withdraw As Counsel Attorney as to Paul H. Hulsey filed by Yanisse Adrian filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re #64 Notice of Appearance: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/12/2009. (brc)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re #63 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: GRANTED. The Clerk will take notice of Mr. Atwater's new address. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/12/2009. (brc)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by PHV Richard Scott Atwater on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Atwater, PHV Richard)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to PHV Richard Scott Atwater filed by PHV Richard Scott Atwater on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Atwater, PHV Richard)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re #60 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/12/2009. (brc)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re #59 Notice of Appearance: NOTED and GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/12/2009. (brc)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION to Withdraw As Counsel Attorney as to Paul H. Hulsey filed by Paul H. Hulsey on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Hulsey, Paul)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana L. Toledo-Davila on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Toledo-Davila, Ana)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OPINION AND ORDER re #55 Motion to Disqualify Judge: The Court DENIES plaintiff's motion to disqualify the undersigned under 28 U.S.C. 455 (b)(5)(iv). Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/03/2008. (brc)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal and Certificate of Service filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Re: #55 MOTION to Disqualify Judge filed by Yanisse Adrian filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Atwater, PHV Richard)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OBJECTION to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Strike filed by Yanisse Adrian Re: #54 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Yanisse Adrian. (Hulsey, Paul)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Disqualify Judge filed by Paul H. Hulsey on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Hulsey, Paul)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's Rule 11 Motion filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Re: #44 MOTION for Sanctions as to Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Yanisse Adrian filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 3/31/07 e-mail, #3 Exhibit C - 3/3/07 Memo, #4 Exhibit D - 5/22/08 Determination No. 08-04, #5 Exhibit E - Mesirow's Answer, #6 Exhibit F - Unsworn Declaration, #7 Exhibit G - Unsworn Declaration of Informed Consent, #8 Exhibit H - Opinion & Order, #9 Exhibit I - Order)(Atwater, PHV Richard)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re #52 Informative Motion: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/12/2008. (brc)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding counsel vacation filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
November 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Yanisse Adrian Re: #43 MOTION for Hearing (Status Conference) MOTION for Hearing (Status Conference) filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Yanisse Adrian. (Hulsey, Paul)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the ORDER entered by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/05/08, dkt. 49, this case has been transferred to his docket. All future pleadings shall bear the following initials next to the case number: CV 08-1180 (FAB). Signed by Clerk on 11/07/08.
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re #47 : The undersigned approves the transfer of this case to his docket. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/05/2008. (brc)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Rule 26(C) filed by Yanisse Adrian Re: #42 MOTION for Protective Order Memorandum in Support Motion and Certificate of Service filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Yanisse Adrian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hulsey, Paul)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER referring case. See Order for further details. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/31/2008.(JAM)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Re: #41 Supplemental Motion for Sanctions re: #40 MOTION for Sanctions as to Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Yanisse Adrian filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Atwater, PHV Richard)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Paul H. Hulsey on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Hulsey, Paul)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Sanctions as to Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Paul H. Hulsey on behalf of Yanisse Adrian Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/13/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Hulsey, Paul)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Hearing (Status Conference) filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, 070502 Attorney Paul H. Hulsey's letter, #2 Exhibit B, Administrative Determination No. 08-04)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Protective Order Memorandum in Support Motion and Certificate of Service filed by PHV Richard Scott Atwater on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/5/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10-2-08 Atwater letter, #2 Exhibit B - Privilege Log, #3 Exhibit C - 10-17-08 Hulsey letter, #4 Exhibit D - 10-20-08 Hulsey letter, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Connie Klingler, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Patrick Muldowney, #7 Exhibit G - 10-20-08 Atwater letter)(Atwater, PHV Richard)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Supplemental Motion for Sanctions re: #40 MOTION for Sanctions as to Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Paul H. Hulsey on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #40 ) (Hulsey, Paul)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Sanctions as to Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Paul H. Hulsey on behalf of Yanisse Adrian Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/20/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Hulsey, Paul)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for leave to file Reply by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC re #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J in Support of Motion for Permission to File Reply)(Atwater, PHV Richard) Modified on 10/6/2008 correcting event (np).
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Clarify & Modify its Motion to Partially Stay Discovery Pending Determination of its Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's counsel, supporting memorandum, Exhibit A and certificate of service filed by PHV Richard Scott Atwater on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Atwater, PHV Richard)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Paul H. Hulsey on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Hulsey, Paul)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion To Partially Stay Discovery Pending Determination of its Motion to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel filed by Yanisse Adrian Re: #35 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Yanisse Adrian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hulsey, Paul)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/22/2008 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibits A - E)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition to Motion to Disqualify filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/13/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tendered Reply, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Reply to Opposition)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Disqualify filed by Yanisse Adrian Re: #31 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for PlaintiffEmergency MOTION requesting Order Ruling that Plaintiff Waived the Attorney-Client Privilege filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC filed by Yanisse Adrian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Hulsey, Paul)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Paul H. Hulsey on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Hulsey, Paul)
July 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Emergency MOTION requesting Order Ruling that Plaintiff Waived the Attorney-Client Privilege filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to J)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM by all parties. (Hulsey, Paul)
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER noted #28 INFORMATIVE motion re change of address filed by defendant's counsel. (Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 5/30/2008.) (JAM)
May 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding change of address filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 motion to appear pro hac vice approved by Clerk of Court. (Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/24/2008.) (JAM)
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Motion to allow R. Scott Atwater to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number 01040000000001101873) filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC (Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
April 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Hector J. Quinones by Reynaldo Quinones-Souss on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Quinones-Souss, Reynaldo)
April 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Reynaldo Quinones-Souss by Reynaldo Quinones-Souss on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Quinones-Souss, Reynaldo)
April 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Cherie K. Durand by Cherie K. Durand on behalf of Yanisse Adrian (Durand, Cherie)
February 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Defendant Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC.(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
February 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 2:07-cv-03429. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 20, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: The court, after a review of the record and having heard oral argument on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Transfer Venue (Entry 6), finds that a transfer is warranted in the interests of justice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). As such, the court exercises its discretion under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and orders that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico. The Office of the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 2/1/2008. (cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Margaret B Seymour: Motion Hearing held on 1/31/2008 re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Transfer Venue filed by Mesirow Financial. Court takes motion under advisement, order forthcoming. Court Reporter Gary Smith. (mdea ) [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (26 in 2:07-cv-03428-MBS) Joint MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Stay or Transfer, (6 in 2:07-cv-03429-MBS) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Transfer Venue : Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2008 11:00 AM in Columbia # 5, Matthew J. Perry, Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Margaret B Seymour. Associated Cases: 2:07-cv-03428-MBS, 2:07-cv-03429-MBS(cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
January 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Transfer Venue Response filed by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC, Mesirow Financial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Miller v. National Railroad Passenger Corp, #2 Exhibit British Telecommunications v. McDonell Douglas Corp.)(Geer, Bryson) [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
January 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JOINT STIPULATION by Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC, Yanisse Adrian. (Geer, Bryson) [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC , filed by Yanisse Adrian. (Hulsey, Paul) Modified docket text on 1/10/2008 (cbru, ). [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mesirow Financial.(Geer, Bryson) [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Transfer Venue Response filed by Yanisse Adrian.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/14/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hulsey, Paul) [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
December 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 12/26/2007.(cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. Scott Atwater ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001297603) by Mesirow Financial. Response to Motion due by 1/7/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit/Application & Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Farrier, Richard) (Replaced PDF on 12/19/2007: # 2 Main Document) (cbru, ). Modified description of attachment on 12/26/2007 (cbru, ). [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cheryl A. Green ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 04200000000001297579) by Mesirow Financial. Response to Motion due by 1/7/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit/Application & Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Farrier, Richard) (Replaced PDF on 12/19/2007: # 2 Main Document) (cbru, ). Modified description of attachment on 12/26/2007 (cbru, ). [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Transfer Venue by Mesirow Financial. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2008 (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit A to Ex 7, #10 Exhibit B to Ex 7)No proposed order(Farrier, Richard) Modified description of attachments on 12/17/2007 (cbru, ). [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Yanisse Adrian. Mesirow Financial waiver executed on 11/1/2007, answer due 12/31/2007. (Hulsey, Paul) [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued (Restricted Access) as to Mesirow Financial. (cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Yanisse Adrian.(cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mesirow Financial ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1210805.), filed by Yanisse Adrian.(cbru, ) [Transferred from scd on 2/11/2008.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adrian v. Mesirow Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanisse Adrian
Represented By: Ana L. Toledo-Davila
Represented By: Cherie K. Durand
Represented By: Hector J. Quinones-Inserni
Represented By: PHV Frederick J. Jekel
Represented By: Paul H. Hulsey
Represented By: Reynaldo Quinones-Souss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: attorney Benjamin Acosta Jr
Represented By: David Fernandez-Esteves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesirow Financial
Represented By: Bryson M Geer
Represented By: Jennifer Hess Thiem
Represented By: Richard Ashby Farrier, Jr
Represented By: Cheryl A Green
Represented By: PHV Richard Scott Atwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesirow Financial Structured Settlements LLC
Represented By: Bryson M Geer
Represented By: Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez
Represented By: Jennifer Hess Thiem
Represented By: Richard Ashby Farrier, Jr
Represented By: Cheryl A Green
Represented By: PHV Richard Scott Atwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?