Lopez- Acosta v. Toledo et al
Plaintiff: Jose Lopez- Acosta
Defendant: Pedro Toledo, Jose R Alvarado- Almodovar, Juan C. Melendez- Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Doe- Alvarado, Conjugal Partnership Melendez- Doe 2, Insurance Company A to Z and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2008cv01314
Filed: March 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT dismissing plaintiff's federal claims against Pedro Toledo, Jose R. Alvarado-Almodovar, and Juan C. Melendez-Rivera with prejudice. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 8/5/2008.(ab)
August 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER VACATING #24 Partial Judgment. Final Judgment shall be entered by the Court. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 8/5/08. (VA)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ***VACATED AS PER DKT.25 ORDER*** PARTIAL JUDGMENT dismissing plaintiff's federal claims against Pedro Toledo, Jose R. Alvarado-Almodovar, and Juan C. Melendez-Rivera with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 7/28/2008.(ab) Modified on 8/5/2008 (ab).
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER granting #11 MOTION to dismiss and Memorandum in Support Therof as to Pedro Toledo, Jose R Alvarado- Almodovar, Juan C. Melendez- Rivera. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 7/28/08. (VA)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER noted #20 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 7/11/08. (VA)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER VACATING 19 Order on Motion for extension of time. Defendants are no longer required to file an informative motion. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 7/11/08.(VA)
July 11, 2008 Filing 20 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding docket #17 filed by Lorenzo J. Palomares-Starbuck on behalf of Jose Lopez- Acosta (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Palomares-Starbuck, Lorenzo)
July 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ***VACATED AS PER DKT. 21 ORDER*** ORDER granting #18 Motion for extension of time. Informative Motion due by 7/31/2008. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 7/10/08. (VA) Modified on 7/14/2008 (ab).
July 10, 2008 Filing 18 MOTION for extension of time until July 31, 2008 to Comply with Order (Docket No. 17) filed by Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz on behalf of Pedro Toledo, Jose R Alvarado- Almodovar, Juan C. Melendez- Rivera Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/28/2008 (Gueits-Ortiz, Jose)
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The parties are ordered to file an informative motion detailing the criminal proceeding s that took place in the state court. Specifically, the parties must provide this Court the date when Plaintiff first appeared before a state court judge. Furthermore, the parties are to detail the extent of the judicial proccedings that occurred before the state court if any. The parties are to provide pertinent dates regarding said proceedings. Informative Motions due by 7/10/2008. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 7/8/08. (VA)
July 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER striking #14 Amended Complaint filed by Jose Lopez- Acosta for failing to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 7/7/08. (VA)
July 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #12 Motion requesting Order. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 7/3/08. (VA)
July 2, 2008 Filing 14 ***STRICKEN AS PER DKT. 16 ORDER*** AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against all defendants, filed by Jose Lopez- Acosta. Service due by 11/3/2008,(Palomares-Starbuck, Lorenzo) Modified on 7/8/2008 (ab).
July 2, 2008 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Jose Lopez- Acosta Re: #12 MOTION requesting Order to adjudicate Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as Unopposed by Plaintiff filed by Juan C. Melendez- Rivera, Jose R Alvarado- Almodovar, Pedro Toledo, #11 MOTION to dismiss and Memorandum in Support Therof as to Pedro Toledo, Jose R Alvarado- Almodovar, Juan C. Melendez- Rivera filed by Juan C. Melendez- Rivera, Jose R Alvarado- Almodovar, Pedro Toledo filed by Jose Lopez- Acosta. (Palomares-Starbuck, Lorenzo)
June 26, 2008 Filing 12 MOTION requesting Order to adjudicate Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as Unopposed by Plaintiff filed by Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz on behalf of Pedro Toledo, Jose R Alvarado- Almodovar, Juan C. Melendez- Rivera (Gueits-Ortiz, Jose)
June 3, 2008 Filing 11 MOTION to dismiss and Memorandum in Support Therof as to Pedro Toledo, Jose R Alvarado- Almodovar, Juan C. Melendez- Rivera filed by Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz on behalf of Pedro Toledo, Jose R Alvarado- Almodovar, Juan C. Melendez- Rivera Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/19/2008 (Gueits-Ortiz, Jose)
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 6/3/2008. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 5/5/08. (VA)
May 5, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 3, 2008 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz on behalf of Juan C. Melendez- Rivera Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/21/2008 (Gueits-Ortiz, Jose)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 6/3/2008. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 4/15/08. (VA)
April 14, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 3, 2008 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed byJose J. Gueits-Ortiz on behalf of Jose R Alvarado- Almodovar Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/30/2008 (Gueits-Ortiz, Jose)
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 6/3/2008. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 4/4/08. (VA)
April 4, 2008 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 3, 2008 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Jose Lopez- Acosta filed byJose J. Gueits-Ortiz on behalf of Pedro Toledo Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/20/2008 (Related document(s) #1 ) (Gueits-Ortiz, Jose)
April 3, 2008 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Lopez- Acosta upon Juan C. Melendez- Rivera served on 3/24/2008, answer due 4/13/2008; Conjugal Partnership Melendez-Doe 2 served on 03/24/2008, answer due 04/13/2008; Jose R. Alvarado-Almodovar served on 03/24/2008, answer due 4/13/2008; Pedro Toledo served on 03/17/2008, answer due 4/6/2008; (Palomares-Starbuck, Lorenzo) Modified on 4/3/2008 to add answer due date and parties(ab).
March 31, 2008 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #3 Summons Returned Executed. ***FILED IN ERROR, MISSING INFORMATION IN PDF, COUNSEL TO REFILE DOCUMENTS*** (ab)
March 31, 2008 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Lopez- Acosta upon Pedro Toledo served on 3/17/2008, answer due 4/6/2008; Jose R Alvarado- Almodovar served on 3/24/2008, answer due 4/13/2008; Juan C. Melendez- Rivera served on 3/24/2008, answer due 4/13/2008; Conjugal Partnership Alvarado-Doe served on 3/24/2008, answer due 4/13/2008; Conjugal Partnership Melendez- Doe 2 served on 3/24/2008, answer due 4/13/2008. (Palomares-Starbuck, Lorenzo) Modified on 4/1/2008 (ab).
March 14, 2008 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pedro Toledo, Pedro Toledo through Roberto Sanchez Ramos, Jose R Alvarado- Almodovar, Juan C. Melendez- Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Melendez- Doe 2 Service due by 7/15/2008. (ab)
March 14, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pedro Toledo, Jose R Alvarado- Almodovar, Juan C. Melendez- Rivera, Conjugal Partnership Alvarado-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Melendez- Doe 2, Insurance Company A to Z, John Doe filed by Jose Lopez- Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Palomares-Starbuck, Lorenzo) Modified on 3/17/2008 as to parties (ab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez- Acosta v. Toledo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Lopez- Acosta
Represented By: Lorenzo J. Palomares-Starbuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Toledo
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose R Alvarado- Almodovar
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan C. Melendez- Rivera
Represented By: Jose J. Gueits-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe- Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Melendez- Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company A to Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?