Diaz-Castro v. Roman-Roman et al
Plaintiff: Maria Judith Diaz-Castro
Defendant: Pablo Roman-Roman, Juan Diaz-Pagan, Ana Gonzalez, FNU Escalera and Roberto Sanchez-Ramos
Case Number: 3:2009cv01033
Filed: January 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Vega Alta
Presiding Judge: Salvador E Casellas
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. DENIED 37 MOTION for Reconsideration re 31 Opinion and Order, Terminate Motions; NOTED 41 MOTION Submitting English Translation; MOOT 40 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Maria Judith Diaz-Castro. Signed by Judge Salvador E Casellas on 6/11/2010.(LB)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION AND ORDER. GRANTED 26 MOTION to dismiss; DENIED AS MOOT 30 MOTION for Reconsideration and for an Additional Time to File Certified Translations. Upon reviewing the document provided in support of Defendant's motion to dismiss, this C ourt notes that it may take judicial notice of the date the Commonwealth Court's decisions were issued in regards to Petitioner. As such, the Orders at Dockets ## 28 & 29 are SET ASIDE. Signed by Judge Salvador E Casellas on 2/10/2010.(LB)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER. DENIED 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Maria Judith Diaz-Castro. Signed by Judge Salvador E Casellas on 8/11/2009.(LB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz-Castro v. Roman-Roman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Judith Diaz-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Roman-Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Diaz-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Escalera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Sanchez-Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?